hiQ Labs, Inc. v. Linkedin Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff hiQ Labs, Inc. seeks a declaratory judgment against Defendant LinkedIn Corp. that plaintiff did not violate federal and state laws when it accessed and copied public information from LinkedIn's website to provide its clients with insights on which of their employees are likely to be poached by a competitor.

Plaintiff: hiQ Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Petitioner: 3Taps, Inc
Interested Party: Farella Braun + Martel LLP
Case Number: 3:2017cv03301
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motions Hearing as to #331 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #336 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #337 MOTION for Sanctions , #338 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Stephen McElfresh, #339 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of B. Sacks set for 9/29/2022, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58.< /b< Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with th is entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) to Seal Certain Materials re ECF Nos. #385 and #386 by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 9/19/2022) Modified on 9/19/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting LinkedIn Corporation's Local Rule 79-5(f) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed, #2 Exhibit 101, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/15/2022)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Declaration in Support of #387 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #387 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/15/2022) Modified on 9/16/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 REPLY (re #337 MOTION for Sanctions) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/15/2022) Modified on 9/16/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Brief re #355 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment on Linkedin Corp's First Counterclaim), #385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Reply and in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C- Sealed, #5 Exhibit D- Sealed, #6 Exhibit E- Sealed, #7 Exhibit F- Sealed, #8 Exhibit G- Sealed)(Related document(s) #355 , #385 ) (Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 9/12/2022)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Reply Brief in Support of Summary Judgment Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C- Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D- Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E- Under Seal, #7 Exhibit F- Under Seal, #8 Exhibit G- Under Seal)(Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 9/12/2022)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting LinkedIn Corporation's Local Rule 79-5(f) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed, #2 LinkedIn's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit 100, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/12/2022)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Declaration of Daniel Justice in Support of #381 Reply to Opposition/Response, #382 Reply to Opposition/Response, #340 Declaration in Support filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #381 , #382 , #340 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/12/2022) Modified on 9/13/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 REPLY (re #336 MOTION for Summary Judgment) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/12/2022) Modified on 9/13/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 REPLY (re #339 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of B. Sacks) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/12/2022) Modified on 9/13/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REPLY (re #338 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Stephen McElfresh) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/12/2022) Modified on 9/12/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #377 STIPULATION AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 NOTICE - Supplement to Linkedin Corporation's Opposition to hiQ's Motion for Summary Judgment by Linkedin Corporation. re #358 Opposition/Response to Motion (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/8/2022) Modified on 9/9/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Linkedin Corporation and hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Lui Declaration in Support)(Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 9/8/2022) Modified on 9/8/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #366 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL LINKEDIN'S AND THIRD PARTIES' MATERIAL.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #360 LINKEDIN CORPORATION'S MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTY'S MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022) Modified on 9/8/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) to Seal Certain Materials re ECF #366 and [364-1] by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenelle Bray, #2 Declaration of Lee Womer, #3 Proposed Order)(Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 9/7/2022) Modified on 9/8/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/8/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Statement re #360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Material re #358 as per Local Rule 79(f)(3) by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Muller, Zane) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #369 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hope Skibitsky in Support of hiQ Labs, Inc.'s Local Rule 79-5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal hiQ's Confidential Material, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T, #8 Exhibit U, #9 Exhibit V, #10 Exhibit W, #11 Exhibit X, #12 Exhibit Y)(Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #337 MOTION for Sanctions) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zane Muller In Support of hiQ Labs, Inc.'s Opposition to Linkedin's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #2 Exhibit A (redacted), #3 Exhibit B (redacted), #4 Exhibit C (redacted), #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Errata K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S (redacted), #21 Exhibit T (redacted), #22 Exhibit U (redacted), #23 Exhibit V (redacted), #24 Exhibit W (redacted), #25 Exhibit X (redacted), #26 Exhibit Y (redacted), #27 Exhibit Z)(Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 9/2/2022) Modified on 9/6/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #336 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) (redacted) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hope Skibitsky in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 20 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit 24 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit 27 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 28 (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit 29 (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 30 (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit 31 (Unredacted), #15 Exhibit 32 (Unredacted), #16 Exhibit 33 (Unredacted), #17 Exhibit 34 (Unredacted), #18 Exhibit 36 (Unredacted), #19 Exhibit 37 (Unredacted), #20 Exhibit 38 (Unredacted), #21 Exhibit 39 (Unredacted), #22 Exhibit 40 (Unredacted), #23 Exhibit 41 (Unredacted), #24 Exhibit 42 (Unredacted), #25 Exhibit 43 (Unredacted), #26 Exhibit 44 (Unredacted), #27 Exhibit 45 (Unredacted), #28 Exhibit 47 (Unredacted), #29 Exhibit 48 (Unredacted), #30 Exhibit 49 (Unredacted), #31 Exhibit 50 (Unredacted), #32 Exhibit 51 (Unredacted), #33 Exhibit 52 (Unredacted), #34 Exhibit 54 (Unredacted), #35 Exhibit 57 (Unredacted), #36 Exhibit 58 (Unredacted), #37 Exhibit 59 (Unredacted), #38 Exhibit 61 (Unredacted), #39 Exhibit 65 (Unredacted), #40 Exhibit 70 (Unredacted), #41 Exhibit 71 (Unredacted), #42 Exhibit 72 (Unredacted), #43 Exhibit 73 (Unredacted), #44 Exhibit 75 (Unredacted), #45 Exhibit 77 (Unredacted), #46 Exhibit 80 (Unredacted), #47 Exhibit 81 (Unredacted), #48 Exhibit 82 (Unredacted), #49 Exhibit 85 (Unredacted), #50 Exhibit 99 (Unredacted), #51 Exhibit 100 (Unredacted), #52 Exhibit 101 (Unredacted), #53 Exhibit 104 (Unredacted), #54 Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion (Unredacted))(Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hope Skibitsky in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 53 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 62 (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit 63 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 66 (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit 67 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 68 (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit 69 (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 88 (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit 89 (Unredacted))(Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 DECLARATION of Zane Muller in Opposition to #339 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of B. Sacks, #331 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #338 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Stephen McElfresh filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Compendium, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6-9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11-14, #10 Exhibit 15-45, #11 Exhibit 46, #12 Exhibit 47-89, #13 Exhibit 90-104)(Related document(s) #339 , #331 , #338 ) (Muller, Zane) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #339 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of B. Sacks ) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linkedin Corporation re #359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re #358 , #360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Material re #358 (Justice, Daniel) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #338 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Stephen McElfresh ) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Material re #358 filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 LinkedIn's Opposition to hiQ's Motion for Summary Judgment (UNDER SEAL), #3 Justice Decl. Exs. 2-5, 12-27 (UNDER SEAL))(Justice, Daniel) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re #358 filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Rockwell Decl., #2 Proposed Order, #3 Justice Decl. Ex. 1 (UNDER SEAL))(Justice, Daniel) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #355 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment on Linkedin Corp's First Counterclaim), #331 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Maurath Decl. & Ex. A, #2 Rigano Decl. & Ex. A, #3 Justice Decl. & Exs. 1-34, #4 Proposed Order Denying Motion)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Unsealing #329 Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/2022. