Fishman v. Tiger Natural Gas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emily Fishman and Susan Faria
Defendant: Tiger Natural Gas, Inc. and Community Gas Center
Case Number: 3:2017cv05351
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER RE 399 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND 402 MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER RE 373 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: denying 342 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 343 Discovery Letter Brief; denying 346 Discovery Letter Brief; finding as moot 347 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 348 Discovery Letter Brief.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Order denying 319 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/21/2018. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Discovery Order. Discovery Hearing set for 12/28/2918 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/20/2018. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Discovery Order signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/14/2018. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Discovery Order signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/10/2018. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER GRANTING 244 MOTION TO SERVE DEFENDANT COMMUNITY GAS CENTER BY EMAIL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Discovery Order and Order Setting Hearing Re Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/4/2018. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER RE 177 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup granting 186 188 Motions for Extension of Time to File. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING TIGER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 195 Motion for Leave to File]. Amended answer due by NOON on 11/26/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER DENYING 171 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT [re 160 MOTION filed by Emily Fishman, Susan Faria, 116 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike 106 Answer to Amended Complaint [Answer to Third Amended Complaint] filed by Emily Fishman, Susan Faria]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/18/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 85 MOTION FOR LEAVE TOAMEND by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 49 MOTION TO DISMISS AND 50 MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fishman v. Tiger Natural Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Fishman
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N. Harker
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Kralowec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Faria
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Natural Gas, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Amberg
Represented By: Robert E. Boone, III
Represented By: Nancy Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Gas Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?