Sullivan et al v. Bay Area Rapid Transit
Plaintiff: Clark Sullivan, James Blair, Toan Nguyen, Arika Miles and Adam Bredenberg
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit and City of Berkeley
Case Number: 3:2017cv06051
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER RE 227 MOTION TO RETAX COSTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE 139 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 117 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REQUEST FOR INFORMATION FOLLOWING VIEWING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/3/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 93 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RE 62 67 MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/24/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan et al v. Bay Area Rapid Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Sullivan
Represented By: EmilyRose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blair
Represented By: EmilyRose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toan Nguyen
Represented By: EmilyRose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arika Miles
Represented By: EmilyRose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Bredenberg
Represented By: EmilyRose Naomi Johns
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly Ying-Yen Chin
Represented By: Mark F. Hazelwood
Represented By: Victoria Rose Nuetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Lynne Sarah Bourgault
Represented By: Savith S Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?