Salvaggio et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Adkins, Jimmy Turner, Roberto Balderas, Ruth Guthrie, William Bloome, Jack Epstein, Robert R. Behrens, John Balaz, Tommy Byford, Steve Salvaggio, Kenneth A. Robertson, Steve Sabac, Jeffrey Byram, Joseph Batiste, Geoffrey Smith, Lisa M. Pecora, Duane Madsen, Kenneth A. Smith, Steven E. Merritt, Carmen K. Ellington, James Halacheff, Jeffrey Bailey, Wayne Hardy, Dorothia R. Halligan, Douglas B. Moore, Jack Dominick, Steve Weintraub, Joseph Saurini, Daisy Robinson, Janice Baty, John M. Struewing, Manuel Garcia, Jeffrey Bradley, Margaret T. Ambrose, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Ronnie W. Walker, Charles Rider, Eloy Brionez, Scott Scharf, Stephen Meyer, Carol Jones, Ernest Hebert, Donna M. Coker, Paul Acton, Max D. Berry, John T. Adams, Ladonna K. Sparks, Harold Wallace, Susan Tabone, Marvin L. Alden, Robert Rydin, Edwin M. Mason, Gary R. Skeie, Paul J. Fieber, Richard J. Bogani, Linda M. Verchereau, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Billie Jean Clayton, Lance T. Conner, Carol Young Jones, Benjamin J. Carmon, Tyler N. Crafton, Lawrence F. Clark, Eddie Williams, Hillard Hall, Jr., Rodney Broussard, Karen Savant, Beverly Perrin, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, James I. Taylor, Mark G. Larsen, Joshua Davis, Robert Konopa, Valerie Gaither, Harold Davis, Thomas L. Qualls, Robert E. Counselman, Holly Staggs, Barbara Baker, Wesley Cormican, John Nagao Aoki, Russell Dunn, Gary Cordell, Brian Crotts, Officer Domingo Rodriguez, David W. Reagan, Wayne Schmitz, Kevin McFarland, Donna O'Brien, Edward J. Ruff, Beverly Mancini and Patricia B. Dover
Defendant: Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc., Monsanto Company and Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04253
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2017 Filing 33 Acknowledgment of Receipt received from 22nd Judicial Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri of remand order and docket sheet. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 10, 2017 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE re remand. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (413) Stipulation regarding Remand to State Court in 3:16-md-02741-VC, 3:17-cv-03746-VC, 3:17-cv-03747-VC, 3:17-cv-03748-VC, 3:17-cv-03749-VC, 3:17-cv-03750-VC, 3:17-cv-03755-VC, 3:17-cv-03756-VC, 3:17-cv-03757-VC, 3:17-cv-03941-VC, 3:17-cv-03942-VC, 3:17-cv-04253-VC.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 31, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Remand to State Court filed by Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:17-cv-01113. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case Transferred via CM/ECF Extraction. (DJO)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER AND VACATING THE JULY 27, 2017, HEARING SESSION ORDER: IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741 A conditional transfer order was filed in the actions on the attached schedule on April 7, 2017. Prior to expiration of that order's 7-day stay of transmittal, plaintiffs filed a notice of opposition to the proposed transfer. Plaintiffs later filed a motion and brief to vacate the conditional transfer order. The Panel has now been advised that plaintiffs have withdrawn their opposition to transfer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-15" filed on April 7, 2017, is LIFTED insofar as it relates to these actions. The actions are transferred to the Northern District of California for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Vince Chhabria. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Hearing Session Order and the attached Schedule filed on June 14, 2017, are VACATED insofar as they relate to these actions.by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Lthi. (DJO)
April 25, 2017 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 17 Docket Text Order, Case Stayed,, filed by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Corrigan, James)
April 19, 2017 Filing 25 Consent to Removal by Defendants Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc., Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc.. (Cowling, John)
April 18, 2017 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 17 Docket Text Order, Case Stayed,, filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
April 14, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Opposition to Motion for Pretrial Consolidation filed in Crane v. Monsanto by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams to Motion for Pretrial Consolidation Filed in Crane v. Monsanto (Corrigan, James) Modified on 4/17/2017 (EAB).
