In re : German Automotive Manufacturers Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Gabriel Briscoe, Marilyn Fong, Travis Burton, Steven Lewis, Staci Blevins, Gina F. Florens, Dean Werner, Madison Food Corp., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc., Debra Lenke, Simon Barker, Oren Arbit, Harriet Ann Slawsby, Michael Hoar, Jacqueline Kebart, Frank Palumbo, Estate Motors, Inc., Juan Barrera, Angela J. Frost, DP Plaintiffs, Jacobo Florens, Richard Haugan, Sergey Bogomolov, Biltrite Furniture, Inc., Taylor Ayes, Michelle Martin, Natalie Collins, Tom Schmidt, Gaurav Sharma, Christopher Kurek, Mark Rosen, Victor Vilaplana, Victor Kremer, Saad Ehtisham, Jill Thompson, Frederick Thomas, Amir Berenjian, Marc Katz, Dale Talbot, Mary Kathlene Harmon, Jerry Wilkerson, John R. Antonini, IPP Plaintiffs, Michael Vigorito, Kunal Patel, Team Imports, LLC, Donald Dutton, Renee Newton, Audubon Imports, LLC, Edwin Herbert Stanley, Kashivishnatha Kotha, Mark Undestad, Lonny Gold, April Starlight, Tyler Carver, Miles Rosen, Steven Summer, Dajana Spasojevic, Anthony Hughes, Maria C. Paterno, Elsa Ortiz, Rosa Dzubak, Dennis Lane, Alan Cordover, Scott Wyatt, Elie Sasson, Irving Cohen, Glen Reder, Robert Pasternak, Rudolf Grodzen, Robert E. Caldwell, Tracy Childress, Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Vinod Marur, Baily Brownell, Derek Beachum, David Hofman, Romeo James Alba, Clay Hooper, Bennett Leiser, Elizabeth Gumb, Hamid Berenjian, William Bankhead Nelson, Frederick C. Hawkins, III, John A. DeVito, Holly Buffinton, Myron Natwick, Maria Renard, Powders Automobiles, Inc., Edna Parker and Vikram Chatrath
Defendant: : German Automotive Manufacturers Antitrust Litigation, Audi of America, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Volkswagen AG, Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC, Robert Bosch GmbH, BMW AG, Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc., Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Daimler AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi AG, Audi of America, LLC, BMW North America, LLC, Daimler North America Corporation, Bentley Motors Limited, BMW (US) Holding Corp., Daimler Aktiengesellschaft and Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Consolidated Plaintiff: Robert B. Kinkade
Case Number: 3:2017md02796
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 426 REPLY (re #410 MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byBMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 425 REPLY (re #409 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byBMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendices of State Law (A-C))(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 424 REPLY (re #411 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAudi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jerome Nolan (Nolan, Thomas) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
December 18, 2019 Filing 422 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG for Withdrawal of Counsel, Matthew A. Goldberg (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Matthew) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 421 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG for Withdrawal of Counsel, William F. Kiniry, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiniry, William) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 420 Request for Judicial Notice re #419 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bundeskartellamt Nov. 21, 2019 Press Release, #2 Exhibit Bundeskartellamt July 12, 2018 Press Release)(Related document(s) #419 ) (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 419 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #409 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byDP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 418 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #411 MOTION to Dismiss ) (Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Volkswagen, Audi, and Porsche Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed byDP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 417 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #410 MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byDP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 416 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #409 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byIPP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - State Law Antitrust Claims, #2 Appendix B-State Consumer Protection Law Claims, #3 Appendix C-Unjust Enrichment Claims)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 415 NOTICE by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Woody) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 414 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #403 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 412 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 4 and 5 filed by Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Exhibits, #4 Unredacted Exhibits)(Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 10/14/2019) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2019 Filing 411 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 10/14/2019) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2019 Filing 410 MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 409 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #391 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and #392 Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #401 Administrative Motion Regarding Page Limits for the Parties' Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 407 NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Finkelman Bennett (Bennett, Natalie) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 406 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #401 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION regarding Page Limits for the Parties' Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ) filed byDP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 405 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 404 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 403 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 402 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 401 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION regarding Page Limits for the Parties' Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth H. Yandell, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 400 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Rose (Rose, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Frances Hynes (Hynes, Samantha) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 398 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda F. Davidoff (Davidoff, Amanda) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by Suhana S. Han (Han, Suhana) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Holley (Holley, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon L. Nelles (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 394 NOTICE by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vishio, Miriam) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 393 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bruce Lee Simon (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 392 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Direct Purchaser First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byDP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 391 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byIPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #389 Stipulation Extending the Deadline to File Amended Class Action Complaints. