Muniz v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Victor Muniz
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2017cv04995
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE; AFFORDING LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than June 1, 2018. The Case Management Conference, currently set for June 8, 2018, is continued to August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/14/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/20/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/04/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER VACATING CONSOLIDATION ORDER; CONTINUING HEARING; SETTING DEADLINE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/30/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/07/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASES. Muniz v. Wells Fargo & Company et al, C17-4995 MMC, is related to Brach v. Wells Fargo & Company et al, C17-5990 JST. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/06/2017.(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muniz v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Muniz
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Represented By: Matthew J. Preusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?