Bunkley-v-Verber et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bunkley
Defendant: Nicholas Verber, Randolph Counsenes and San Mateo County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 3:2017cv05797
Filed: October 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/30/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 9, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to all causes of action in the Complaint, which is DISMISSED. Bunkley may amend the Complaint within 20 days of the date below. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
January 29, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' 16 MOTION TO DISMISS - Response due by 2/6/2018. Reply due by 2/13/2018. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/29/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 5, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing deadlines and hearing date as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 1/30/2018. Reply due by 2/21/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunkley-v-Verber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bunkley
Represented By: Peter Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Verber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Counsenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?