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support of #355 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment on Linkedin Corp's First Counterclaim) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit O, #12 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #355 ) (Muller, Zane) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unredacted Motion for Summary Judgment on Linkedin Corp's First Counterclaim) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 9/2/2022. Replies due by 9/9/2022. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Sealing Certain Materials #333 #345 by Judge Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #352 BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND HIQ'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Briefing on #337 Motion for Sanctions and HIQ's #331 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. and Linkedin Corporation. (Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 8/16/2022) Modified on 8/16/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING AND MOTION HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing as to #331 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 9/29/2022, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc< p
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #335 LINKEDIN CORPORATION'S LOCAL RULE 79-5(f) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PATY'S MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING #334 LINKEDIN CORPORATION'S LOCAL RULE 79-5 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DESIGNATED MATERIALS UNDER SEAL.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(f)(3) to Seal Certain Materials re ECF #333 and #345 by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Statement (Local Rule 79(f)(3)) on Linkedin's Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support of hiQ's Statement)(Muller, Zane) (Filed on 8/12/2022) Modified on 8/15/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE by Linkedin Corporation to Withdraw Request to Seal ECF No. [340-4] (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/10/2022) Modified on 8/10/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Dkt #333 filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM, #4 Exhibit B UNREDACTED (AMENDED), #5 Exhibit C UNREDACTED, #6 Exhibit D UNREDACTED, #7 Exhibit E UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit F UNREDACTED, #9 Exhibit G UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit H UNREDACTED, #11 Exhibit I UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit J UNREDACTED, #13 Exhibit K UNREDACTED, #14 Exhibit O UNREDACTED, #15 Exhibit P UNREDACTED)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 EXHIBITS re [340-4] Corrected Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 4) Exs. 20-44 filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Justice, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ERRATA re [340-4] Correcting information in the Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 4) Exs. 20-44 and will be replaced by ECF #343 by Linkedin Corporation. (Justice, Daniel) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER re Docket No. #333 .hiQ's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is hereby deemed a Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should be Sealed, and parties shall proceed according to Local Rule 79-5(f). Parties are reminded to propose an order that is narrowly tailored to seal only the sealable material under Local Rule 79-5(c). Moreover, because the materials are connected with a potential dispositive motion, any sealing must be justified by a compelling interest. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linkedin Corporation re #334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials In Support of August 5, 2022, Filings, #335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Information re LinkedIn's August 5, 2022, Filings (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Declaration of Daniel Justice in Support of #337 MOTION for Sanctions, #339 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of B. Sacks, #336 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #338 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Stephen McElfresh filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence (Vol 1) Exs. 1-8, #2 Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 2) Exs. 9-10, #3 Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 3) Exs. 11-19, *** #4 Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 4) Exs. 20-44 DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #5 Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 5) Exs. 45-79, #6 Compendium of Evidence (Vol. 6) (Exs. 80-96))(Related document(s) #337 , #339 , #336 , #338 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022) Modified on 8/8/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/8/2022 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of B. Sacks filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 8/31/2022. Replies due by 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Stephen McElfresh filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 8/31/2022. Replies due by 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 8/19/2022. Replies due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Schmidt Declaration (Public Version), #2 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 8/31/2022. Replies due by 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Lawit Declaration & Exhibits, #2 Bajoria Declaration & Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Information re LinkedIn's August 5, 2022, Filings filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 LinkedIn's Motion for Summary Judgment (Under Seal), #3 LinkedIn's Motion for Sanctions (Under Seal), #4 Schmidt Decl. ISO Sanctions Motion (Under Seal), #5 Motion to Exclude B. Sacks (Under Seal), #6 Compendium Exhibits 2-7 (Under Seal), #7 Compendium Exhibits 9-10 (Under Seal), #8 Compendium Exhibits 11-17 (Under Seal), #9 Compendium Exhibits 20-21, 23-24, 29-44 (Under Seal), #10 Compendium Exhibits 45-79 (Under Seal), #11 Compendium Exhibits 80-93, 95-96 (Under Seal))(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials In Support of August 5, 2022, Filings filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Rockwell Declaration, #3 Lawit Declaration Exhibit N, #4 Compendium Exhibit 10, #5 Compendium Exhibit 15, #6 Compendium Exhibit 19, #7 Compendium Exhibit 26)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM, #4 Exhibit B UNREDACTED, #5 Exhibit C UNREDACTED, #6 Exhibit D UNREDACTED, #7 Exhibit E UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit F UNREDACTED, #9 Exhibit H UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit I UNREDACTED, #11 Exhibit J UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit K UNREDACTED, #13 Exhibit O UNREDACTED, #14 Exhibit P UNREDACTED)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support of #331 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit C- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit D- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit E- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit F- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit I- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit J- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit K- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit P- EXHIBIT FILED UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) #331 ) (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/5/2022) Modified on 8/8/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 8/19/2022. Replies due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #328 STIPULATION REGARDING EXPANSION OF PAGE LIMITS RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #217 Motion to Vacate. Document filed under seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-11 SEEKING EXPANSION OF PAGE LIMITS RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Linkedin Corporation and hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 7/29/2022) Modified on 8/1/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM ( #320 