Sweeney v. Evilsizor et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Sweeney
Defendant: JLE Properties, Robin Klomparens, Daniel Lacount, Law Offices of Ronald G. Peck, David Barcklay, Mary Evilsizor, Daniel Cantrell, Keri Evilsizor, Round Oak Village Apartments LLC, John Evilsizor, Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP, Staci Lambright, Michelene Insalaco, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP, Carolynn Barcklay, Barcklay & Barcklay, Sucherman Insalaco LLP, Daniel Rottinghaus, Ronald Peck and Berding & Weil LLP
Case Number: 3:2017cv04866
Filed: August 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Sweeney (Sweeney, Joseph) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Other Pending Deadlines filed by Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP, Daniel Cantrell Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/17. Copy mailed to pro se. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Other Pending Deadlines filed by Daniel Cantrell, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Stipulation to Continue Initial CMC)(Roeca, Russell) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE by Daniel Cantrell, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP of Conditional Settlement (Roeca, Russell) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 15 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Robin Klomparens, Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP. (Blaine, Carl) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint re #12 Stipulation filed by Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP, Daniel Cantrell. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Daniel Cantrell, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP. (Roeca, Russell) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robin Klomparens. Service waived by Robin Klomparens waiver sent on 9/8/2017, answer due 11/7/2017. (Blaine, Carl) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP. Service waived by Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP waiver sent on 9/8/2017, answer due 11/7/2017. (Blaine, Carl) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS RONALD G. PECK, LAW OFFICE OF RONALD G. PECK, JOHN EVILSIZOR, MARY EVILSIZOR, JLE PROPERTIES, MICHELENE INSALACO, SUCHERMAN INSALACO, LLP, KERI EVILSIZOR, CAROLYN BARCKLAY, DAVID BARCKLAY, AND BARCKLAY AND BARCKLAY filed by Law Offices of Ronald G. Peck, Ronald Peck. (Blute, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 8 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendants To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Daniel Cantrell, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP. (Roeca, Russell) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint,, Exhibits C-H filed byJoseph Sweeney. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Sweeney, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 6 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint,, Exhibits A and B filed byJoseph Sweeney. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Sweeney, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 28, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carolynn Barcklay, David Barcklay, Barcklay & Barcklay, Berding & Weil LLP, Daniel Cantrell, John Evilsizor, Keri Evilsizor, Mary Evilsizor, Michelene Insalaco, JLE Properties, Robin Klomparens, Daniel Lacount, Staci Lambright, Law Offices of Ronald G. Peck, Ronald Peck, Daniel Rottinghaus, Round Oak Village LLC, Sucherman Insalaco LLP, Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #2 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Copy mailed to Plaintiff.(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order (Judge Chen), #2 Standing Order (All Judges), #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Joseph Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carolynn Barcklay, David Barcklay, Barcklay & Barcklay, Berding & Weil LLP, Daniel Cantrell, John Evilsizor, Keri Evilsizor, Mary Evilsizor, Michelene Insalaco, JLE Properties, Robin Klomparens, Daniel Lacount, Staci Lambright, Law Offices of Ronald G. Peck, Ronald Peck, Daniel Rottinghaus, Round Oak Village Apartments LLC, Sucherman Insalaco LLP, Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP, Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt No. 44611014564). Filed by Joseph Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeney v. Evilsizor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLE Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Klomparens
Represented By: Carl Paul Blaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lacount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Ronald G. Peck
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Blute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Barcklay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Evilsizor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Cantrell
Represented By: Russell Samuel Roeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keri Evilsizor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round Oak Village Apartments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Evilsizor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wagner Kirkman Blaine Klomparens & Youmans LLP
Represented By: Carl Paul Blaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staci Lambright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelene Insalaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiting Fallon Ross & Abel LLP
Represented By: Russell Samuel Roeca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolynn Barcklay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barcklay & Barcklay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sucherman Insalaco LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rottinghaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Peck
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Blute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berding & Weil LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?