United States of America v. Estate of Amir Zavieh, a/k/a Allen Zavieh, Deceased et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Estate of Amir Zavieh, a/k/a Allen Zavieh, Deceased and Lisa Zavieh Martin, Executor of the Estate of Amir Zavieh a/k/a Allen Zavieh
Case Number: 3:2017cv03286
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/8/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 6, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Supplemental Briefing re 18 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Deem Service Completed. Plaintiff's supplemental brief due by 10/18/2017. Defendant's response due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/6/2017. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 11, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 8 Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Serve; denying 9 Motion to Appoint Personal Representative of the Estate. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Estate of Amir Zavieh, a/k/a Allen Zavieh, Deceased et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yael Bortnick, Bortn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Amir Zavieh, a/k/a Allen Zavieh, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Zavieh Martin, Executor of the Estate of Amir Zavieh a/k/a Allen Zavieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?