American Lung Association et al v. Pruitt et al

Plaintiff: American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, American Thoracic Society, Appalachian Mountain Club, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, West Harlem Environmental Action and Center For Biological Diversity
Defendant: Scott Pruitt and Environmental Protection Agency
Movant: State of California
Case Number: 3:2017cv06900
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2018 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Attorney's Fees. Motions due by 8/6/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
March 28, 2018 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 78 Stipulation to extend deadline to respond Re Docket No. 77 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 26, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Motions due by 6/25/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 12, 2018 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' (docket no. 11 in case 4:17-cv-06900-HSG and docket no. 43 in case 4:17-cv-06936-HSG) MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 6, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 66 Motion to Continue. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
February 16, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Re: Michael J. Fischer. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 6, 2018 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 10, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Administrative Motion for extension of time to respond to 37 administrative motion and 11 motion for summary judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
December 15, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should BeRelated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Lung Association et al v. Pruitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lung Association
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Thoracic Society
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Appalachian Mountain Club
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Rachel E Fullmer
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Peter Michel Zalzal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Scott Ray Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Harlem Environmental Action
Represented By: Paul Robert Cort
Represented By: Laura Dumais
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center For Biological Diversity
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pruitt
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: State of California
Represented By: Timothy Eugene Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?