Sweet et al v. Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Sweet, Chuck Mere and Zombie Go Boom, LLC dba ZombieGoBoom
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv03953
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 re 29 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Chuck Mere, James Sweet, Zombie Go Boom, LLC dba ZombieGoBoom. Responses due by 1/25/2018. Replies due by 2/8/2018. Motion He aring set for 3/1/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER to vacate 11/9/17 motion hearing 10/11/17 and reset CMC from 12/21/17 to 3/1/18 re 21 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sweet
Represented By: Adrian Bacon
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck Mere
Represented By: Adrian Bacon
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zombie Go Boom, LLC dba ZombieGoBoom
Represented By: Adrian Bacon
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?