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim) by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 7/20/2022) Modified on 7/21/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/15/22, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #322 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2022. (Related documents(s) #322 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 7/16/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Further Settlement Conference set for 10/28/2022 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/15/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further settlement conference held on 7/15/2022 via Zoom. Results: Matter did not settle. Judge Ryu will host (1) a 20-30 minute settlement planning call with counsel on 10/12/2022 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only (counsel will receive call-in credentials by email); and (2) a further Zoom settlement conference on 10/28/2022 10:00 AM, for which the parties shall send updated confidential letters to Judge Ryu by 10/24/2022. The parties need not prepare updated exchanged settlement briefs.Digital Recording Time: Not Recorded For Plaintiff: Corey Worcester; Hope Skibitsky; Terry Wit; and Mark Weidick For Defendant: Annette Hurst; Russell Cohen; and Sarah Wight (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/15/2022 before Judge Edward M Chen by Linkedin Corporation, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING RE #217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling. Motion Hearing reset to 7/15/2022 at 09:00 AM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at # https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entr y generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT LINKEDIN CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against hiQ Labs, Inc. byLinkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #303 LinkedIn's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. LinkedIn is required to E-FILE the amended document by 7/1/2022. 7/14/2022 hearing on #273 hiQ's Motion to Dismiss and #303 LinkedIn's Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims is VACATED.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022) Modified on 6/29/2022 (emcsec, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The correct brief to be filed under seal is at [Dkt. 314].(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 EXHIBITS re #304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED (Adding Defendant's Highlighted Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims (UNREDACTED)) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #304 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Maria Nikolaevna Sokova. (Sokova, Maria) (Filed on 6/23/2022) Modified on 6/24/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Letter from Corey Worcester addressed to the Honorable Edward M. Chen regarding Renewed Motion to Dismiss . (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 6/23/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by hiQ Labs, Inc. (Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hope Skibitsky in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 7- (UNDER SEAL))(Muller, Zane) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 DECLARATION of Mark Weidick in Opposition to #217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #217 ) (Muller, Zane) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support of #307 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 2-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 3-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7- REDACTED, #8 Exhibit 8-DOCUMENT INTENTIONALLY OMITTED, #9 Exhibit 9-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 10-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 11-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 12-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit 13-DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) #307 ) (Muller, Zane) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling ) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Another Partys Materials Should be Sealed filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1- UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 2- UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 3- UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 9- UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 10- UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 11- UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 12- UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 13- UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit UNREDACTED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION)(Muller, Zane) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linkedin Corporation re #304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Justice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit B (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit C (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit D (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit E (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit F (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit G (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit H (Under Seal), #11 Exhibit I (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit J (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit K (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit L (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit M (Under Seal), #16 Exhibit N (Under Seal), #17 Exhibit O (Under Seal), #18 Exhibit P (Under Seal), #19 Exhibit Q (Under Seal), #20 Exhibit R (Under Seal), #21 Exhibit S (Under Seal), #22 Exhibit T (Under Seal), #23 Exhibit U (Under Seal), #24 Exhibit V (Under Seal), #25 Exhibit W (Under Seal), #26 Exhibit X (Under Seal), #27 Exhibit Y (Under Seal), #28 Exhibit Z (Under Seal), #29 Exhibit AA (Under Seal), #30 Exhibit BB (Under Seal), #31 Exhibit CC (Under Seal), #32 Exhibit DD (Under Seal), #33 Exhibit EE (Under Seal), #34 Exhibit FF (Under Seal), #35 Exhibit GG (Under Seal), #36 Exhibit HH (Under Seal), #37 Exhibit II (Under Seal))(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims (and to the Extent Necessary, to Amend the Scheduling Order) filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 6/23/2022. Replies due by 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Annette L. Hurst, #3 Exhibit A - II to Hurst Declaration)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/9/2022) Modified on 6/10/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Request for Judicial Notice re #301 Opposition/Response to Motion, #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #301 , #273 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/9/2022) Modified on 6/10/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying hiQ's Renewed Motion to Dismiss First & Second Counterclaims)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/9/2022) Modified on 6/10/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #296 Stipulation to Continue Motion Hearings to July 14, 2022. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims, #217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling. Motions Hearing reset for 7/14/2022 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Edward M Chen by Zoom videoconference. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. *** No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page require ment. *** This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #295 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #283 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF HIQ LABS, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #266 LINKEDIN CORPORATION'S LOCAL RULE 79-5 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTY'S MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Order by Judge Edward M Chen Granting #261 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF HIQ LABS, INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 269 Order, 277 Clerk's Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Util - Teleconference Zoom filed by Linkedin Corporation and hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Annette L. Hurst)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/6/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 EXHIBITS re #285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED [285-3] Supplemental Brief (Sealed) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #285 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Supplemental Brief (re #291 ) CORRECTED and REDACTED filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #291 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/3/2022) Modified on 6/3/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ERRATA re #291 Supplemental Brief,,,,, Redacted and [285-3] Supplemental Brief Under Seal by Linkedin Corporation. (Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #262 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Supplemental Brief (re #217 MOTION to Vacate, #63 Order on Motion for TRO) in Support of Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Annette L. Hurst in support of LinkedIn's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46)(Related document(s) #217 , #63 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/2/2022) Modified on 6/3/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 EXHIBITS re #287 Supplemental Brief,,,, Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 24 to Hurst Declaration filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #287 ) (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 