Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley v. Napolitano et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley
Defendant: Janet Napolitano, Carol Christ and Stephen Sutton
Case Number: 3:2017cv06899
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2018 48 Featured Case ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/15/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 11, 2018 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Khader Kakish, Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
April 27, 2018 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2018. The parties advised that they have reached an agreement in principle and will be filing a stipulation with the district court to continue dates. The settlement conference shall go forward on June 5 at 2:00 p.m. if the parties need additional assistance to finalize the settlement. (Not Reported)(Time: 5 mins.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Tyson Langhofer.Attorney for Defendant: Joshua Foust. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2018)
April 20, 2018 45 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the in-person settlement conference currently scheduled for June 5, 2018 is continued to June 13, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
March 29, 2018 44 Featured Case ORDER re 43 . The parties' proposed deadlines are fine. The hearing on the motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 40 ) is continued to 6/7/2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/29/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 26, 2018 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Proceedings on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Carol Christ, Anthony Garrison, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2018. Parties to submit stipulation to the district court to stay motion to dismiss proceedings while settlement discussions are pending. Further call April 27, 2018 at 11 a.m. to determine status of discussions. If case does not resolve, in person settlement conference to occur on June 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. (Not Reported)(Time: 35 mins)Attorney for Plaintiff: Caleb Dalton.Attorney for Defendant: Joshua Foust. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2018)
March 22, 2018 41 Request for Judicial Notice re 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (6)) filed byCarol Christ, Anthony Garrison, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 40 ) (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1), (6)) filed by Carol Christ, Anthony Garrison, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/5/2018. Replies due by 4/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Marissa Reynoso in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Marissa Reynoso, # 15 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 12, 2018 39 NOTICE by Khader Kakish, Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a) (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 38 Summons Issued as to Anthony Garrison (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018) Modified on 3/15/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2018 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/8/2018. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Vicki Eastvold. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2018)
March 8, 2018 36 Proposed Summons. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byYoung Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley, Khader Kakish. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 7, 2018 34 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 3/6/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 1, 2018 33 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 28, 2018 32 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Travis C. Barham. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12143623.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Barham, Travis) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 30 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Viceas to Tyson C. Langhofer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Liu, Belinda) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 28 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on March 6, 2018 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 27 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Attestation of Signatories)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 23, 2018 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12135725.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Langhofer, Tyson) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 22, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER re 19 . The initial case management conference and associated deadlines will not be continued. The parties' proposed deadline for defendants to respond to the complaint is fine. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 21, 2018 23 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 8, 2018 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda Y. Liu (Liu, Belinda) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 21 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Daniel Sharp (Sharp, J.) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Thomas Foust on behalf of Defendants Janet Napolitano, Carol Christ, and Stephen Sutton (Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Carol Christ, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua Thomas Foust in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Foust, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 5, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
January 23, 2018 17 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. Responses due by 2/6/2018. Replies due by 2/13/2018. (Mattox, Michael) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 5, 2018 16 STIPULATION to Set Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Carol Christ, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (Everitt, Jeslyn) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
December 21, 2017 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons Returned Executed Christ, # 2 Summons Summons Returned Executed Sutton)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 12, 2017 14 Summons Issued as to Carol Christ, Janet Napolitano, Stephen Sutton. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 13 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Cortman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 12 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Napolitano, # 2 Summons Sutton)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 7, 2017 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David A. Cortman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11933736.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cortman, David) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 5, 2017 9 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Casey Mattox. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 8 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Donato terminating 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Caleb Dalton. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 4, 2017 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley (Renberg, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11924153.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/04/2017 filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11924189.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mattox, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11924153.) filed by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Dalton, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 3 Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley . (Renberg, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11922142.). Filed byYoung Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Renberg, Michael) (Filed on 12/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Americans for Liberty at University of California, Berkeley
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Represented By: Jonathan Caleb Dalton
Represented By: Michael Casey Mattox
Represented By: Michael Loren Renberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Christ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?