Campos v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jose Campos
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv02770
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES re 29 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nancy Berryhill, Jose Campos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/27/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REMAND re 25 . Joint MOTION to Remand and Proposed Order filed by Nancy Berryhill, Jose Campos. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/26/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 7, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court .STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Nancy Berryhill, Jose Campos. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/7/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
January 4, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nancy Berryhill, Jose Campos. Opposition due by 2/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/4/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
November 21, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand and Proposed Order filed by Nancy Berryhill, Jose Campos. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 STIPULATION WITH PR OPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand and Proposed Order. Motion to be filed by 12/12/17. Opposition due by 1/9/2018. Replies due by 1/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/21/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
September 13, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand and Proposed Order filed by Nancy Berryhill, Jose Campos. Motions due by 11/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/12/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Campos
Represented By: Nancy Katherine McCombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?