Enigma Software Group USA, LLC v. Malwarebytes Inc.
Plaintiff: Enigma Software Group USA LLC
Defendant: Malwarebytes Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02915
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER DENYING 179 DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Answer due by 6/20/2024. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2024.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2024)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order Granting 147 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 08/09/2021. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/7/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING 75 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/7/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enigma Software Group USA, LLC v. Malwarebytes Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enigma Software Group USA LLC
Represented By: Theodore J. Angelis
Represented By: Terry Budd
Represented By: Eric Randolph Ian Cottle
Represented By: Eric A. Prager
Represented By: Edward Patrick Sangster
Represented By: Anna Shabalov
Represented By: Christopher Michael Verdini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malwarebytes Inc.
Represented By: Liwen Mah
Represented By: Sapna Mehta
Represented By: Bradley Thomas Meissner
Represented By: Tyler G Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?