Brown v. Danone North America, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Crystal Brown
Defendant: Danone North America, LLC and Whitewave Foods Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv07325
Filed: December 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Crystal Brown filed by Crystal Brown. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint Or, In the Alternative, To Stay The Case Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss and Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Crystal Brown. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Danone North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Brown
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Kasie Moore Braswell
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Peter B. Fredman
Represented By: Leslie E. Hurst
Represented By: Daniel Brian Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danone North America, LLC
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitewave Foods Company
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?