EXHIBITS re #285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 26 (Exhibits 26-45 Refiled Per Notice) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40, #15 Exhibit 41, #16 Exhibit 42, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 44, #19 Exhibit 45)(Related document(s) #285 ) (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linkedin Corporation re #1 Complaint, #286 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, #285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/2/2022)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 *** MAIN DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Supplemental Brief re #217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Annette Hurst, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46)(Related document(s) #217 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 6/2/2022) Modified on 6/2/2022 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 EXHIBITS re #285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 26 filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40, #15 Exhibit 41, #16 Exhibit 42, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 44, #19 Exhibit 45)(Related document(s) #285 ) (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Nathan Shaffer, #3 Supplemental Brief (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 25)(Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Reply in Support re #262 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #262 ) (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 6/1/2022) Modified on 6/1/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zane Muller in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Reply in Support of Motion for Relief, #4 Redacted Reply in Support of Motion for Relief)(Wit, Terry) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #281 Stipulation Regarding Briefing on hiQs Motion to Dismiss Linkedins Counterclaims. Responses due by 6/9/2022. Replies due by 6/23/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims filed by Linkedin Corporation and hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Briefing on hiQs Motion to Dismiss Linkedins Counterclaims)(Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 5/27/2022) Modified on 5/27/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #279 Stipulation to Extend Certain Rule 16 Deadlines. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Linkedin Corporation and hiQ Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Certain Rule 16 Deadlines)(Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 5/25/2022) Modified on 5/25/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #262 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. ** REMINDER ** Local Rule 7-2.(4) Requires the points and authorities in support of the motion to be filed as one document with the motion, not in a separ ate docket entry. [err102] No further action is necessary. Re: #274 Brief filed by hiQ Labs, Inc., #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 01:30 PM by Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Request for Judicial Notice re #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Proposed Order re #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Brief re #273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIns Counterclaims filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 6/3/2022. Replies due by 6/10/2022. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Emily Renzelli. The docket shows different contact information from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal pr ofile on ECF. [err102] Re: #272 Notice of Appearance filed by Linkedin Corporation (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Renzelli (Renzelli, Emily) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #270 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17187015.) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Renzelli, Emily) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the status updates at #265 and #267 . LinkedIn shall file a supplemental brief in support of #217 its motion to vacate by 6/1/22. hiQ shall file a responsive brief by 6/8/22. The Court shall hold a hearing on the motion to vacate on 7/7/22, at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Hearing on the motion to vacate at #217 set for 7/7/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linkedin Corporation re #266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 STATUS REPORT RE 263 by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shaffer In Support of LinkedIn Corporation's Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Re LinkedIn Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Unredacted Version of Status Report RE Motion To Dissolve PI (Under Seal), #4 Redacted Version of Status Report RE Motion To Dissolve PI)(Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Letter from Corey Worcester addressed to the Honorable Edward M. Chen regarding Status Update . (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MANDATE of USCA as to #72 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 CLERK'S NOTICE The parties are to provide a status update regarding #217 Defendant's motion to vacate. The status shall be filed by 5/17/2022.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/23/2022. Replies due by 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Elisabeth) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elisabeth Miller, #2 Proposed Order, #3 unredacted Motion for Relief from Nondispositive)(Miller, Elisabeth) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #259 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daily Guerrero.(tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17139587.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Guerrero, Daily) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REDACTION of #250 MOTION for Court to Rule on Motion to Compel pursuant to #256 granting in part and denying in part #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Linkedin Corporation. (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Francis Rugani (Rugani, Paul) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting in part and denying in part #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying Motion to Compel; finding as moot #250 Motion for Court to Rule on Motion to Compel ; granting #252 Discovery Letter Brief Re: Protective Order. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re ECF #249 filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Scott Roberts, #3 Exhibit A (Under Seal))(Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 USCA Opinion, Affirmed, as to #72 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2022) Modified on 4/18/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #250 MOTION for Court to Rule on Motion to Compel re #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) re Discovery Motion filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Cohen, Russell) (Filed on 4/13/2022)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Protective Order filed by Linkedin Corporation, hiQ Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cohen, Russell) (Filed on 4/13/2022) Modified on 4/14/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Discovery Letter BriefResponding to hiQ's Discovery Motion #250 filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION for Court to Rule on Motion to Compel re #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 4/25/2022. Replies due by 5/2/2022. (Miller, Elisabeth) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Letter to Court, #4 Unredacted Version of Letter to Court)(Miller, Elisabeth) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #245 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Zane Muller.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #241 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Elisabeth Miller.(vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re #244 Letter filed by Linkedin Corporation. The Court clarifies the order of March 7, 2022 (Dkt. No. #242 ). The Court ORDERS production of only category one: code used to acquire LinkedIn date (the "science" repository and the code used with "Mechanical Turkers") and not category two code for use of Linkedin data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/25/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17011517.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing with the Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Second Judicial Department)(Muller, Zane) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Letter from Annette Hurst Regarding Clarification of Discovery Order #242 . (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Faucette (Faucette, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/9/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim Regarding #234 Discovery Letter Brief. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16962385.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Miller, Elisabeth) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference rescheduled to 7/15/2022 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/3/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER RE: MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/1/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/1/2022. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that in light of District Judge E. M. Chen's #236 Order granting Stipulation Amended Case Schedule, the Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2022 12:30 PM by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu is vacated and will be rescheduled sometime in July 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/2022. