Harvey v. Apple Inc.

Plaintiff: Keaton Harvey
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Movant: Nicole Gallmann, Alain Liebermann and Romeo James Alba
Case Number: 3:2017cv07274
Filed: December 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2018 112 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 18-cv-03989 NC and 17-cv-07274 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/16/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
May 15, 2018 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING Notice of Dismissal ECF 106 . Motions terminated as MOOT due to Dismissal Order: as to 104 Motion to Appear by Telephone, 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery filed by Keaton Harvey, 67 Adminis tration Motion to Extend Time of Filing of Plaintiff's Reply Brief and Order Apple to Refrain from Destroying Evidence re 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery filed by Keaton Harvey, and 62 Stipula tion and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Keaton Harvey filed by Keaton Harvey. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. ALL DEADLINES/HEARINGS ARE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) Modified text on 5/15/2018 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2018 98 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 17-cv-07274 EJD and 18-cv-02167 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/24/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
March 15, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:18-cv-01632-HRL and 5:17-cv-07274-EJD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/15/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 14, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:18-cv-01585-HRL and 5:17-cv-07274-EJD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/14/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 1, 2018 87 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:18-cv-01339-HRL and 5:17-cv-07274-EJD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/1/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 15, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 17-cv-07274 EJD and 18-cv-00833 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/15/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 7, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-00771 NC and 17-cv-07274 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/7/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:18-cv-00735-HRL and 5:18-cv-00760-HRL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/6/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 25, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 17-cv-07274 EJD and 18-cv-00283 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/25/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-440. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/23/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 5:18-cv-00241-HRL, 5:18-cv-00305-HRL, 5:18-cv-00338-HRL, 5:18-cv-00371-HRL, 5:18-cv-00385-HRL, 5:18-cv-00499-HRL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/23/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keaton Harvey
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Fazio
Represented By: Amy E. Keller
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Dina Elizabeth Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Represented By: Theane Evangelis Kapur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Nicole Gallmann
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alain Liebermann
Represented By: Quentin Alexandre Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Romeo James Alba
Represented By: Quentin Alexandre Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?