Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv03328
Filed: June 8, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND NATIONWIDE'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 18, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND EXTEND NATIONWIDE'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/12/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 5, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?