Exeltis USA Inc. v. First Databank, Inc.
Plaintiff: Exeltis USA Inc.
Defendant: First Databank, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv04810
Filed: August 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 168 , 209 ) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. 169 and Dkt. No. 170 the motions to exclude the expert testimony of J. Kevin Gorospe and Norman Smith and GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Dkt. No. 190 the motion to exclude the expert testimony of Kathryn M. Rexrode. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 213 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 206 Motion to Withdraw Ryan M. Sandrock as Attorney. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ( 167 , 179 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. 196 administrative motion to continue the November 7 hearing to February 2020. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 192 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Plaintiff's Opposition to, and to Shorten the Time for the Hearing on, 190 Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Kathryn M. Rexrode. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 183 Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 181 Stipulation RE Docket No. 179 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 173 MOTION FOR RELIEF. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 174 Stipulation ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE Re Docket Nos. 168 - 170 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 165 Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ( 148 , 156 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 157 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 154 Stipulation Regarding Schedule. Designation of Experts due by 5/17/2019; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 5/28/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/12/2019; Motions due by 6/21/2019; Replies due by 8/9/2019; and Responses due by 7/26/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 121 Stipulation Regarding Schedule.Designation of Experts due by 5/3/2019; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 5/17/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2019 and Motions due by 6/12/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Fradette, Jacquelyn. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Boyer, Nathaniel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Saucier, Evan. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 110 Stipulation Regarding Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/15/2019; Designation of Experts due by 2/15/2019; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 3/5/2019; Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2019 and Dispositive Motion due by 3/22/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 104 Stipulated Protective Order.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 97 Stipulation to Move Hearing Date from October 1st to October 2nd. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting in part and Denying in part 35 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative 87 Motion to Consider Whether Case. Should Be Related RE Case No. 18-cv-4224-HSG.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 81 Stipulation Regarding Discovery Schedule. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/21/2018; Designation of Experts due by 10/10/2018; Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 11/2/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 11/16/2018; and Motions due by 12/7/2018. *The telephonic conference, previously set for today (May 1st) is vavcated.* (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 71 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 66 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 26 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2017; Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2017 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket # [35-5]. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Strike. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Sitwala, Ravi. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation Regarding First Databank's Conduct and Briefing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hay, Daniel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exeltis USA Inc. v. First Databank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Databank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exeltis USA Inc.
Represented By: Daniel John Hay
Represented By: Benjamin Milton Mundel
Represented By: Richard Raskin
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?