The People of the State of California v. BP P.L.C. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California
Defendant: BP P.L.C., Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation and Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv06011
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 295 Order by Judge William Alsup denying 293 Motion to Relate Case. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 294 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 293 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed by Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermens Associations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sher, Victor) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2018 Filing 293 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anne Champion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER of USCA granting change of appellee name as to (289 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of the State of California, (241 in 3:17-cv-06012-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of the State of California (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 291 Transcript Designation Form (Bernstein, Erin) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 290 USCA Case Number 18-16663 USCA 9th Circuit for (289 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of the State of California, (241 in 3:17-cv-06012-WHA) Notice of Appeal, filed by The People of the State of California. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 289 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by The People of the State of California. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, 287 , Order on Motion to Dismiss 283 , Judgment 288 , Order on Motion to Remand 134 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12622969 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 288 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/27/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER GRANTING 219 220 221 222 MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/21/2018 before Judge William Alsup by State of California, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Leslie, Heather) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 285 RESPONSE to Court's Request for Joint Statement by Chevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 284 REQUEST FOR JOINT STATEMENT RE PENDING FRCP 12(b)(2) MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/25/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING 225 MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING 277 STIPULATED REQUEST RE BP P.L.C.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 281 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The People of the State of California. [Royal Dutch Shell plc] (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 23, 2018 Filing 280 DISREGARD. ERRONEOUSLY FILED. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by The People of the State of California. Service waived by Royal Dutch Shell PLC waiver sent on 6/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 6/23/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2018 Filing 279 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BP P.L.C.. Amendment to 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 277 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding BP P.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss and Jurisdictional Discovery, 244 Reply to Opposition/Response . (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 278 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BP P.L.C.. Amendment to 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 277 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding BP P.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss and Jurisdictional Discovery, 244 Reply to Opposition/Response . (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 277 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding BP P.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss and Jurisdictional Discovery filed by BP P.L.C.. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 276 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2018 before Judge William Alsup by State of California, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Leslie, Heather) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 275 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2018 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER GRANTING 272 STIPULATED REQUEST RE CONOCOPHILLIPS'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER GRANTING 271 STIPULATED REQUEST RE ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 272 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding ConocoPhillips's Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Jurisdictional Discovery filed by ConocoPhillips. (Morris, George) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 271 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Royal Dutch Shell PLC's Motion to Dismiss and Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Frederick, David) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 270 Supplemental Brief re 259 Order Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Response to the Court's Order filed byChevron Corporation. (Related document(s) 259 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 269 Supplemental Brief re 259 Order Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byThe People of the State of California. (Related document(s) 259 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 268 Refund status re 261 Application for Refund, Approved. (pals, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 267 Statement re 263 Order re Effect of Waiver of Service of Process by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 266 RESPONSE to re 263 Order Plaintiffs' Response to Order Re Service of Process by The People of the State of California. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 265 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/24/18, before Judge Alsup. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (257 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 6/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2018. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/24/2018 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/29/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 28, 2018 Filing 262 Statement re 259 Order re Willingness to Accept Waiver of Service of Summons Under Rule 4(d) by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 5/28/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 261 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 269TQD1E. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 260 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: 256 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,, ), by Chevron Corporation. Court will send to Robin McBain at rmcbain@gibsondunn.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 31, receipt number 269TQD1E). (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/25/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2018 before Judge William Alsup by The People of the State of California, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Chevron Corporation, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2018 re: 3:17-cv-06011-WHA: 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 220 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by ConocoPhillips; 221 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 222 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC; 225 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Chevron Corporation; 3:17-cv-06012-WHA: 184 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BP P.L.C.; 187 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation; 188 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Chevron Corporation; 185 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by ConocoPhillips; 186 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Motions taken under submission. Written order to issue. Total Time in Court: 2 Hrs. 27 Min. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. Plaintiffs Attorneys: Steve Berman, Ben Krass, Robb Kapla, Malia McPherson, Maria Bee, Matthew Goldberg. Defendants Attorneys: Theodore Boutrous, Jonathan Hughes, Theodore Wells, Jaren Janghorani, Elizabeth Kim, David Frederick, Tracie Renfroe, Herbert Stern, Joel Silverstein, Joshua Lipshutz, Andrea Newman, Anne Champion, Carol Wood, Jerome Roth, Dawn Sestito; Eric Grant, Justin Smith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 255 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation Chevron Corporation's Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proeceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 254 NOTICE by Royal Dutch Shell PLC , Pursuant to this Court's Civil Standing Order, of Oral Argument by Junior Attorney on May 24, 2018 (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 253 RESPONSE to re 252 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 245 Brief Plaintiffs' Response to United States' Amicus Brief by The People of the State of California. