Epic Games, Inc. et al v. Josefsson et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Epic Games, Inc. and Epic Games International S.A.R.L. sued defendants Philip Josefsson and Artem Yakovenko for creating, developing or writing software cheats for Fortnite's Battle Royale game mode. Both defendants allegedly posted videos on YouTube that advertised their cheats and included links to download and install the cheats.

Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc. and Epic Games International S.A.R.L.
Defendant: Philip Josefsson and Artem Yakovenko
Case Number: 3:2017cv05961
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 22 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Andrew Nicholas Klein (Klein, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
October 25, 2017 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rava, William. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 20 **DISREGARD, E-FILED MINUTES TO THIS CASE IN ERROR.** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2017. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour and 16 Minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Emily Burton; Erika Wodinsky; Boris Yankolvich; Jacob Snow; Eric Edmondson. Defendant Attorney: Peter Marketos; Chad Hummel; Bridget Johnsen; Leslie Chaggaris; Katie Dolan-Galaviz; Jeffery Tillotson. Defendants DIRECTV and DIRECTV, LLC's motion for judgment on partial findings (docket no. 396 ) is argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/25/2017) Modified on 10/25/2017 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2017 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11823043.) filed by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rava, William) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 18 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Holly M. Simpkins. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Holly M. Simpkins) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11821365.) filed by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc.. (Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 16, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 9, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 15 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/23/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc... (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 18, 2017 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings, Ltd. for Epic Games, Inc.. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games International S.A.R.L. identifying Corporate Parent Epic Games, Inc. for Epic Games International S.A.R.L.. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 10 Summons Issued as to Philip Josefsson, Artem Yakovenko. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 9 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 8 Proposed Summons. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Electronic filing error. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all association of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, or other entities that have a financial interest or could be substantially affected by the outcome of the proceeding. [Err800] Re: 4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Epic Games, Inc., 5 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Epic Games International S.A.R.L. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Electronic filing error. Only one Summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on one Summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: 3 Proposed Summons filed by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc., 2 Proposed Summons filed by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/1/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games International S.A.R.L. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games, Inc. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 3 Proposed Summons. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2 Proposed Summons. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Philip Josefsson, Artem Yakovenko ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11805152.)(jury demand). Filed byEpic Games, Inc., Epic Games International S.A.R.L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/17/2017) Modified on 10/18/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. et al v. Josefsson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Klein
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games International S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Klein
Represented By: William C Rava
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Josefsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artem Yakovenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?