Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 3:2017cv03023
Filed: May 25, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Court Deadlines Other than those Set Forth in the Court's September 27, 2017 Order filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 26, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 20, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Modify Court Deadlines filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 11, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OPPOSITION/CROSS-MOTION filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
August 8, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Early Summary Judgment and Claim Construction Reconsideration Briefing Schedules (Corrected) filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/3 1/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Hearing on summary judgment motions set for 12/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
June 21, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling July 5, 2017 Case Management Conference for August 2, 2017 filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 14, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Eolas Technologies Incorporated and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Eolas Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eolas Technologies Incorporated v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eolas Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Stephanie M. Adams Ryan
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: John Bruce Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin Hess
Represented By: James Elroy Quigley
Represented By: Craig N. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Green, III
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: John R. Keville
Represented By: Eric Stephen Schlichter
Represented By: Eric Stephen Schlichter
Represented By: Bijal V Vakil
Represented By: Bijal Vijay Vakil
Represented By: Allen W. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?