Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Freedom Debt Relief, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Defendant: Freedom Debt Relief, LLC and Andrew Housser
Case Number: 3:2017cv06484
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATED Final Judgment and Order signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #90 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment and Order)(Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 89 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held 6/25/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel report that parties have finalized settlement agreement. Counsel shall file stipulation to dismiss by 7/9/2019. FTR Time: 10:52 - 10:54 Plaintiff Attorney: Max Peltz Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Anand RamanDefendant Housser Attorney: Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 88 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held on 5/14/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel report that the parties continue to make progress toward finalizing a settlement agreement. A further telephonic status hearing is set for 6/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 6/25/2019: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 10:26 - 10:32Plaintiff Attorney: Max Peltz Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Anand RamanDefendant Housser Attorney: Anand Raman (specially appearing) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 87 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/23/2019 10:10:04 AM ]. File Size [ 1184 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:28 ]. (courtspeak).
April 24, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing Telephone Status Conference set for 5/14/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 86 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held on 4/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel advise the Court that they have moved passed the technical aspects of the settlement agreement and that they expect to finalize within three weeks. The stay is extended until 5/14/2019. A further telephonic status hearing is set for 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 5/14/2019: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 10:10 - 10:12Plaintiff Attorney: Max PeltzDefendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Anand Raman. Defendant Housser Attorney: Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Administratively Terminating Pending Motions to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 84 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/19/2019 10:19:44 AM ]. File Size [ 2736 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:42 ]. (courtspeak).
March 19, 2019 Filing 83 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held on 3/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel advise the Court that the parties continue to work toward settlement; that they are currently working on the more technical aspects of the agreement. A further telephonic status hearing is set for 4/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 4/23/2019: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 10:20 - 10:25 Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell Peltz Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorneys: Joseph Barloon and David Carney (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Stay of Proceedings and Continue Telephonic Status Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #81 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 81 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 80 Status Conference,,,, Set Hearings,,, filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 80 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held on 1/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel advise the Court that the parties are still working toward settlement. This action is stayed until 2/26/2019. A further telephonic status hearing is set for 2/26/2019 at 10:00 am. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 2/26/2019: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 3:36 - 3:40 Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell PeltzDefendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Joseph BarloonDefendant Housser Attorney: Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2019)
December 20, 2018 Filing 79 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held on 12/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel advise the Court that productive discussions are ongoing. A further telephonic status hearing is set for 1/22/2019 at 3:00 pm. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 1/22/2019: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 11:05 - 11:07 Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell PeltzDefendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Anand RamanDefendant Housser Attorney: Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2018)
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/20/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 78 Minute Entry for telephonic status hearing held on 11/27/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel advise the Court that productive discussions between the parties regarding stipulated judgment are ongoing. A furthertelephonic status hearing is set for 12/20/2018 at 10:30 AM. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 12/20/2018: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 10:10 - 10:12 Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell Peltz Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Joseph BarloonDefendant Housser Attorney: Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/27/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 77 Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 11/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties have a settlement in principal which they hope to finalize by the end of the month. A telephonic status hearing is set for 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM. The parties shall utilize the following dial in information in order to appear telephonically on 11/27/2018: dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 537 9839. FTR Time: 10:49 - 10:51 Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell Peltz (telephonic appearance) Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Joseph Barloon (telephonic appearance) Defendant Housser Attorney: Raphael Goldman (telephonic appearance) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 76 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/6/2018 10:49:28 AM ]. File Size [ 1064 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:13 ]. (courtspeak).
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Stipulation to Stay Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified #74 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings and [Proposed] Order filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 73 Supplemental Brief re #60 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed byAndrew Housser. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 72 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint ) Supplemental Brief filed byConsumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte regarding motions to dismiss. Hearing held. As discussed at the hearing the parties shall submit further briefing, of up to five pages each, on or before 9/26/2018. The Court shall set case management deadlines and dates and will take into account the dates proposed by the parties. FTR Time: 2:11 - 3:14 Plaintiff Attorneys: Maxwell Peltz, Christopher Deal, and Hai Nguyen Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorney: Joseph BarloonDefendant Housser Attorney: Cristina Arguedas and Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2018)
August 31, 2018 Filing 70 REPLY in Support (re #61 MOTION to Dismiss CFPB's First Amended Complaint ) filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2018 Filing 69 REPLY in Support (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint ) filed by Andrew Housser. (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 8/31/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Deal (Deal, Christopher) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 67 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byConsumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Dismiss CFPB's First Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byConsumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 65 AMENDED #36 JOINT COMBINED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, RULE 26 (f) REPORT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 8/9/2018) Modified on 8/10/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2018 Filing 64 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PENDING DISCOVERY-RESPONSE DEADLINES BY 30 DAYS filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Barloon, Joseph) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte:granting #62 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 62 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #57 Order on Stipulation, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Responses due by 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joint Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss CFPB's First Amended Complaint filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 7/20/2018. Replies due by 7/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Andrew Housser. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 8/10/2018. Replies due by 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arguedas, Cristina) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham Mendez Andrade, III (Andrade, Abraham) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Maxwell Singer Peltz Lawrence D. Brown no longer represent Plaintiff (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Amended Joint Stipulation to Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified #56 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Joint Stipulation to Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants. Filed byConsumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Filing of First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #53 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, for Filing of First Amended Complaint filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: Status Conference held on 5/15/2018. Plaintiff shall file motion for leave to amend complaint in approximately two weeks (approximately 5/30/2018). There is no stay on discovery. FTR Time: 10:09-10:25. Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell Peltz Defendant Attorney: Cristina Arguedas, Joseph Barloon (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2018)
