Fraser et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Julian Fraser, Joseph Wucher, Irene Damsky, Kim Zaia and Chris Jackson
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv03702
Filed: June 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 56 Revised Joint Request for Approval of PAGA Settlement and Dismissal of the Action. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 08/03/2018. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Re 54 Joint Request for Approval of PAGA Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 Extending Time to File A Joint Status Report and Continuing Date of Status Conference filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. Status Report due by 5/10/2018. Status Conference reset for 5/17/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/18/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Irene Damsky, Joseph Wucher, Kim Zaia, Chris Jackson, Julian Fraser. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/26/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraser et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Fraser
Represented By: Chaya M. Mandelbaum
Represented By: William P. McElhinny
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wucher
Represented By: Chaya M. Mandelbaum
Represented By: William P. McElhinny
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Damsky
Represented By: Chaya M. Mandelbaum
Represented By: William P. McElhinny
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Zaia
Represented By: Chaya M. Mandelbaum
Represented By: William P. McElhinny
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Jackson
Represented By: Chaya M. Mandelbaum
Represented By: William P. McElhinny
Represented By: Steven G. Zieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly Lisa Gee
Represented By: James J. Oh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?