Newton v. Equilon Enterprises LLC DBA Shell Oil Products US

Plaintiff: Ciara Newton
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv03961
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING HEARING FROM MAY 29, 2018 TO JUNE 8, 2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing currently set for 5/29/2018 is CONTINUED to 6/8/2018 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 15, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT EQUILON ENTERPRISES, GARY T. LAFAYETTE, AND LAFAYETTE & KUMAGAI LLP SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED re 42 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, 41 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ciara Newton. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for TUESDAY, 5/29/2018 01:45 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2018. Further Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/15/2018 09:01 AM. Response due 6/8/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 10, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO COMPEL PRODUCTION; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT EQUILON ENTERPRISES, GARY T. LAFAYETTE, AND LAFAYETTE & KUMAGAI LLP SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: granting 39 Motion to Compel Production/Discovery Letter Brief.Production Discovery responses due by 5/18/2018. Show Cause written response filed by 5/22/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Tuesday, 5/29/2018 01:45 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
April 20, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; REVISING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation, to be completed by 1/22/18 [date previously set]. Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2018. Dispositive Motion hearing set 8/21/2018. Daubert Motions filed by 9/7/2018. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Daubert Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/20/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
October 27, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/27/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Equilon Enterprises LLC DBA Shell Oil Products US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciara Newton
Represented By: Sonya Lisa Smallets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?