City and County of San Francisco v. Sessions et al

Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Alan R Hanson and Department of Justice
Miscellaneous: State of California
Case Number: 3:2017cv04642
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick. alifornia and San Franciscos motions for summary judgment are GRANTED and the DOJ's motions for summary judgment are DENIED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING 66 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting deadline as to 66 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 2/14/2018. Hearing remains schedules for 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/07/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 20 MOTION TO INTERVENE by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City and County of San Francisco v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Ronald P. Flynn
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Represented By: Mollie M Lee
Represented By: Aileen Marie McGrath
Represented By: Yvonne Rosil Mere
Represented By: Tara M. Steeley
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R Hanson
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: State of California
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?