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Granting as to #233 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE AND PROVIDING FOR CERTAIN DEPOSITION PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/2022. (vla, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE AND PROVIDING FOR CERTAIN DEPOSITION PROCEDURES filed by Linkedin Corporation, hiQ Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Annette L. Hurst)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 2/18/2022) Modified on 2/22/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Yunshan Lui (Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Gary M. Kaplan (Kaplan, Gary) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 5/13/2022 12:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on December 15, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 12/15/2021.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: N/A. Attachment: Minute Order. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2021)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING #227 STIPULATION GOVERNING THE DISCLOSURE AND NONDISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION REGARDING EXPERTS AND CONSULTANTS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/2021. (afm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2021)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING THE DISCLOSURE AND NONDISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN INFORMATION REGARDING EXPERTS AND CONSULTANTS filed by Linkedin Corporation, hiQ Labs, Inc. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/8/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT STATUS CALL. The court apologizes for any confusion regarding this mornings settlement status call. Judge Ryu will conduct a brief (20-30 minute) settlement status conference via Zoom on 12/15/21 at 9:30 a.m. in her non-public Zoom meeting room at: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09Meeting ID: 161 949 4731Passcode: 030361 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Settlement Conference set for 12/15/2021 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2021)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Sarah Kate Mullins (Mullins, Sarah) (Filed on 12/3/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Deferring Ruling on #217 Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 LINKEDIN CORPORATIONS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISSOLVE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST FOR INDICATIVE RULING PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 62.1 filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 10/1/2021) Modified on 10/1/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/08/2021 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Linkedin Corporation, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Declaration of Hope Skibitsky In Support of LINKED IN CORPORATIONS LOCAL RULE 79-5 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DESIGNATED MATERIALS UNDER SEAL filed byhiQ Labs, Inc. (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling ) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sharma Dec, #2 Declaration Weidick Dec)(Wit, Terry) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING RE #27 MOTION TO VACATE FROM 10/14/2021 TO 10/21/2021 AT 1:30PM: Pursuant to Local Rule 7-2(a), Court rescheduled hearing re: #217 from 10/14/2021 to 10/21/2021 at 1:30PM. Motion briefing deadlines remain unchanged. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MOTION to Vacate #63 Order on Motion for TRO , Dissolve Preliminary Injunc. & Rule 62.1 Indic. Ruling filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/24/2021. Replies due by 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Indicative Ruling, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dissolve Prelim. Injunc., #3 Hurst Declaration & Exhibits, #4 Rockwell Declaration & Exhibits, #5 Zhong Declaration & Exhibits)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Motion to Dissolve Prelim. Injunc. & Indic. Ruling filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Shaffer Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion to Dissolve Prelim. Injunc. (PUBLIC), #4 Motion to Dissolve Prelim. Injunc. (UNDER SEAL), #5 Hurst Decl. (PUBLIC), #6 Hurst Decl. (UNDER SEAL), #7 Hurst Decl. Ex. 4 (PUBLIC), #8 Hurst Decl. Ex. 4 (UNDER SEAL), #9 Hurst Decl. Ex. 9 (PUBLIC), #10 Hurst Decl. Ex. 9 (UNDER SEAL), #11 Hurst Decl. Ex. 10 (PUBLIC), #12 Hurst Decl. Ex. 10 (UNDER SEAL), #13 Rockwell Decl. (PUBLIC), #14 Rockwell Decl. (UNDER SEAL), #15 Rockwell Decl. Ex. 8 (PUBLIC), #16 Rockwell Decl. Ex. 8 (UNDER SEAL), #17 Zhong Decl. Ex. 1 (Public), #18 Zhong Decl. Ex. 1 (UNDER SEAL), #19 Uriarte Decl. Ex. 1 ([ECF No. 189-2]) (PUBLIC), #20 Uriarte Decl. Ex. 1 ([ECF No. 189-2]) (UNDER SEAL), #21 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Kate Mullins (Mullins, Sarah) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #212 Stipulation for Protective Order For Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER as Modified by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #210 Stipulation Re Scheduling. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/26/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Designation of Experts due by 4/14/2022. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 5/5/2022. Dispositive Motion due by 8/11/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2023 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Further Jury Trial set for 2/28/2023, 3/1/2023, 3/3/2023, 3/6/2023, 3/7/2023, 3/8/2023, 3/10/2023, 3/13/2023, 3/14/2023 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SCHEDULING filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement conference held on 8/2/2021 via Zoom. Results: Matter did not settle. Judge Ryu will host a 30-minute status call with counsel on 12/8/2021 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Counsel will receive call-in credentials by email.FTR Time: Not Recorded For hiQ: Corey Worcester; Renita Sharma; and Mark Weidick For LinkedIn: Annette Hurst; Rob Uriarte and Sarah Wight (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Transcript of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4/8/2021, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, RMR, CRR, CSR No. 7445, telephone number ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov; 415-290-1651. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (207 in 3:17-cv-03301-EMC) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2021. (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/08/2021 before Judge Edward M. Chen by hiQ Labs, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to #72 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The court asks whether the parties would like to go forward with the 8/2/21 settlement conference in light of the recent remand to the Ninth Circuit. By 7/19/21, please meet and confer and send a joint email with the parties views to DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #203 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16174986.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Skibitsky, Hope) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER of USCA as to #72 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to #72 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE by Farella Braun + Martel LLP Lien on Claims of Plaintiff hiQ Labs, Inc. against Defendant LinkedIn Corp. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Deferring in Part and Denying in Part #182 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Counterclaims. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2021 re #182 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIn Corp.'s Counterclaims filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. Court takes #182 motion under submission. No case management issues. Total Time in Court: 38 Minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Renita Sharma. Defendant Attorneys: Annette Hurst, Russell Cohen. Attachment: Minute Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2021)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Planning call held on 4/7/2021 in advance of 8/2/2021 Zoom settlement conference. Results: Plaintiff will provide a written demand by 7/19/2021, with a copy to Judge Ryu (DMRsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov). FTR Time: 15 minutes For Plaintiff: Corey Worcester and Renita Sharma For Defendant: Annette Hurst and Russell Cohen (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING #182 MOTION TO DISMISS SET FOR 4/8/2021 TO TO ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Person s granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. #182 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIn Corp.'s Counterclaims. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 4/2/2021) Modified on 4/2/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated nonpublic Zoom Meeting "room." The nonpublic Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://canduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/30/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ***DISREGARD. ERROR IN FILING.SEE DOCKET NO. #194 FOR CORRECTED NOTICE.*** NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - To be determined. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/30/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Statement of Recent Decision by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wit, Terry) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REPLY (re #182 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIn Corp.'s Counterclaims ) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 3/25/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Request for Judicial Notice re #189 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Legislative History for Cal. Penal Code 502, #2 Exhibit B- Cited Excerpts of Legislative History)(Related document(s) #189 ) (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #182 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIn Corp.'s Counterclaims ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert L. Uriarte, #2 Exhibit 1- hiQ January 22, 2021 Correspondence, #3 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/25/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Judge Ryu will conduct the settlement conference in her designated non-public Zoom Meeting "room." The non-public Zoom Meeting link is available on Judge Ryu's webpage, by going to: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr, or Join ZoomGov Meeting by clicking the link or using the information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619494731?pwd=cnZyVXVqWExEZzcxcDBBdzRuLzVldz09 Meeting ID: 161 949 4731 Passcode: 030361 Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/1/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss preparation for a settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20-30 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 4/7/2021 10:30 AM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER RE-REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement. Deadline is 5/26/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/25/2021. CASE REFERRED back to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement Conference - 90 days. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Renita Sharma. Defendant Attorneys: Annette Hurst, Russell Cohen, Robert Uriarte. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET 2/25/2021 TO ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION to Dismiss LinkedIn Corp.'s Counterclaims filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 3/4/2021. Replies due by 3/25/2021. (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 1/18/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #180 Stipulation. Answer due 1/18/2021; opposition due 3/4/2021; reply due 3/25/2021; hearing to be set 4/8/2021 at 1:30 PM. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Scheduling filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 12/31/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Nikolaevna Sokova (Sokova, Maria) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Denny Justice (Justice, Daniel) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D Shaffer (Shaffer, Nathan) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Luis Uriarte (Uriarte, Robert) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell P. Cohen (Cohen, Russell) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette L. Hurst (Hurst, Annette) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #172 Stipulation Regarding Scheduling. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2021 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Response to complaint due 1/4/2021; hearing to be set for 3/25/2021 at 1:30 PM.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Scheduling filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #170 Answer to Complaint, filed by Linkedi n Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas V. Christopher (Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 11/22/2020)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Defendant and Counterclaimant LinkedIn Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Counterclaims byLinkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #168 Stipulation. Answer due 11/20/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 11/12/2020 TO 12/17/2020: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2020. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emcGeneral Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Joint Case Management S tatement due by 12/10/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM by Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Letter from Corey Worcester Joint Letter Regarding Case Management Conference Scheduled for November 12, 2020. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #164 Stipulation. Answer due 11/13/2020.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE LINKEDIN'S DEADLINE TO ANSWER THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Letter from Corey Worcester regarding the filing a Second Amended Complaint. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #161 Stipulated Request to extend date filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. Second Amended Complaint due 10/14/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/4/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2020)
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Letter from Corey Worcester to Hon. Edward M. Chen re Request for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint . (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 10/4/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE by Linkedin Corporation of Withdrawal of Chad Ian Golder, Laura K. Lin and Tamerlin J. Godley as Counsel for LinkedIn Corporation (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hugh Blavin of Justin P. Raphael (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #137 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due by 10/7/2020. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/20/2020, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #156 Transcript Order, #155 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2020. (Related documents(s) #156 , #155 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 20, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by hiQ Labs, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 20, 2020 before Judge Edward M. Chen by Linkedin Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Fram, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2020 and Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2020; taking under advisement #137 Motion to Dismiss. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco.Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 2 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Corey Worcester, Renita Sharma, Adam Wolfson. Defendant Attorney: Jonathan Blavin. Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131). Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Response re #152 Statement (Response to LinkedIn Corporation's Statement of Recent Decision) byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Statement re #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) Statement of Recent Decision by Linkedin Corporation. (Fram, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing re #137 Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants will enter proceeding as attendee, thereafter promoted to panelist prior to calling of case.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619911861?pwd=TjVma1lnMlJlNHR3ZE9QMkFjNkFndz09Meeting ID: 161 991 1861Password: 912881Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts .gov/zoom/. as to #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131). Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. (Related documents(s) #137 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION #137 HEARING AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 20, 2020: Motion hearing re #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 (DISREGARD - RESCHEDULED TO 8/20/2020) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Motion Hearing #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) and Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 are vacated and rescheduled for 8/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. Briefing remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) Modified on 7/22/2020 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Request for Judicial Notice re #143 Reply to Opposition/Response (Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 REPLY (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) ) filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #115 Notice to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Carl Brandon Wisoff; Deepak Gupta and Rebecca Hilary Stephens terminated. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