April 14, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Notice of Opposition for Pretrial Consolidation Filed in Crane v. Monsanto Out of Time by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams. (Corrigan, James)
April 13, 2017 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams. (Corrigan, James)
April 13, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams. (Corrigan, James)
April 11, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pedram Esfandiary. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5904941) by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Esfandiary, Pedram)
April 11, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration re 17 Docket Text Order, Case Stayed,, by Plaintiffs Paul Acton, John T. Adams, Sandra Adkins, Marvin L. Alden, Margaret T. Ambrose, John Nagao Aoki, Jeffrey Bailey, Barbara Baker, John Balaz, Roberto Balderas, Joseph Batiste, Janice Baty, Robert R. Behrens, Max D. Berry, William Bloome, Richard J. Bogani, Jeffrey Bradley, Eloy Brionez, Rodney Broussard, Tommy Byford, Jeffrey Byram, Benjamin J. Carmon, Lawrence F. Clark, Billie Jean Clayton, Donna M. Coker, Lance T. Conner, Gary Cordell, Wesley Cormican, Robert E. Counselman, Tyler N. Crafton, Brian Crotts, Harold Davis, Joshua Davis, Jack Dominick, Patricia B. Dover, Russell Dunn, Carmen K. Ellington, Jack Epstein, Paul J. Fieber, Valerie Gaither, Manuel Garcia, Ruth Guthrie, James Halacheff, Hillard Hall, Jr, Dorothia R. Halligan, Wayne Hardy, Ernest Hebert, Carol Jones, Carol Young Jones, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Robert Konopa, Mark G. Larsen, Duane Madsen, Beverly Mancini, Edwin M. Mason, Kevin McFarland, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Steven E. Merritt, Stephen Meyer, Joann M. Meyhoefer, Douglas B. Moore, Donna O'Brien, Lisa M. Pecora, Beverly Perrin, Thomas L. Qualls, David W. Reagan, Charles Rider, Kenneth A. Robertson, Daisy Robinson, Domingo Rodriguez, Edward J. Ruff, Robert Rydin, Steve Sabac, Steve Salvaggio, Joseph Saurini, Karen Savant, Scott Scharf, Wayne Schmitz, Gary R. Skeie, Geoffrey Smith, Kenneth A. Smith, Ladonna K. Sparks, Holly Staggs, John M. Struewing, Susan Tabone, James I. Taylor, Jimmy Turner, Linda M. Verchereau, Ronnie W. Walker, Harold Wallace, Steve Weintraub, Eddie Williams. (Corrigan, James)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann) filed by Monsanto Company ; ORDERED :Motion is GRANTED. Case stayed. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on April 7, 2017. (MCB)
April 6, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
April 6, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Defendant Monsanto Company with case number 4:17-cv-982, 4:17-cv-986, 4:17-cv-01102, 4:17-cv-01103, 4:17-cv-01104, 4:17-cv-01105, 4:17-cv-01107, 4:17-cv-01108, 4:17-cv-01109, 4:17-cv-01110, 4:17-cv-01111, 4:17-cv-01116, 4:17-cv-01117, 4:17-cv-01192 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Consent MOTION to Stay Their Time to Respond to Complaint Until Remand Has Been Decided by Defendants Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc., Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc. ; ORDERED :Motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on April 5, 2017. (MCB)
April 4, 2017 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott T. Jansen for Defendants Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc., Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc.. (Jansen, Scott)
April 4, 2017 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by David G. Ott for Defendants Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc., Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc.. (Ott, David)
April 4, 2017 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc.. Parent companies: Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc., Subsidiaries: Big Club Digital, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Cowling, John)
April 4, 2017 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Cowling, John)
April 4, 2017 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay Their Time to Respond to Complaint Until Remand Has Been Decided by Defendants Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc., Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc.. (Cowling, John)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joe G. Hollingsworth by Defendant Monsanto Company. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/31/2017. (CBL)
March 29, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joe G. Hollingsworth. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5884444) by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment List of Bar Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Hollingsworth, Joe)
March 29, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
March 29, 2017 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
March 28, 2017 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Lisa M. Pecora, Douglas B. Moore, James Halacheff, Manuel Garcia, Carmen K. Ellington, Donna O'Brien, John Balaz, Geoffrey Smith, Mark G. Larsen, Tyler N. Crafton, Beverly Perrin, Lance T. Conner, Linda M. Verchereau, Tommy Byford, Harold Wallace, Daisy Robinson, Duane Madsen, Wesley Cormican, Russell Dunn, Patricia B. Dover, Joseph Saurini, Janice Baty, Richard J. Bogani, Joann M. Meyhoefer, David W. Reagan, Eloy Brionez, Gary Cordell, Karen Savant, Sandra Adkins, Ruth Guthrie, Steve Sabac, Thomas H. McLaughlin, Ernest Hebert, Roberto Balderas, Gary R. Skeie, Wayne Hardy, Ladonna K. Sparks, Joshua Davis, Benjamin J. Carmon, Donna M. Coker, Holly Staggs, William Bloome, Jack Dominick, Jeffrey Byram, Charles Rider, Carol Young Jones, Carol Jones, Eddie Williams, Robert Rydin, Brian Crotts, Jack Epstein, Rodney Broussard, Robert Konopa, Stephen Meyer, Beverly Mancini, Robert E. Counselman, Valerie Gaither, Steve Salvaggio, Jimmy Turner, Steven E. Merritt, Susan Tabone, Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe, Edwin M. Mason, Ronnie W. Walker, Kenneth A. Smith, Domingo Rodriguez, Billie Jean Clayton, Harold Davis, Kevin McFarland, Barbara Baker, Dorothia R. Halligan, Jeffrey Bradley, Wayne Schmitz, John M. Struewing, Paul J. Fieber, Paul Acton, Lawrence F. Clark, Hillard Hall, Jr, Jeffrey Bailey, Steve Weintraub, Kenneth A. Robertson, Marvin L. Alden, Joseph Batiste, Max D. Berry, John T. Adams, Scott Scharf, Robert R. Behrens, Margaret T. Ambrose, Thomas L. Qualls, Edward J. Ruff, James I. Taylor, John Nagao Aoki.(MFG)
March 28, 2017 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
March 28, 2017 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Monsanto Company. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Agroeste Sementes Paraguay S.A., Deltapine de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V., Dido, LLC, Hebei Ji Dai Cotton Seed Technology Company, Ltd., Liaoning Tuanhua Seeds Co., Ltd., Monsanto Korea, Inc., Publicly held company: None,. (Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
