Richer v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Emily Richer
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv04984
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 10 Motion to Remand. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone Motion to Remand. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation Selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richer v. Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Richer
Represented By: Cooper Johnson
Represented By: Howard S. Shernoff
Represented By: William Martin Shernoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen M. DeLaney
Represented By: George Edward Rudloff, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?