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND TO UNITED STATES' AMICUS BRIEF by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Respond to the United States' Amicus Brief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Response to United States' Amicus Brief)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 250 NOTICE by United States Department of Justice re May 24 Hearing (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 249 REPLY (re 222 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 242 filed byRoyal Dutch Shell PLC. (Crimmins, Brendan) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 248 REPLY (re 220 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 242 filed byRoyal Dutch Shell PLC. (Frederick, David) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 247 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING HEARINGS ON MAY 24, 2018: The hearings scheduled for May 24 will proceed as scheduled at 8:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 246 Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (237 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA, 198 in 3:17-cv-06012-WHA) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 245 Brief of the United States as Amicus Curiae In Support of Dismissal filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Ennis, Christine) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 244 REPLY (re 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byBP P.L.C.. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 243 REPLY (re 225 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byChevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 242 REPLY (re 222 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ) filed byRoyal Dutch Shell PLC. (Crimmins, Brendan) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 241 REPLY (re 220 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Reply On Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byConocoPhillips. (Morris, George) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 10, 2018 Filing 240 REPLY (re 221 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byExxon Mobil Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration of Dawn Sestito)(Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 239 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING HEARINGS ON MAY 24, 2018: This notice is to advise the parties that the Court may be in trial on May 24, 2018 at 8:00 a.m. Should the trial proceed as scheduled, the Court will reschedule all 8:00 a.m. hearings to 2:00 p.m. The parties should be prepared to proceed at either time on May 24. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING 236 STATES' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 237 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 5/14/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 236 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs filed by State of California. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/10/2018. Replies due by 5/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zonana, David) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 235 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 225 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byThe People of the State of California. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 234 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 222 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ) filed byThe People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2-10)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 233 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 221 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byThe People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, # 2 Exhibit 1-8)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 232 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 220 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) filed byThe People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, # 2 Exhibit 1-10)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 231 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byThe People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, # 2 Exhibit 1-2)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING 229 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY AVI GARBOW by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 229 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Regarding Avi Garbow (Corrected) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12202381.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/20/2018 filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Garbow, Avi) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 228 ERRATA re 189 Transcript,,, Notice of Errata re Tutorial Transcript by Chevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING 224 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 226 SECOND NOTICE RE BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/24/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 225 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaints; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Chevron Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Replies due by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to File filed by State of Indiana. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fisher, Thomas) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Molnar Fisher, Fishe (Fisher, Thomas) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 222 MOTION to Dismiss FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Replies due by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Linda Szymanski, # 3 Declaration of Rachel Marshall, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B)(Crimmins, Brendan) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 221 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Replies due by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dawn Sestito in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 220 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by ConocoPhillips. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Replies due by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Morris, George) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BP P.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/3/2018. Replies due by 5/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William Jeffries, # 2 Declaration of Donna Sanker, # 3 Declaration of John Lombardo, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING 214 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONSIDER WHETHER TO PARTICIPATE AS AMICUS CURIAE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 217 Certificate of Interested Entities by ConocoPhillips OR PERSONS OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS (Miller-Stratton, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 216 Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS by ConocoPhillips. (Miller-Stratton, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Allen Miller-Stratton CAROL M. WOOD, TRACIE J. RENFROE, GEORGE R. MORRIS, MEGAN R. NISHIKAWA, and JUSTIN A. TORRES for Defendant CONOCOPHILLIPS (Miller-Stratton, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 214 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Amicus Brief filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Ennis, Christine) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER GRANTING 211 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW ELLIOTT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER GRANTING 210 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY THOMAS FISHER by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 211 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26946F2B.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/172018 filed by State of Indiana. (Elliott, Matthew) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 210 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12278660.) filed by State of Indiana. (Fisher, Thomas) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE RE TIMELINE FOR AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/17/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 208 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The People of the State of California. ConocoPhillips served on 4/5/2018, answer due 4/26/2018. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/4/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 206 RESPONSE to re 178 Order by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 205 Statement re 178 Order Responding to Court Order at docket #178 by BP P.L.C.. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 204 Summons Issued as to ConocoPhillips. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 203 Statement re 178 Order Responding to Court Order at docket #178 by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 202 RESPONSE to re 197 Order Plaintiffs' Response to Notice Re Amended Complaints by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 201 RESPONSE to COURT'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS RE MARCH 21, 2018 TUTORIAL by ConocoPhillips Company. (Miller-Stratton, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 200 Proposed Summons. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 199 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Public Nuisance against All Defendants. Filed byThe People of the State of California. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 198 CLERK'S NOTICE: Due to an unforeseen equipment failure, the video recorded of the March 21 Climate Change Tutorial as part of the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project did not result in usable footage. Accordingly, no video recording will be published. Transcripts of the proceeding are available from the assigned court reporter, Kathy Wyatt. For information on how to order a transcript, please click the hyperlink: https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE RE AMENDED COMPLAINTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/3/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steve W. Berman (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE by The People of the State of California Notice of Intent to Amend Complaint (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 194 RESPONSE to re 182 Order Plaintiff's Response to Court's Request for Comment Regarding Service of Process on Royal Dutch Shell PLC by The People of the State of California. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 193 RESPONSE to re 182 Order re Request for Comment by Defendants by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Collins, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 192 NOTICE RE BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/27/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2018 Filing 191 Statement re 170 Response ( Non Motion ), 184 Order Special Statement In Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Now-Granted Motion to File Amici Curiae Brief by Christopher Monckton. (Braden, James) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING 188 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY HARRY W. MACDOUGALD by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 189 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-21-18, before Judge Willam Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 125 Transcript Order, 177 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (Related documents(s) 125 , 177 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 188 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12210201.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/21/2018 filed by Concerned Household Electricity Consumers Council. (MacDougald, Harry) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DENYING 181 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY HARRY MACDOUGALD PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING 172 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING 157 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT PRESENTATION OF AMICI CURIAE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING 153 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE by The People of the State of California Plaintiff's Notice of Submission of Materials Presented at March 21, 2018 Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 182 REQUEST FOR COMMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12210201.) filed by Concerned Household Electricity Consumers Council. (MacDougald, Harry) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/21/2018 before Judge William Alsup by The People of the State of California, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 179 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation Notice of Submission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS RE TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/21/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/21/2018 before Judge William Alsup by Christopher Monckton, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Braden, James) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/21/2018 before Judge William Alsup by BP P.L.C., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 175 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 21, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Chevron Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Tutorial Hearing held on 3/21/2018. Tutorial comprised of two segments. Plaintiff and Defendant each allowed one hour for discussion per segment. As stated on the record, Defendants are ordered to file a statement no later than two (2) weeks from today, noon. Total Time in Court: 4 Hours; 33 Minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Steve Berman, Matthew Pawa, Barbara Parker, Erin Bernstein, Malia McPherson, Maria Bee, Matthew Goldberg, Robb Kapla. Defendants' Attorneys: Thoedore J. Boutrous, William Thomson, Joshua Lipshutz, Andrea Neuman, Anne Champion, Johnny Carter, Joel Silverstein, Carol Wood, Goerge Morris, Jerome Roth, Elizabeth Kim, Brendan Crimmins, Jonathan Hughes, Matthew Heartney, Dawn Sestito, Thoedore Wells, Jr., Nora Ahmed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 173 Certificate of Interested Entities by Concerned Household Electricity Consumers Council (Cordero, Charles) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 172 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Concerned Household Electricity Consumers Council. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/4/2018. Replies due by 4/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cordero, Charles) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER DENYING 162 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY AVI GARBOW PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 170 RESPONSE to re 153 Notice of Appearance, 157 MOTION for Leave to File Presentation In Response to the Court's Tutorial Questions Plaintiff's Response to Motions to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Tutorial Presentation, and Statement of Nonopposition by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Szymanski, # 3 Declaration of Marshall, # 4 Exhibit A to Marshall Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Marshall Declaration)(Crimmins, Brendan) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dawn Sestito, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 167 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DEFENDANT BP P.L.C.'s NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by BP P.L.C.. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jeffries Decl, # 2 Declaration Sanker Decl, # 3 Declaration Lombardo Decl, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 166 RESPONSE to re 158 Order Questions by Court re Proposed Amici Curiae by Christopher Monckton. (Braden, James) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ConocoPhillips Company. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wood, Carol) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 164 RESPONSE to re 158 Order Request for Information re Amicus Curiae Materials by William Happer. (Illovsky, Eugene) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING 161 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 162 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Regarding Avi Garbow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12202381.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Garbow, Avi) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 161 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 160 filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Kim, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 160 STIPULATION Regarding Format for Briefing on Motions to Dismiss filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Kim, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 159 MOTION to Dismiss / DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Chevron Corporation. