Via Licensing Corporation v. Haier America Trading LLC

Plaintiff: Via Licensing Corporation
Defendant: Haier America Trading LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv03485
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/20/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
November 22, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 14, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 22 Setting Schedule on Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Via Licensing Corporation v. Haier America Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Garrard R. Beeney
Represented By: Laura Kabler Oswell
Represented By: Antonia Stamenova-Dancheva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haier America Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?