Moore v. Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Moore
Defendant: Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv05823
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 24, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR for Private Mediation to be completed by 8/10/18. The Court VACATES the Friday 5/25/2018 at 9:01AM Compliance hearing. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2018. Close of E xpert Discovery due by 10/12/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/3/2018. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2018. Dispositive Motion filed by 10/30/2018. Opening Reports due by 9/7/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 9/28/2018. Further Case Mana gement Conference set for Monday, 9/10/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Jury Selection set for 2/25/2019 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2019 08:30 AM in Oak land, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement filed 1/25/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 12/21/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/24/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 8, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 5/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10:00 AM on Thursday, 5/10/2018. Parties are no longer required to appear in person on Thursday, May 10, 2018 at 8:00 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/8/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
April 25, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part Plaintiff's Request to Compel Further Responses re 29 Discovery Letter Brief. Amended Responses due 4/30/18. If dispute unresolved the parties shall appear in person on Thursday, 5/10/2018 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Discovery Letter filed by 5/3/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 16, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc., James Moore. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/16/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
January 30, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as Moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for February 13, 2018 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 12, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/12/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moore
Represented By: Jocelyn Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?