Richard v. A-Para Transit Corp.

Plaintiff: Roy Richard
Defendant: A-Para Transit Corp.
Case Number: 3:2017cv05299
Filed: September 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Stipulation TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
February 20, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Stipulation for Continuance of February 27, 2018 Case Management Conference and Case Management Conference-Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2018; Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2018 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
November 28, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Stipulation for Request for Continuance of December 19, 2017 Case Management Conference and Case Management Conference-Related Dates. Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2018; Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2018 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. A-Para Transit Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Para Transit Corp.
Represented By: Morgan Forsey
Represented By: Keahn N Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Richard
Represented By: Daniel F. Gaines
Represented By: Alex Paul Katofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?