Baranco v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: David Baranco
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Lincoln Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv03580
Filed: June 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2018 105 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 100 Amended Complaint, Responding to Plaintiffs' 3rd Amended Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/18/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
May 24, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 Regarding Plaintiffs' Third Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
April 25, 2018 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 re Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 10, 2018 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen re: 91 Discovery Letter Brief. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
March 21, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 FILING ANSWER filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 19, 2018 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Anita Farrell, Roger Kinnunen, Donald Brown, James Abbitt, Gary Kubber, Malisa Nicolau, Daniel Caron, David Baranco, John Furno, Harriet Abruscato, James Jenkin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 12, 2018 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 36 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
January 10, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 65 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Ford Motor Company and Plaintiffs filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
November 28, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 Joint Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Anita Farrell, Roger Kinnunen, Donald Brown, James Abbitt, Gary Kubber, Malisa Nicolau, Daniel Caron, David Baranco, John Furno, Harriet Abruscato, James Jenkin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
October 25, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 24 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
August 31, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 18 Amended Complaint, 10 Case Management Scheduling Order, Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue the Case Management Conference and Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Am filed by Ford Motor Company. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baranco v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Baranco
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Leslie E. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Tamara Alicia Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?