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 158 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION RE AMICUS CURIAE MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/19/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 157 MOTION for Leave to File Presentation In Response to the Court's Tutorial Questions filed by William Happer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Illovsky, Eugene) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING 155 JOINT STIPULATION RE USE OF EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM FOR THE TUTORIAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING USE OF EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM FOR THE TUTORIAL filed by Chevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by George Ruben Morris for ConocoPhillips Company (Morris, George) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by James McCarty Braden Motion for Leave To File Amici Curiae Brief for Monckton, et al (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Braden, James) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING 151 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID K. SUSKA PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 151 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David K Suska ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12194256.) filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Suska, David) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 150 Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (120 in 3:17-cv-06012-WHA, 139 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE FOR TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/15/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 146 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRENDAN J. CRIMMINS PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING 145 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID C. FREDERICK PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brendan J. Crimmins [Corrected] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12182836.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/13/2018 filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Crimmins, Brendan) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 145 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David C. Frederick [Corrected] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12182763.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/13/2018 filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frederick, David) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING 142 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRENDAN J. CRIMMINS PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING 141 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID C. FREDERICK PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brendan J. Crimmins ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12182836.) filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Crimmins, Brendan) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for David C. Frederick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12182763.) filed by Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Frederick, David) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE by The People of the State of California re 138 Order Notice of Filing of Requeted Documents for the Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 8, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Tutorial Hearing set for 3/21/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 139 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 3/21/2018 08:00 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 3/14/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 138 SOME QUESTIONS FOR THE TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/6/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND INVITING UNITED STATES TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/1/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (afmS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re 135 Order: Tutorial Hearing set for 3/21/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) Modified on 3/8/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2018 Filing 135 NOTICE RE TUTORIAL Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER DENYING 81 MOTION TO REMAND by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 19, 2018 Filing 133 Supplemental Brief re 131 Supplemental Brief, [Correction of Dkt. 131] Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Brief on Navigable Waters of the United States filed byThe People of the State of California. (Related document(s) 131 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/19/2018)
February 19, 2018 Filing 132 RESPONSE to re 130 Supplemental Brief by BP P.L.C., Chevron Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Royal Dutch Shell PLC. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 2/19/2018)
February 19, 2018 Filing 131 ERRONEOUSLY FILED. DISREGARD Supplemental Brief re 130 Supplemental Brief Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Brief on Navigable Waters of the United States filed byThe People of the State of California. (Related document(s) 130 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/19/2018) Modified on 2/20/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2018 Filing 130 Supplemental Brief re 128 Order Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief on Navigable Waters of the United States filed byThe People of the State of California. (Related document(s) 128 ) (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 129 RESPONSE to re 128 Order Defendants' Response to Request for Supplemental Briefing (ECF 128) by Chevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 128 REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/12/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 127 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 8, 2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (125 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) Transcript Order, (126 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2018. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/8/2018 before Judge William Alsup by The People of the State of California, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Pawa, Matthew) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 8, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Chevron Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2018 re ( 64 in 3:17-cv-06012-WHA) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The People of the State of California, ( 81 in 3:17-cv-06011-WHA) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The People of the State of California: Motions taken under submission. FTR Digital Time: 01:58 - 02:46. Plaintiff Attorneys: Steve Berman, Matt Pawa, Matt Goldberg, Rob Kaplan, Erin Bernstein. Defendant Attorneys: Jonathan Hughes (BP); Carol Wood, Tracie Renfroe (Conoco); Jaren Janghorbani, Theodore Wells, Dawn Sestito (Exxon); Daniel Collins, Jerome Roth (Shell); Theodore Boutrous (Chevron). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2018) Modified on 2/9/2018: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2018 Filing 123 Response re 118 Notice (Other) / EXXONMOBIL'S Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding byExxon Mobil Corporation. (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 122 Response re 118 Notice (Other) / DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING byChevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 121 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26(f) Report [JOINT] filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery and Pre-Trial Schedule, # 2 Proposed Order)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 120 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING TIME OF MOTION AND CASE MANAGEMENT HEARINGS: The Court is unavailable at the 8:00 a.m. setting due to a trial setting. The Initial Case Management Conference and 81 Motion to Remand, 64 Motion to Remand are RESET for 2/8/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Briefing schedules remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 119 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 1/30/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 22, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE by The People of the State of California Plaintiffs' Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Verified Petition)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 117 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) with Attachment (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 115 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiff The People of the State of California (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 114 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 113 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Miller-Stratton, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 112 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lombardo, John) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 111 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 110 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Royal Dutch Shell plc and Counsel (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Allen Miller-Stratton OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS A. MILLER-STRATTON FOR DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Miller-Stratton, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 15, 2018 Filing 108 REPLY (re 81 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court filed byThe People of the State of California. (Berman, Steve) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 107 Summons Issued as to Statoil ASA. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 106 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Chevron Corporation as to Statoil ASA. (Diehl, Kemper) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 105 Proposed Summons. (Diehl, Kemper) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
