Thompson v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: Bradfield Thompson
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02864
Filed: May 18, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/13/2017. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
July 31, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2017.(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 12, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to respond by 6/22/2017 and explain in writing his failure to respond to the motion. Plaintiff shall complete the attached form documenting either consent or request for reassignment and file it with the court by 6/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/12/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradfield Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Adam Andrew Vukovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?