Sgarlata v. PayPal Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Sgarlata
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc., Daniel H. Schulman, John D. Rainey, Jr. and Hamed Shahbazi
Case Number: 3:2017cv06956
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by PayPal Holdings, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 6, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Edwin K. Bell, Michael Eckert. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
March 30, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018) Modified on 3/30/2018 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MARCH 15, 2018 HEARING. COUNSEL FOR ALL INTERESTED PARTIES SHOULD BE PREPARED TO DISCUSS HOW TO PROCEED IN LIGHT OF FACT THAT SOLE MOVANT DOES NOT APPEAR TO BE MEMBER OF PUTATIVE CLASS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on March 8, 2018. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
February 27, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Supplemental Briefing by Friday, Mar. 2, 2018 re 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Edwin K. Bell. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on February 27, 2018. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sgarlata v. PayPal Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sgarlata
Represented By: J Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Rainey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamed Shahbazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?