December 28, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brent Adamson (Adamson, Michael) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Judge William Alsup granting (102) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-06011-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-06011-WHA, 3:17-cv-06012-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 28, 2017 Filing 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Change to Briefing Schedule filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew Pawa)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 27, 2017 Filing 101 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARINGS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 64 Motion to Remand, 81 Motion to Remand, and Initial Case Management Conference RESET for 2/8/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2018 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Briefing schedule remains unchanged for motions. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 100 ERRATA re 91 Declaration in Opposition, Notice of Errata in J. Keith Couvillion Declaration in Support of Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A in Support)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 88 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL ADAMSON by Judge William Alsup.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-06011-WHA, 3:17-cv-06012-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING 87 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ERICA HARRIS by Judge William Alsup.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-06011-WHA, 3:17-cv-06012-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation re 49 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Change of Designated Local Co-Counsel (Carter, Johnny) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 96 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation re 72 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Change of Designated Local Co-Counsel (Shepard, Steven) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation Change of Designated Local Co-Counsel (Diehl, Kemper) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation re 33 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice CHANGE OF DESIGNATED LOCAL CO-COUNSEL (Stern, Herbert) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 93 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation re 34 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice CHANGE OF DESIGNATED LOCAL CO-COUNSEL (Silverstein, Joel) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 81 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED JOINT OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND filed byChevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 91 DECLARATION of J. KEITH COUVILLION in Opposition to 81 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed byChevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 81 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 90 DECLARATION of WILLIAM E. THOMSON in Opposition to 81 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed byChevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 81 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 89 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 81 MOTION to Remand to State Court ) DEFENDANTS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO REMAND filed byChevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11961026.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Adamson In Support of Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Adamson, Michael) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Erica Harris ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11960072.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Manne, Neal) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan (Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 85 Third Party Summons Issued as to Statoil ASA. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 84 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT CHEVRON CORPORATION FOR INDEMNITY AND CONTRIBUTION AGAINST THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT STATOIL ASA against Statoil ASA. Filed byChevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Manne, Neal) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup denying (82) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-06011-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-06011-WHA, 3:17-cv-06012-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anne Champion in Support)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 21, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re (64 in 3:17-cv-06012-WHA) MOTION to Remand to State Court Remand Hearing set for 1/25/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The People of the State of California. Responses due by 12/18/2017. Replies due by 1/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO ENLARGE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS AS MODIFIED by Judge William Alsup granting as modified (79) Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-06011-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-06011-WHA, 3:17-cv-06012-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Change to Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anne Champion, # 2 Declaration of Matthew Pawa)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING 77 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY KEMPER P. DIEHL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/13/2017.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11872733.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/13/17 filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Diehl, Kemper) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 76 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore-- MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11872733.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Diehl, Kemper) (Filed on 11/13/2017) Modified on 11/13/2017 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Stuart Manne (Manne, Neal) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by Royal Dutch Shell PLC (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Cary Roth [also for Elizabeth A. Kim and Daniel P. Collins] (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 70 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY STEVEN M. SHEPARD. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/9/2017.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/8/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Steven M. Shepard ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11862371.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shepard, Steven) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 57 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY THEODORE WELLS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 59 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JAREN JANGHORBANI. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING 58 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY DANIEL TOAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 (DISREGARD. SEE 67 ) ORDER GRANTING 57 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY DANIEL TOAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017) Modified on 11/7/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 46 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JUSTIN A. TORRES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING 45 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY CAROL M. WOOD. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 44 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY TRACIE J. RENFROE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING 40 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY STEVE W. BERMAN. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 39 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW F. PAWA. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 52 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY BENJAMIN A. KRASS by Judge William Alsup.