May 13, 2018 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Following Settlement Conference by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 5/13/2018)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Request for Defendant Freedom Debt Relief, LLC's Counsel to Appear Telephonically signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 49 Proposed Order re #42 Order,, Set Hearings, Request and [Proposed] Order for Defendant Freedom's Counsel to Appear Telephonically at CMC by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Barloon, Joseph) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Settlement Conference held on 5/8/2018: No settlement; No further discussions planned; parties may request a further conference upon reasonable notice. Attorneys for CFPB: Matthew Peltz, Hai Binh T. Nguyen, Patty Hensler. Attorneys for Andrew Housser: Cristina Arguedas, Raphael Goldman. Attorneys for Freedom Debt Relief: Joseph Barloon, Allen Ruby. (FTR Time: Not recorded.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Telephone Conference held on 5/3/2018: Case remains set for settlement conference 5/8 San Jose. Attorney for CFPB: Max Peltz. Attorney for A. Housser: Cris Arguedas.Attorneys for Freedom Debt Relief: Joseph Barloon, Allen Ruby. FTR Time: Not recorded. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 Filing 46 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Telephone Conference for 5/3/2018 11:30 AM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel provided with dial-in number for this conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 45 Minute Entry for further case management conference held on proceedings held 3/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Court confirms with counsel that the parties are on track with a plan that is expected to take them through to the settlement conference. FTR Time: 10:12 - 10:15Plaintiff Attorneys: Maxwell Peltz, Lawrence Brown, and Patricia Hensler Defendant Freedom Debt Relief Attorneys: Joseph Barloon and Jonah Van ZandtDefendant Housser Attorneys: Cristina Arguedas and Raphael Goldman (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference for 5/8/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED ORDER Setting Deadlines for Meet and Confer Efforts Regarding Discovery to be Exchanged Prior to Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 3/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. A Status Conference is set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 28, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Deadlines for Meet and Confer Efforts Regarding Discovery to be Exchanged Prior to Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 40 Minute Entry for case management conference held on 2/27/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for the purpose of engaging in a settlement conference. And the parties shall conduct phased discovery prior to the settlement conference. FTR Time: 10:08 - 10:27 & 10:58 - 11:16 Plaintiff Attorney: Maxwell Peltz Defendant Andrew Housser's Attorneys: Cristina Arguedas and Raphael GoldmanDefendant Freedom Debt Relief's Attorney: Joseph Barloon (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2018)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #38 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PROPOSED ORDER filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 37 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 2/13/2018 by Tamara Lange. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 13, 2018 Filing 36 JOINT COMBINED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 2/13/2018) Modified on 2/14/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2018 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE: The hearing on the motions to dismiss #33 & #34 are rescheduled to 4/17/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss , Joinder, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Andrew Housser. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/5/2018. Replies due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arguedas, Cristina) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/5/2018. Replies due by 3/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Andrew Housser (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Freedom Debt Relief (Barloon, Joseph) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 30 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, February 13, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) filed on behalf of all parties (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation to Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #26 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 4, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss with Proposed Order filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
December 29, 2017 Filing 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 26, 2017 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) Declaration of Lawrence D. Brown filed byConsumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ) Opposition to Motion to Stay filed byConsumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kate Fulton)(Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the hearing on the motion to stay proceedings #19 is rescheduled to 1/16/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 21 By Freedom Debt Relief, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/12/2017) Modified on 12/13/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2017 Filing 20 Proposed Order re #19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/26/2017. Replies due by 1/2/2018. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Service waived by Andrew Housser waiver sent on 11/22/2017, answer due 1/22/2018. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Service waived by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC waiver sent on 11/22/2017, answer due 1/22/2018. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC.. (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Housser.. (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #9 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #8 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #7 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Raphael M. Goldman for defendant Andrew Housser (Goldman, Raphael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina C. Arguedas for defendant Andrew Housser (Arguedas, Cristina) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11923234.) filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Raman, Anand) (Filed on 12/4/2017) Modified on 12/5/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11923176.) filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barkmeyer, John) (Filed on 12/4/2017) Modified on 12/5/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph L. Barloon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11923080.) filed by Freedom Debt Relief, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barloon, Joseph) (Filed on 12/4/2017) Modified on 12/5/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Ruby (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau.. (Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 2/20/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Case Management Statement is now due by 2/13/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/8/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/22/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 *** FILED IN ERROR, PLS DISREGARD***Electronic Filing Error. Filing Fee NOT paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017) Modified on 11/8/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing Fee - of $400.00: WAIVED); (NO PROCESS); against All Defendants. Filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peltz, Maxwell) (Filed on 11/8/2017) Modified on 11/8/2017 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/9/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Freedom Debt Relief, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Debt Relief, LLC
Represented By: John Barkmeyer
Represented By: Joseph L Barloon
Represented By: Anand S Raman
Represented By: Abraham Mendez Andrade, III
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Housser
Represented By: Cristina C. Arguedas
Represented By: Raphael M. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Maxwell Singer Peltz
Represented By: Lawrence D. Brown
Represented By: Patricia Hensler
Represented By: Christopher J. Deal
Represented By: Hai Binh Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?