May 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #139 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2020. Replies due by 6/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lau, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Request for Judicial Notice re #137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #137 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 131) filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 6/12/2020. Replies due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order as Modified by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #134 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 8/6/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Administrative) and Continue Case Management Conference filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to #72 Notice of Appeal, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to #72 Notice of Appeal, filed by Linkedin Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 AMENDED COMPLAINT against hiQ Labs, Inc.. Filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Corey Worcester Notice of Appearance of Adam B. Wolfson (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #126 Stipulation and Scheduling Order. Deadline to amend 2/14/2020; answer due 4/14/2020. If response is motion, opposition due 6/12/2020; reply due 7/14/2020; hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 1;30 p.m. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 is vacated and rescheduled for 4/9/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 6/12/2020. Replies due by 7/14/2020. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE by Linkedin Corporation of Withdrawal of Elia Herrera as Counsel for LinkedIn Corporation (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hugh Blavin of Marianna Mao as Counsel for LinkedIn Corporation (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Scheduling filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Statement re #80 Stipulation and Order (Joint Statement by Both Parties) by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MANDATE of USCA as to #72 Notice of Appeal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER of USCA as to #72 Notice of Appeal filed by Linkedin Corporation. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #121 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 1/30/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Fram, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CLERK'S NOTICE MOVING TIME OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 9?30 A.M. TO 1:30 P.M.: Time of Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13717971.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Worcester, Richard) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13717931.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Sharma, Renita) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Terry Lee Wit (Wit, Terry) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION of USCA as to #72 Notice of Appeal 17-16783, filed by Linkedin Corporation. We AFFIRM the district court's determination that hiQhas established the elements required for a preliminary injunction and remand for further proceedings. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #112 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #110 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled for 8/8/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #108 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 is vacated and rescheduled for 5/2/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Elia Herrera (Herrera, Elia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #105 Stipulation Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled from 11/5/2018 to 2/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #80 Stipulation and Order, 104 Clerk's Notice, [STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE] filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to the unavailability of the Court, the Case Management Conference is advanced from 11/8/2018 to 11/5/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint CMC Statement due date remains unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018) Modified on 9/25/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/29/2018 to 11/8/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #96 Administrative Motion Relating Case. The Clerk is directed to re-assign 3taps, Inc. v. LinkedIn Corp., Case No. 4:18-cv-00855-NC, to this Court pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECLARATION of Thomas V. Christopher in Opposition re #96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Under N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by 3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/21/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Under N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 Non-Party 3Taps, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under N.D.Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by3Taps, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 2/16/2018. Matter did not settle. Parties are invited to contact Judge Ryu for further assistance. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/16/2018)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Under N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 Non-Party 3Taps, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under N.D.Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Blavin In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CORRECTED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Non-Party 3Taps, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under N.D. Cal. Civil Local rule 3-12 (Corrected Motion has been attached to docket no. #96 ) filed by 3Taps, Inc. Responses due by 2/20/2018. (Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/14/2018) Modified on 2/15/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Under N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 Non-Party 3Taps, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Under N.D.Cal. Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by 3Taps, Inc. Responses due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Christopher, Thomas) (Filed on 2/14/2018) Modified on 2/15/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 96 replaced on 2/15/2018) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/15/2018 to 3/29/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference rescheduled to 2/16/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Motions terminated: #93 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/12/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference to February 16, 2018 [DKT 88] filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/1/2018 to 3/15/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #90 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline To Complete Settlement Conference filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline To Complete Settlement Conference filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Preparation call held on 1/8/2018 in advance of 1/26/2018 settlement conference. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 1/26/2018 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/27/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for an in-person settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20-30 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 1/8/2018 10:30 AM. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 1/23/2018 to 3/1/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 12/20/2017 by Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on December 20, 2017 at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 1/11/2018 to 1/23/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Staying Further Proceedings and Deadlines filed by Linkedin Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings:, Case Stayed Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #78 Stipulation and Order Staying Further Proceedings and Deadlines filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #77 Stipulation and Order (Further Extending Deadline for LinkedIn to Respond to the Amended Complaint) and reset CMC filed by Linkedin Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 9/28/2017 to 11/16/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #54 Stipulation and Order (Further Extending Deadline for LinkedIn to Respond to the Amended Complaint) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #75 STIPULATION Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 9/14/2017 to 9/28/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepak Gupta)(Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE. REMINDER - CMC set for 9/14/17. Joint CMC statement was due 9/7/17. Parties shall file joint statement by end of 9/11/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Golder) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Linkedin Corporation. Appeal of Order on Motion for TRO #63 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11689000 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ADR Remark: CORRECTION: The Further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 9/7/2017 at 2:00 PM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11688676.) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service of Good Standing)(Golder, Chad) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 9/5/2017 with Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 9/5/2017 at 2:00 PM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on September 5, 2017 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fram, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #23 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Declaration in Support of #49 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Second Supplemental Declaration of Paul Rockwell) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #49 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 9/7/2017 to 9/14/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/27/2017, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #56 Transcript Order, #57 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2017. (Related documents(s) #56 , #57 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Declaration of Deepak Gupta in Support of #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 7/28/2017) Modified on 7/31/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/27/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Linkedin Corporation, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/27/2017 before Edward M. Chen by hiQ Labs, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Stephens, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/27/2017. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Standstill agreement remains in place. Total Time in Court 2 hours 30 minutes. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney Laurence Tribe, Deepak Gupta and C. Brandon Wisoff. Defendant Attorney Jon Blavin, Rosemarie Ring and Don Verrilli, Jr. This is a text-only Minute Entry (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #53 (Further Extending Deadline for LilnkedIn to Respond to the Complaint) filed by Linkedin Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #32 Stipulation and Order (Further Extending Deadline for LilnkedIn to Respond to the Complaint) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Supplemental Brief re #48 Supplemental Brief, ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction - CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #48 filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #48 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY #49 filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction ) (Supplemental Brief) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Paul Rockwell)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Supplemental Brief re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Deepak Gupta ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #23 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11562415.) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Verrilli, Donald) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/29/2017, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #40 Transcript Order, #39 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (Related documents(s) #40 , #39 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Re #44 Standstill Agreement signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #23 set for 7/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2017) Modified on 7/3/2017 (emcsec, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 38 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Re Stipulated Agreement. (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by hiQ Labs, Inc. (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal hi Labs, Inc's Corporate Disclosure Statement & Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version, #4 Unredacted Version)(Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/30/2017) Modified on 7/3/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/29/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Linkedin Corporation, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 29, 2017 before Edward M. Chen by hiQ Labs, Inc., for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Stephens, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2017 re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. Parties shall meet and confer and to inform the Court by filing a joint letter by the end of 6/30/17 whether they have reached an agreement. If an agreement is not reached, the Court will issue a ruling on the request for a temporary restraining order, and will set a briefing schedule and hearing date for a motion for preliminary injunction. Total Time in Court 1 hour 24 minutes. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. Plaintiff Attorney Deepak Gupta and Brandon Wisoff. Defendant Attorney Rosemarie Ring and Jonathan Blavin. This is a text-only Minute Entry (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Received CD: Exhibit T re #34 Declaration in Support by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Linkedin Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation for Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OBJECTIONS to hiQ's Inclusion of New Evidence with Its Reply Brief and Request to Consider LinkedIn's Response re #33 Reply to Opposition/Response, #34 Declaration in Support by Linkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #33 , #34 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/28/2017) Modified on 6/29/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of Deepak Gupta in Support of #33 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S, #2 Exhibit T, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #33 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY in Support (re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/27/2017) Modified on 6/28/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #1 Complaint, (Extending Deadline to Respond) filed by Linkedin Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Robert Rosin in Opposition to #24 Brief, #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #24 , #23 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Paul Rockwell in Opposition to #24 Brief, #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #24 , #23 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Lorenzo Canlas in Opposition to #24 Brief, #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #24 , #23 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Abhishek Bajoria in Opposition to #24 Brief, #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #24 , #23 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of Jonathan H. Blavin in Opposition to #24 Brief, #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Related document(s) #24 , #23 ) (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, (Extending Deadline to Respond) filed by Linkedin Corporation. (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Brief re #23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #23 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/22/2017) Modified on 6/23/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-R to Renewed Ex Parte Motion, #2 [Proposed] Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Declaration of Deepak Gupta, #4 Declaration of Mark Weidick)(Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/22/2017) Modified on 6/23/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. Linkedin Corporation served on 6/8/2017, answer due 6/29/2017. (Stephens, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/15/2017) Modified on 6/16/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #19 FOR BRIEFING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by hiQ Labs, Inc. Motion Hearing (TRO) set for 6/29/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR BRIEFING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Laurence Tribe ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11472172.) filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Tribe, Laurence) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tamerlin J Godley (Godley, Tamerlin) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Daniel Fram (Fram, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR (1) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Linkedin Corporation. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hugh Blavin , Rosemarie T. Ring, Tamerlin J. Godley, Laura K. Lin, Nicholas D. Fram (Blavin, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by hiQ Labs, Inc... (Stephens, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/22/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Declaration of Mark Weidick in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declaration of Deepak Gupta in Support of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Brief re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Errata D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by hiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linkedin Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11453893.). Filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Linkedin Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11453893.). Filed byhiQ Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 6/7/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: hiQ Labs, Inc. v. Linkedin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: hiQ Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Represented By: Rebecca Hilary Stephens
Represented By: Laurence Tribe
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jeffrey G Lau
Represented By: Richard Corey Worcester
Represented By: Renita Nath Sharma
Represented By: Terry Lee Wit
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Hope Skibitsky
Represented By: Gary M. Kaplan
Represented By: Elisabeth Bach Miller
Represented By: Zane Muller
Represented By: Daily Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Represented By: Nicholas Daniel Fram
Represented By: Chad Ian Golder
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.
Represented By: Tamerlin J Godley
Represented By: Laura K Lin
Represented By: Elia Herrera
Represented By: Marianna Yuling Mao
Represented By: Justin Paul Raphael
Represented By: Robert Luis Uriarte
Represented By: Russell P. Cohen
Represented By: Annette L. Hurst
Represented By: Nathan D Shaffer
Represented By: Daniel Denny Justice
Represented By: Maria Nikolaevna Sokova
Represented By: Sarah Kate Mullins
Represented By: Rosemarie T. Ring
Represented By: Catherine Yunshan Lui
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Represented By: Emily Renzelli
Represented By: Paul Francis Rugani
Represented By: Rosemarie T Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 3Taps, Inc
Represented By: Thomas V. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Farella Braun + Martel LLP
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?