State of California, ex rel. XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California v. Sessions et al
Plaintiff: State of California, ex rel. XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Alan R Hanson and United States Department Of Justice, Atrorney General Office
Case Number: 3:2017cv04701
Filed: August 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 AMENDED JUDGMENT AND ORDER re 138 Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 140 Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to advance deadlines re: 139 MOTION to Alter Judgment of October 5, 2018. Response due by 10/18/2018. Reply due by 10/23/2018. Motion Hearing specially set for 10/26/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/15/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying 26 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE SCHEDULING MATTERS granting 33 Stipulation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California, ex rel. XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California, ex rel. XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Lee Isaac Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department Of Justice, Atrorney General Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?