District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Northside Installation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Maggiore, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Alfred (Skip) Weltz, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Chris Christophersen, Marian Bourboulis, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund and Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Northside Installation, Inc., Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo and Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo doing business as Northside Installation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02892
Filed: May 19, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 42 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $305,737.49 (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 41 Proposed Writ of Execution by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Do, Tino) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
September 27, 2018 Filing 40 WRIT of Execution Returned Executed by USM but Unsatisfied with added costs. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Tino Xuan Do - Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm (Do, Tino) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 38 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in the amount of $305,737.49 on 08/09/2018. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 37 Proposed Abstract of Judgment by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by George Ryan Nemiroff - Notice of Change of Address and Other Contact Information (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 35 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $305,737.49 (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 34 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/21/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING #30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (granting #18 ) by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz re #30 Report and Recommendations,, Order Reassigning Case, (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant #18 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Order Reassigning Case to District Judge. Objections due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/2/2018. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Court to issue Report and Recommendation that Motion be granted. Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2018, re #18 . MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants; Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Marian Bourboulis, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Chris Christophersen, Alfred (Skip) Weltz, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, John Maggiore, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund. Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #26 Motion to Vacate Case Management Conference. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore #25 Denying Request to Enter Default Judgment Without a Hearing; Granting Request for Telephonic Appearance. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Vacate Case Management Conference; Proposed Order Thereon filed by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. Responses due by 1/24/2018. Replies due by 1/31/2018. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION For Entry of Default Judgment Without Hearing or, in the Alternative, Request for Telephonic Appearance re #18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants; Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Proposed Order filed by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. Responses due by 1/24/2018. Replies due by 1/31/2018. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
November 22, 2017 Filing 24 >[PROPOSED] JUDGMENT by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 11/22/2017) Modified on 11/24/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2017 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz re 22 Clerk's Notice, #21 Order (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for December 7, 2017, is continued to January 18, 2018, at 11:00 a.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by January 11, 2018. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #18 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/1/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 20 Declaration of Coleen K. Christophersen in Support of #18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants; Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byMarian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #2 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 19 Declaration of Michele R. Stafford in Support of #18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants; Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byMarian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants; Notice of Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 11/15/2017. Replies due by 11/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #16 Motion to Continue. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2017 11:00 AM. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue - Plaintiffs' Request to Continue Case Management Conference; Proposed Order Thereon filed by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for August 29, 2017, is continued to October 31, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by October 24, 2017. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 8, 2017 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz re #12 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo and Northside Installation, Inc. (Related documents(s) #11 )(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 11, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default ; Declaration of George R. Nemiroff In Support Thereof filed by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for August 22, 2017, is continued to August 29, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by August 22, 2017. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Alfred (Skip) Weltz, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Marian Bourboulis, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund. All Defendants. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz re #6 Summons Issued on Defendant MASSIMO EDGARDO RODORIGO dba NORTHSIDE INSTALLATION, INC. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz.. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Northside Installation, Inc., Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marian Bourboulis, Chris Christophersen, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, Alfred (Skip) Weltz (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northside Installation, Inc., Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11408292.). Filed byNorthern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Alfred (Skip) Weltz, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund, District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund, Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund, Kenneth Rigmaiden, District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund, John Maggiore, Marian Bourboulis, Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 5/19/2017) Modified on 5/22/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/22/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Northside Installation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maggiore
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust Fund
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council No. 16 of the International Union of Painters and Allied Trades
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Rigmaiden
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred (Skip) Weltz
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the I.U.P.A.T Union and Industry National Pension Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Bourboulis
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Boards of Trustees of the Northern California Glaziers Individual Account Retirement Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joint Board of Trustees of the District Council 16 Northern California Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: George Ryan Nemiroff
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northside Installation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massimo Edgardo Rodorigo doing business as Northside Installation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?