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2019. Motions due by 10/14/2019. Oppositions due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 389 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extending the Deadline to File Amended Class Action Complaints filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren T. Burns)(Burns, Warren) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 388 NOTICE by Amir Berenjian, Hamid Berenjian, Mark Undestad Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #321 Joint Motion to Dismiss; denying #339 Individual Motion to Dismiss; denying #340 Individual Motion to Dismiss; denying #341 Individual Motion to Dismiss; denying #345 Individual Motion to Dismiss; denying #377 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - Re #381 Notice (Other) filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/28/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Joesph H. Meltzer by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #382 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE of Change In Counsel and [PROPOSED] Order by Andrew Bennett Spark for Plaintiffs Simon Barker, Holly Buffinton, and Mary Harmon (Spark, Andrew) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/17/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Filing 383 NOTICE by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder of Withdrawal of Apperance of Anna M. Horning Nygren (Horning Nygren, Anna) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 382 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Joseph H. Meltzer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13303459.) filed by Anthony Hughes, Robert B. Kinkade. (Meltzer, Joseph) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 381 NOTICE by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG [of Withdrawal of Counsel] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kerner, Justin) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A Justice and Change of Firm Affiliation (Justice, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
March 27, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jill Michelle Manning (Manning, Jill) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 378 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #377 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of #321 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints ) filed byIPP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 377 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of #321 Joint Motion to Dismiss the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints filed by BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Brief, #2 Declaration of Belinda Lee, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Rita Jovais on behalf of Defendants BMW AG, BMW of North America, LLC and BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Jovais, Alicia) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 375 Joint Appendices re #361 Opposition/Response to Motion, #364 Reply to Opposition/Response, #321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints, #360 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byIPP Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #361 , #364 , #321 , #360 ) (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 1/23/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2019 Filing 374 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTIONS TO DISMISS HEARING (ECF Nos. 321, 339, 340, 341, and 345) on February 12, 2019 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. The Court will reschedule the hearing at a later date if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
November 27, 2018 Filing 373 NOTICE by Vikram Chatrath, Irving Cohen, Rudolf Grodzen, Clay Hooper, Kashivishnatha Kotha, Christopher Kurek, Dean Werner, Scott Wyatt Notice of Withdrawal of Jack Atnip, III (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hagstrom, Richard) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
October 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints, #340 MOTION to Dismiss, #339 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can be Granted, #341 MOTION to Dismiss, #345 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 372 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTIONS TO DISMISS HEARING (ECF Nos. 321, 339, 340, 341, 345) set for October 15, 2018. Motion hearing reset to February 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 371 NOTICE by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder for Withdrawal of Kristen G. Marttila (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marttila, Kristen) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 370 NOTICE by Dajana Spasojevic re Change of Phone Number by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 369 REPLY (re #341 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAudi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 368 REPLY (re #340 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byBMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 367 REPLY (re #339 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can be Granted ) filed byDr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kiniry, William) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 366 REPLY (re #345 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDaimler AG. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 365 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Individual Motions to Dismiss filed byDP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #362 ) (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 15, 2018 Filing 364 REPLY (re #321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints ) filed byBMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 363 NOTICE by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and [Proposed] Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holman, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 23, 2018 Filing 362 OMNIBUS OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #345 MOTION to Dismiss , #340 MOTION to Dismiss , #341 MOTION to Dismiss , #339 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can be Granted ) filed byDP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 7/23/2018) Modified on 7/24/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The correct event is found under the "Motions and Related Filings/Other Supporting Documents" category. [err101]C orrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #361 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by IPP Plaintiffs (mclS, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2018 Filing 361 Appendices in Support of #360 Opposition (re #321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints ) filed byIPP Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 7/16/2018) Modified on 7/17/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2018 Filing 360 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints ) filed byDP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints, #340 MOTION to Dismiss , #339 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can be Granted, #341 MOTION to Dismiss , #345 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 "AS MODIFIED" - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS SCHEDULE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #358 Modified Stipulation. Motion to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 321, 339, 340, 341, 345) Hearing reset for 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 358 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Motions to Dismiss Schedule and Form of Opposition to Individual Motions to Dismiss filed by IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, John S. Marrese by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #355 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Kyle Pozan by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #354 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 355 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12413183.) filed by IPP Plaintiffs. (Marrese, John) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 354 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12413160.) filed by IPP Plaintiffs. (Pozan, Kyle) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Korey A. Nelson by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #350 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Amanda K. Klevorn by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #349 