Frenken v. Hunter

Plaintiff: Geerte M. Frenken
Defendant: Christopher Perry Hunter
Case Number: 3:2017cv03125
Filed: May 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 61 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Defendant's September 28, 2017 hearing. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
August 30, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 14 , 53 ) MOTIONS TO EXPEDITE CASE SCHEDULE AND 20 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 29, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Plaintiff shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 24, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 49 Administrative Motion for permission to allow attorney other than lead trial counsel to appear at case management conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
July 20, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frenken v. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geerte M. Frenken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Perry Hunter
Represented By: Richard J. Idell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?