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11850791.) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Janghorbani, Jaren) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11850752.) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Toal, Daniel) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11850708.) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Wells, Theodore) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 56 Certificate of Interested Entities by Exxon Mobil Corporation / Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Sestito (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Randall Oppenheimer (Oppenheimer, Mark) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin A. Krass [Corrected] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11830345.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/26/2017 filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Krass, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY STEVE BERMAN by Judge William Alsup granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW PAWA by Judge William Alsup granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JOHNNY CARTER by Judge William Alsup granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY BENJAMIN KRASS by Judge William Alsup denying 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY ANNE CHAMPION by Judge William Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11848505.) filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Torres, Justin) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11848484.) filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Wood, Carol) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11848442.) filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Renfroe, Tracie) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Nishikawa, Megan) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Company. (Nishikawa, Megan) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan R Nishikawa (Nishikawa, Megan) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman [Corrected] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11822220.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/24/2017 filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew F. Pawa [Corrected] ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11825058.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/25/2017 filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pawa, Matthew) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW PAWA PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup denying 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) .
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PHILIP CURTIS PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY NANCY MILBURN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEVE BERMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup DENYING 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017).
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOEL SILVERSTEIN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY HERBERT STERN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge William Alsup granting 31 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION to Relate Case filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Relate Cases)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron Corporation re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 26 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, 16 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Proof of Service of Supplemental Documents (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11830536.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Carter, Johnny) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin A. Krass ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11830345.) filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Krass, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco, before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/25/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice regarding Anne Champion ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11826112.) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edward Thomson for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Thomson, William) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Ellen Neuman (Neuman, Andrea) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan D. Dettmer (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/25/17. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew F. Pawa ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11825058.) filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pawa, Matthew) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 16 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (tnS) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Philip H. Curtis for Defendant BP P.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11823206.) filed by BP P.L.C.. (Curtis, Philip) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Nancy Milburn for Defendant BP P.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11823173.) filed by BP P.L.C.. (Milburn, Nancy) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael S Shen for Defendant BP P.L.C. (Shen, Rachael) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Lombardo for Defendant BP P.L.C. (Lombardo, John) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Heartney for Defendant BP P.L.C. (Heartney, Matthew) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by BP P.L.C. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steve W. Berman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11822220.) filed by The People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berman, Steve) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 8 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6-1(A) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chevron Corporation.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE filed by Chevron Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action With State Court (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A in Support)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11817770) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order)(Silverstein, Joel) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11817720) filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Standing Order)(Stern, Herbert) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/3/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Chevron Corporation identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Chevron Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG17875889, (Filing Fee: $400.00 receipt number 0971-11813623). Filed by Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William E. Thomson, # 2 Exhibit A to Thomson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Thomson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Thomson Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Thomson Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Thomson Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Thomson Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Thomson Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Thomson Declaration, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 10/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People of the State of California v. BP P.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Maria Bee
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Erin Brianna Bernstein
Represented By: Benjamin A. Crass
Represented By: Emerson Hilton
Represented By: Wesley Kelman
Represented By: Benjamin Krass
Represented By: Matthew F. Pawa
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP P.L.C.
Represented By: Philip H. Curtis
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Represented By: Nancy G. Milburn
Represented By: Rachael S Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Johnny William Carter
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Ethan D. Dettmer
Represented By: Kemper Diehl
Represented By: Erica W. Harris
Represented By: Neal Stuart Manne
Represented By: Andrea Ellen Neuman
Represented By: Steven M. Shepard
Represented By: Joel M. Silverstein
Represented By: Herbert J Stern
Represented By: William Edward Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Megan R Nishikawa
Represented By: Tracie Jo Renfroe
Represented By: Justin Torres
Represented By: Carol Margaret Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Jaren Janghorbani
Represented By: Mark Randall Oppenheimer
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Represented By: Daniel John Toal
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Represented By: Daniel Paul Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Represented By: Jerome Cary Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?