Swarmify, Inc. v. CloudFlare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Swarmify, Inc.
Defendant: CloudFlare, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv06957
Filed: December 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2018 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge William Alsup granting in part 156 Motion for Attorney Fees.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
May 31, 2018 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/31/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
April 3, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 56 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 21, 2018 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 2, 2018 88 Opinion or Order of the Court (PUBLIC REFILING OF 83 pursuant to 84 ) ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 16, 2018 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 72 LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/16/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swarmify, Inc. v. CloudFlare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swarmify, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Hodge
Represented By: Mieke Katherine Malmberg
Represented By: Paul Joseph Skiermont
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Spires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CloudFlare, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Callahan
Represented By: Brett Maurice Charhon
Represented By: Anthony Matthew Garza
Represented By: Teri H.P. Nguyen
Represented By: Margaux Azurin Savee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?