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 351 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS MERCEDES-BENZ U.S. INTERNATIONAL, INC., MERCEDES BENZ VANS, LLC, AND DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #346 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 350 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12397846.) filed by Audubon Imports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nelson, Korey) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 349 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12397801.) filed by Audubon Imports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Klevorn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Brian R. Meiners by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #344 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Christopher C. Yook by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #343 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 346 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #241 Amended Complaint, #244 Amended Complaint Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Mercedes-Benz U.S. International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC, and Daimler North America Corporation Without Prejudice filed by DP Plaintiffs, IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 345 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daimler AG. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/23/2018. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 344 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12389870.) filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Meiners, Brian) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 343 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12389823.) filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yook, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Elizabeth A. Rose by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #334 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 341 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/23/2018. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 340 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/16/2018. Replies due by 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 339 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaints for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief Can be Granted filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/23/2018. Replies due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kiniry, William) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #337 Stipulation Regarding Deadline for Daimler Defendants' Individual Motion to Dismiss. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 337 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadline for Daimler Defendants' Individual Motion to Dismiss filed by Daimler AG, Daimler North America Corporation, Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 336 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFING ON VOLKSWAGEN AND AUDI DEFENDANTS INDIVIDUAL MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #335 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 335 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 334 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12376229.) filed by Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rose, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 333 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Justin Edward Kerner by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #332 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 332 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Justin Kerner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12369983.) filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kerner, Justin) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Matthew A. Goldberg by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #323 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, William F. Kiniry, Jr. by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #322 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 329 Certification of Interested Entities and Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Daimler AG (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 5/21/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2018 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bryan Wolfson , Shon Morgan, Richard I. Werder,Jr, Josef Ansorge (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Grantz (Grantz, Jenny) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Knapp (Knapp, Eric) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Kemner (Kemner, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Masami Yoshino (Yoshino, Troy) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 323 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Matthew Goldberg) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12366463.) filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldberg, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 322 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (William F. Kiniry, Jr.) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12366352.) filed by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kiniry, William) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 321 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #241 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' and #244 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaints filed by BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW AG, BMW North America, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/16/2018. Replies due by 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Appendices A, B and C, #2 Proposed Order)(Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 320 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG, Other Affiliate Porsche Zwischenholding Stuttgart GmbH for Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG. (Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman A Armstrong, Jr and Alan R. Dial (Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 318 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BMW (US) Holding Corp., Other Affiliate BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, Other Affiliate BMW International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft ("BMW AG") for BMW North America, LLC. [Amended] (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 317 Certificate of Interested Entities by Audi AG identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Audi AG. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 316 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW (US) Holding Corp. identifying Other Affiliate BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, Other Affiliate BMW International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft ("BMW AG") for BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 315 Certificate of Interested Entities by Volkswagen AG and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 314 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW AG (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon L. Nelles (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Hays Yandell on behalf of Defendants BMW AG, BMW of North America, LLC and BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Yandell, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Holley (Holley, Steven) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by Suhana S. Han (Han, Suhana) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lacovara on behalf of Defendants BMW AG and BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Lacovara, Michael) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda S Lee on behalf of Defendants BMW AG and BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda F. Davidoff (Davidoff, Amanda) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Murray Wall on behalf of Defendants BMW AG and BMW (US) Holding Corp. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Frances Hynes (Hynes, Samantha) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 14, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The Correct Event is 'SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED' found under the Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process cat egory. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #302 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #304 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #298 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #299 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #300 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #303 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #297 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs, #301 Affidavit of Service, filed by DP Plaintiffs (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 304 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Consolidated Class Action Complaint served on Catherine Kleifges as Legal Technician & Authorized Agent of Volkswagen Group of America, d/b/a Volkswagen of America, Inc. on 4/4/2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 303 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Consolidated Class Action Complaint served on Anna Livado as Administrative Assistant To Ceo for MERCEDES - BENZ VANS, LLC on 4/5/2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 302 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Consolidated Class Action Complaint served on Jane Richardson on behalf of CT Corp., Registered Agent of Mercedez-Benz USA, LLC, on 4/10/2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 301 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Consolidated Class Action Complaint served on Jane Richardson on behalf of CT Corp., Registered Agent of Daimler North America Corporation, on 4/10/2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 300 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Consolidate Direct Purchaser Class Action Complaint and Jury Trial Demand served on Barry Chen, Authorized Agent of BMW of North America, LLC, on 4/9/2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 299 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Consolidated Direct Purchaser Class Action Complaint served on Catherine Kleifges as Legal Technician & Authorized Agent of Audi of America, LLC on April 04, 2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 298 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Direct Purchaser Class Action Complaint and Jury Trial Demand served on Barry Chen, Authorized Agent of BMW (US) Holding Corp. on 04/09/2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2018 Filing 297 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Consolidated Direct Purchaser Class Action Complaint and summons served on Catherine Kleifges as Legal Technician & Authorized Agent of Audi of America, Inc. on April 04, 2018, filed by DP Plaintiffs. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2018) Modified on 5/14/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING: (1) SERVICE; (2) MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING AND PAGE LIMITS; AND (3) STAY OF DISCOVERY by Judge Charles R. Breyer: granting #295 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 295 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding: (1) Service; (2) Motion to Dismiss Briefing and Page Limits; and (3) Stay of Discovery filed by BMW North America, LLC. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 22, 2018 Filing 294 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-19-18, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #292 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (Related documents(s) #292 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/19/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by IPP Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 291 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/19/2018. Counsel shall submit a stipulation and proposed scheduling order. (Total Time in Court: 13 Minutes) Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiff Attorneys: Christopher T. Micheletti, Warren Burns, James R. Martin, John Marrese, Matthew S. Weiler, Bethany L. Caracuzzo, Melissa R. Emert, Amanda Klevorn, Anna M. Horning, Kimberly Justice, Allan Steyer, Bruce L. Simon, Michael H. Pearson and Neil Swartzberg. Defendant Attorneys below: BMW: Daniel Wall and Belinda S. Lee Mercedes Benz: Shon Morgan VW Audi: Sharon L. Nelles and Steven L. Holley Porsche: Norman Armstrong, Jr. Daimler: Troy M. Yoshino and Adam Wolfson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 290 Certificate of Interested Entities by Audubon Imports, LLC, Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Estate Motors, Inc., Powders Automobiles, Inc., Tom Schmidt, Team Imports, LLC Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 289 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMW North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate BMW (US) Holding Corp., Other Affiliate BMW INTEC Beteiligungs GmbH, Other Affiliate BMW International Holding B.V., Other Affiliate BMW Beteiligungs GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft ("BMW AG") for BMW North America, LLC. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 288 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPP Plaintiffs. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 287 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPP Plaintiffs. Audi of America, LLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 286 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPP Plaintiffs. Audi of America, Inc. served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 285 Statement Joint Statement by IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 284 Certificate of Interested Entities by Audi of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for Audi of America, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 283 Certificate of Interested Entities by Audi of America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. for Audi of America, LLC. (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 282 Certificate of Interested Entities by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Nelles, Sharon) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 281 Certificate of Interested Entities by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Ing. h.c.F Porsche AG, Other Affiliate Volkswagen AG, Other Affiliate Porsche Nordamerika Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate PPF Holding AG, Other Affiliate by Porsche Enterprises Incorporated, Other Affiliate Porsche Zwischenholding Stuttgart GmbH for Porsche Cars of North America, Inc.. (Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 280 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Kemner (on behalf of Defendants MERCEDES-BENZ U.S. INTERNATIONAL, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MERCEDES-BENZ VANS, LLC, and DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION) (Kemner, Matthew) (Filed on 4/13/2018) Modified on 4/13/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2018 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Grantz (ON BEHALF OF MERCEDES-BENZ U.S. INTERNATIONAL, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, MERCEDES-BENZ VANS, LLC, and DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION) (Grantz, Jenny) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 278 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Daimler North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Daimler AG for Daimler North America Corporation. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Knapp (ON BEHALF OF DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION) (Knapp, Eric) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Kemner (Kemner, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Masami Yoshino (ON BEHALF OF DAIMLER NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION) (Yoshino, Troy) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 274 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc.. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 273 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 272 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Mercedes Benz USA, LLC. (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bryan Wolfson , Richard I Werder, Shon Morgan, Josef Ansorge (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #268 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Case Management Statement. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 269 Declaration of Neil Swartzberg in Support of #268 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Joint Case Management Statement filed byIPP Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #268 ) (Swartzberg, Neil) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 268 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Joint Case Management Statement filed by IPP Plaintiffs. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Alan R. Dial by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #263 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 266 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPP Plaintiffs. Audi of America, LLC served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 265 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IPP Plaintiffs. Audi of America, Inc. served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 264 Certificate of Interested Entities by IPP Plaintiffs (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12237217.) filed by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc.. (Dial, Alan) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 262 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. BMW (US) Holding Corp. served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 261 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 260 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 259 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc. served on 3/27/2018, answer due 4/17/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 258 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. Mercedes Benz USA, LLC served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 257 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. BMW North America, LLC served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 256 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Reder. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #132 Notice (Other) filed by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #131 Notice (Other) filed by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #130 Notice (Other) filed by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re #129 Notice (Other) filed by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Nicholas S. Cheolas by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #248 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 250 Summons Issued as to Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW North America, LLC, Daimler AG, Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Daimler North America Corporation. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 249 Summons Issued as to Audi AG, Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, BMW (US) Holding Corp., BMW North America, LLC, Daimler AG, Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG, Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC, Porsche Cars of North America, Inc., Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Bayerische Motoren Werke AG. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 248 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12192897.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cheolas, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glen Reder (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 246 Proposed Summons. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 245 Civil Cover Sheet by Audubon Imports, LLC . (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 244 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Direct Purchaser Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byAudubon Imports, LLC. (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 243 Proposed Summons. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 242 Civil Cover Sheet by Glen Reder . (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 241 AMENDED COMPLAINT INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byGlen Reder. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC of withdrawal for attorney Matthew Boucher and [PROPOSED] Order (Roberti, John) (Filed on 2/12/2018) Modified on 2/13/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #237 Stipulation To Continue Initial Case Status Conference. Joint Written Statement due by 4/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 237 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Status Conference filed by BMW North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Belinda S Lee)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 2/7/2018) Modified on 2/7/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2018 Filing 236 Amended Pretrial Order No. 5 - Protocol for Work Performed and Expenses Incurred. (Attachment: #1 Revised Template Time Report) (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 235 Letter from Bruce L. Simon re: Pretrial Order No. 5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF PRO HAC VICE, Andrew Bennett Spark by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #230 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 233 Pretrial Order No. 5: Protocol for Work Performed and Expenses Incurred. (Attachments: #1 Template Time Report) (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 232 Letter from Bruce L. Simon & Warren Burns re: Proposed Pretrial Order No. 5. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 231 Proposed Pretrial Order No. 5: Protocol For Work Performed And Expenses Incurred by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 15, 2018 Filing 230 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected - original already granted) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11901989.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/26/2916 filed by Simon Barker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar)(Spark, Andrew) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #228 Motion for Pro Hac Vice: Morgan W. Streetman. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 Filing 228 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Morgan W. Streetman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11989096.) filed by Simon Barker. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(Streetman, Morgan) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 26, 2017 Filing 227 NOTICE by Robert E. Caldwell, Tracy Childress, Saad Ehtisham, Michael Hoar, David Hofman, Debra Lenke, Elsa Ortiz, April Starlight, Frederick Thomas re #54 Order, Notice of Removal from ECF Service List (Relkin, Ellen) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #225 Motion for Pro Hac Vice: Charles D. Gabriel. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 225 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11968635.) filed by Powders Automobiles, Inc., Tom Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gabriel, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4: INITIAL AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINES, INITIAL CASE STATUS CONFERENCE, AND REQUEST FOR PROPOSED PROTOCOL FOR COMMON BENEFIT WORK AND EXPENSES: Consolidated Class Action Complaint due by 3/15/2018. Answer, Move to Dismiss, or otherwise response to consolidated class action complaint due by 5/17/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order with a Proposed Protocol for common benefit work and expenses due by 1/19/2018. A Joint Written Statement due by 3/30/2018. Status Conference set for 4/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/20/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Pretrial Order No. 3: Order Appointing Lead Counsel and Steering Committee Members. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Dennis George by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #208 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Andrew C. Egan by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #205 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jeffrey M. Scafaria by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #204 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 219 Letter from Stuart G. Gross in Further Support of Applications for Leadership. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 218 Letter from Lynn Lincoln Sarko re Response in Support of Application for Plaintiffs' Leadership. (Sarko, Lynn) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 217 Letter re Response in Support of Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 216 Letter from Lesley E. Weaver re Response in Support of Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel or Steering Committee Member. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 215 Letter from David Casey in support of Lesley Weaver for a leadership role. (Casey, David) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 214 Letter from Melissa R. Emert-Response in Support of Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 213 Letter from Fred Taylor Isquith Re. Response in Support of Application for Leadership. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 212 Letter from James R. Martin regarding Response in support of Application for Leadership. (Martin, James) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 211 Letter Brief from Bruce L. Simon - Response in Support of Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed byLonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 210 Letter from Eric L. Chase in further support of class leadership application. (Egan, Andrew) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 209 Letter Brief re #155 Letter Brief Reply in Support of Appointment of W. Joseph Bruckner and Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P. to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed byLonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Related document(s) #155 ) (Bruckner, W.) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 208 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11937444.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)(George, Dennis) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 207 Letter from Allan Steyer Attorney for Plaintiff Glen Reder . (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 206 Letter from Steven A. Hart Re Supplemental Letter in Support for Plaintiff Lead Counsel and Plaintiff Steering Committee Appointments . (Hart, Steven) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 205 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11936404.) filed by Estate Motors, Inc., Team Imports, LLC. (Egan, Andrew) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 204 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11934250.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)(Scafaria, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Ronald J. Campione by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #199 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017) Modified on 11/30/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Ronald J. Campione by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #198 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017) Modified on 11/30/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORENEY PRO HAC VICE, Anne T. Regan by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #197 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORENEY PRO HAC VICE, Andrew B. Spark by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #195 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 199 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 266A3E79.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/30/2017 filed by Estate Motors, Inc.. (Campione, Ronald) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 198 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11913820.) filed by Team Imports, LLC. (Campione, Ronald) (Filed on 11/30/2017) Modified on 11/30/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2017 Filing 197 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11907635.) filed by Vikram Chatrath, Irving Cohen, Rudolf Grodzen, Clay Hooper, Kashivishnatha Kotha, Christopher Kurek, Dean Werner, Scott Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Regan, Anne) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 196 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 26, 2017 Filing 195 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11901989.) filed by Simon Barker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar)(Spark, Andrew) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
November 21, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE by BMW North America, LLC of Withdrawal and [Proposed] Order (Arouh, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Michael M. Buchman by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #189 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Steven A. Hart by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #154 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Natalie Finkelman Bennett by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #153 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jayne A. Goldstein by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #152 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 189 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael M. Buchman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11892133.) filed by Elizabeth Gumb, Maria C. Paterno. (Buchman, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 188 Letter from Stuart G. Gross re: Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resume of Stuart G. Gross, #2 Exhibit B - List of Plaintiffs' Counsel Supporting Application)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 187 Letter from Steven A. Hart Re: Application for Leadership . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Professional Summary, #2 Exhibit B - List of Counsel Supporting Appointment)(Hart, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 186 Letter from Michael M. Buchman re Application for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee Member. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cope, Breanne) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 185 Letter from David S. Casey, Jr. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Curriculum Vitae)(Casey, David) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 184 Letter from Josef D. Cooper re Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 183 Letter from Lynn Lincoln Sarko in Response to Pretrial Order No. 1 Re: Plaintiffs' Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A- Resume, #2 Attachment B- List of Supporting Counsel)(Sarko, Lynn) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 182 Letter from Rosemary M. Rivas re: Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume & Biography, #2 Exhibit B - List of Counsel Supporting Application)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 181 Letter from Joseph R. Saveri re Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel or Steering Committee Member. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 180 Letter from Lesley E. Weaver re Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel or Steering Committee Member. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 179 Letter from Melissa R. Emert re: Application for Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 178 Letter from Elizabeth J. Cabraser re Application for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel or Steering Committee Member. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 177 Letter from Jayne A. Goldstein Regarding Application for Leadership . (Goldstein, Jayne) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 176 Letter from James E. Cecchi re: Application for Appointment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) Resume, #2 Exhibit (B) List of Counsel Supporting Application)(Cecchi, James) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 175 Letter from Elizabeth C. Pritzker re. Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, with Certificate of Service)(Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 174 Letter from Bruce L. Simon re: Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel and Alternately, Steering Committee . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 173 Letter from Todd M. Schneider re: Application for Leadership. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 172 Letter from Jennie Lee Anderson re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resume of Jennie Lee Anderson, #2 Exhibit B - Counsel Supporting Application)(Anderson, Jennie) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 171 Letter from John R. Malkinson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malkinson, John) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 170 Letter from Roxanne Barton Conlin re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Supplement C.V. of Roxanne Barton Conlin, #2 Supplement Attorneys Supporting This Application, #3 Supplement Letter of Support from Judge Rosenberg)(Conlin, Roxanne) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 169 Letter from Glen DeValerio re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(DeValerio, Glen) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 168 Letter from Richard M. Hagstrom re: Application for Appointment to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee . (Hagstrom, Richard) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 167 Letter from Warren T. Burns re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resume of Warren T. Burns, #2 Exhibit 2 - Counsel Supporting Appointment)(Burns, Warren) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 166 Letter from Fred Taylor Isquith for Appointment As A Member Of Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, with Certificate of Service)(Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 165 Letter from James R. Martin regarding Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Martin, James) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 164 Letter re: Appointment to Plaintiff's Steering Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resume of Paul F. Novak, #2 Exhibit Persons/Firms Supporting Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.)(Novak, Paul) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 163 Letter from Derek Y. Brandt Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brandt, Derek) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 162 Letter from Christopher A. Seeger regarding Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Resume, #2 Exhibit B- Counsel Supporting Appointment)(Seeger, Christopher) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 161 Letter from Paul J. Geller re: Application for Leadership. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 160 Letter from Allan Steyer re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Professional Summary & Representative Actions, #2 Exhibit B - List of Counsel Supporting Appointment)(Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 159 Letter from Dan Drachler re Application for Leadership. (Drachler, Dan) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 158 Letter from Edelson & Associates, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Edelson, Marc) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 157 Letter from W. Daniel "Dee" Miles, III re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summary of Qualifications and MDL Leadership Experience, #2 Exhibit 2 - Supporting References)(Miles, Wilson) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 156 Letter from Kimberly A. Justice re: Application for Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Professional Summary & Representative Actions, #2 Exhibit B - Counsel Supporting Appointment)(Justice, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 155 Letter Brief re #4 Order for Appointment of W. Joseph Bruckner and Lockridge Grindal Nauen to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed byLonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Bruckner, W.) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 154 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11883645.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Hart, Steven) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 153 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Natalie Finkelman Bennett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11883464.) filed by Jacqueline Kebart. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bennett, Natalie) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 152 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jayne A. Goldstein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11883317.) filed by Jacqueline Kebart. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldstein, Jayne) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. McCune, Jr (McCune, Richard) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek Yeats Brandt (Brandt, Derek) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Lawrence (Lawrence, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Tavares Burns (Burns, Warren) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Eric L. Chase by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #137 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Roxanne B. Conlin by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2017. Granting #136 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Derek Y. Brandt by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #135 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Scott D. Gilchrist by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #128 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 142 NOTICE by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 141 Letter from Eric Chase re: Application for Lead Counsel . (Kershaw, William) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 140 *** FILED IN ERROR,REFER TO DOCUMENT #141 *** Letter from Eric Chase re: Application for Lead Counsel. (Chase, Eric) (Filed on 11/14/2017) Modified on 11/14/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Michael Hagstrom (Hagstrom, Richard) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan Drachler and Certificate of Service (Drachler, Dan) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 137 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11876051.) filed by ESTATE MOTORS INC., TEAM IMPORTS, LLC. (Chase, Eric) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 136 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11875242.) filed by Oren Arbit, Audubon Imports, LLC, Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc., Taylor Ayes, Simon Barker, Juan Barrera, Amir Berenjian, Hamid Berenjian, Biltrite Furniture, Inc., Staci Blevins, Sergey Bogomolov, Gabriel Briscoe, Baily Brownell, Holly Buffinton, Travis Burton, Robert E. Caldwell, Tyler Carver, Vikram Chatrath, Tracy Childress, Irving Cohen, Natalie Collins, Alan Cordover, Donald Dutton, Rosa Dzubak, Saad Ehtisham, Gina F. Florens, Jacobo Florens, Marilyn Fong, Lonny Gold, Rudolf Grodzen, Elizabeth Gumb, Mary Kathlene Harmon, Richard Haugan, Frederick C. Hawkins, III, Michael Hoar, David Hofman, Clay Hooper, Anthony Hughes, Jacqueline Kebart, Kashivishnatha Kotha, Victor Kremer, Christopher Kurek, Dennis Lane, Bennett Leiser, Debra Lenke, Steven Lewis, Madison Food Corp., Michelle Martin, Vinod Marur, Myron Natwick, William Bankhead Nelson, Renee Newton, Elsa Ortiz, Frank Palumbo, Edna Parker, Robert Pasternak, Kunal Patel, Maria C. Paterno, Glen Reder, Maria Renard, Mark Rosen, Miles Rosen, Elie Sasson, Gaurav Sharma, Harriet Ann Slawsby, Edwin Herbert Stanley, April Starlight, Steven Summer, Dale Talbot, Frederick Thomas, Jill Thompson, Mark Undestad, Michael Vigorito, Victor Vilaplana, Dean Werner, Jerry