March 28, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)
March 28, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1722-CC00746, with receipt number 0865-5881136, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form)(Sternhell Blackwell, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvaggio et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Adkins
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Turner
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Balderas
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Guthrie
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bloome
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Epstein
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Behrens
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Balaz
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Byford
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Salvaggio
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Robertson
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sabac
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Byram
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Batiste
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Smith
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. Pecora
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Madsen
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Smith
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E. Merritt
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen K. Ellington
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Halacheff
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bailey
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Hardy
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothia R. Halligan
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas B. Moore
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Dominick
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Weintraub
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Saurini
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Robinson
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Baty
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Struewing
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Garcia
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bradley
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret T. Ambrose
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann M. Meyhoefer
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie W. Walker
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Rider
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloy Brionez
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Scharf
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Meyer
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Jones
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Hebert
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Coker
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Acton
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max D. Berry
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Adams
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna K. Sparks
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Wallace
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tabone
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin L. Alden
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rydin
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin M. Mason
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary R. Skeie
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J. Fieber
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Bogani
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Verchereau
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. McLaughlin
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Jean Clayton
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance T. Conner
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Young Jones
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin J. Carmon
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler N. Crafton
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence F. Clark
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Williams
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillard Hall, Jr.
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Broussard
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Savant
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Perrin
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Kidwell-Rowe
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James I. Taylor
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G. Larsen
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Davis
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Konopa
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Gaither
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Davis
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Qualls
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Counselman
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Staggs
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Baker
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Cormican
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nagao Aoki
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Dunn
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Cordell
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Crotts
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Officer Domingo Rodriguez
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Reagan
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Schmitz
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McFarland
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna O'Brien
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Ruff
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Mancini
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia B. Dover
Represented By: James T. Corrigan
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osborn & Barr Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Cowling
Represented By: David G. Ott
Represented By: Scott Timothy Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe Gregory Hollingsworth
Represented By: Ann E. Sternhell Blackwell
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osborn & Barr Communications, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Cowling
Represented By: David G. Ott
Represented By: Scott Timothy Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?