Epic Games, Inc. et al v. Mendes et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc. and Epic Games International S.A.R.L.
Defendant: James Mendes, Konstantin Vladimirovich Rak and Olekseevich Stegailo
Case Number: 3:2017cv06223
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2017 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Andrew Nicholas Klein (Klein, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 3, 2017 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc... (Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 1, 2017 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Holly Simpkins representing Plaintiffs' Epic Games, Inc. and Epic Games International S.A.R.L. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Holly M. Simpkins ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11843293.) filed by Epic Games International S.A.R.L., Epic Games, Inc.. (Simpkins, Holly) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 27, 2017 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 7 Summons Issued as to James Mendes, Konstantin Vladimirovich Rak, Olekseevich Stegailo. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Tencent Holdings, Ltd. for Epic Games, Inc.. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Epic Games International S.A.R.L. identifying Corporate Parent Epic Games, Inc. for Epic Games International S.A.R.L.. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2 Proposed Summons. (Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against James Mendes, Konstantin Vladimirovich Rak, Olekseevich Stegailo ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11832724.). Filed byEpic Games, Inc., Epic Games International S.A.R.L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Lauren) (Filed on 10/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. et al v. Mendes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Beth Cohen
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Klein
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games International S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Lauren Beth Cohen
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Klein
Represented By: Holly Marie Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mendes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Vladimirovich Rak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olekseevich Stegailo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?