Glass Egg Digital Media v. Gameloft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glass Egg Digital Media
Defendant: Gameloft, Inc., Gameloft SE and Gameloft Iberica S.A.U.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04165
Filed: July 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting in part and denying in part 223 Motion for Sanctions. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman denying 212 Motion for Sanctions. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman denying Plaintiff's motion to compel; denying Plaintiff's motion for sanctions; granting in part and denying in part Defendant's motion for protective order; and denying Defendant's motion for sanctions related to 220 Discovery Letter Brief.(rmilc1s, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Robert M. Illman granting in part and denying in part 168 Discovery Letter Brief (Motion to quash); granting in part and denying in part 203 Discovery Letter Brief (Renewed motion to quash). (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER RE: STIPULATION REQUESTING CLARIFICATION OF REACH OF JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 9, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISCOVERY ORDER; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2019. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Robert M. Illman granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion for Discovery; deferring ruling on 168 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 176 Discovery Letter Brief. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Discovery Order re 165 MOTION for Discovery, 171 Brief, 172 Response ( Non Motion ). (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 04/15/2019. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; AFFORDING LIMITED LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed no later than August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/29/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/02/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF JOINDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/12/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/06/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT GAMELOFT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/22/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/29/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/24/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass Egg Digital Media v. Gameloft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glass Egg Digital Media
Represented By: Quoc-Huy Doan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gameloft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gameloft SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gameloft Iberica S.A.U.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?