Wilkerson, Scott Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Conlin, Roxanne) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 135 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11873314.) filed by Jill Thompson. (Brandt, Derek) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Randall MacBride (MacBride, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 133 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 10, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 10, 2017 Filing 131 NOTICE by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 10, 2017 Filing 130 NOTICE by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 10, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE by Porsche Cars of North America, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Norman) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 128 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11867021.) filed by Bennett Leiser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilchrist, Scott) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Warren T. Burns by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #118 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jonathan R. MacBride by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Lacovara on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Lacovara, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda S Lee on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 9, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Murray Wall on behalf of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 122 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Ross Gervey (Gervey, Gabriel) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole E. Glauser (Glauser, Nicole) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bennett Thompson (Thompson, William) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 118 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Warren T. Burns ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11857338.) filed by Audubon Imports, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Burns, Warren) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 117 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11855640.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(MacBride, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Michael R. Cashman by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #102 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Gabriel R. Gervey by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Nicole E. Glauser by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #99 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Dan Drachler by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jana B. Steenholdt by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Matthew R. Boucher by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Daniel A. Holman by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, John Roberti by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Melissa Robin Emert by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Marc H. Edelson by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #84 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Christopher A. Seeger by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #83 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, James E. Cecchi by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #82 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, David R. Buchanan by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Scott A. George by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 102 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11850816.) filed by Rudolf Grodzen, Kashivishnatha Kotha. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cashman, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Vincent Goodpastor (Goodpastor, Christopher) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11847743.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gervey, Gabriel) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11847649.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Certificate of Good Standing)(Glauser, Nicole) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Dan Drachler ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11847380.) filed by Renee Newton. (Drachler, Dan) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11847057.) filed by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. (Steenholdt, Jana) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11847023.) filed by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. (Boucher, Matthew) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11846997.) filed by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. (Holman, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11846952.) filed by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. (Roberti, John) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 93 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #95 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alan Holman (Holman, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 Filing 92 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #96 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R Boucher (Boucher, Matthew) (Filed on 11/2/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 Filing 91 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #94 *** NOTICE of Appearance by John Roberti (Roberti, John) (Filed on 11/2/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 Filing 90 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #97 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Jana Steenholdt (Steenholdt, Jana) (Filed on 11/2/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 Filing 89 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11846587.) filed by Gina F. Florens, Jacobo Florens. (Attachments: #1 certificate of good standing)(Emert, Melissa) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Gast Marttila (Marttila, Kristen) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Marie Horning Nygren (Horning Nygren, Anna) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Shelquist (Shelquist, Robert) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Joseph Bruckner (Bruckner, W.) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844103.) filed by Simon Barker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Edelson, Marc) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844014.) filed by Juan Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seeger, Christopher) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11844009.) filed by Renee Newton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cecchi, James) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11843946.) filed by Juan Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Buchanan, David) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Rebecca Scullion (Scullion, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11842884.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/01/2017 filed by Juan Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(George, Scott) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Gregory Stamatopoulos by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Anna M. Horning Nygren by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Samantha F. Hynes by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Amanda F. Davidoff by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 74 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11842455.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/1/2017 filed by Robert E. Caldwell, Tracy Childress, Saad Ehtisham, Michael Hoar, David Hofman, Debra Lenke, Elsa Ortiz, April Starlight, Frederick Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule A, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Stamatopoulos, Gregory) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 73 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11842455.) filed by Robert E. Caldwell, Tracy Childress, Saad Ehtisham, Michael Hoar, David Hofman, Debra Lenke, Elsa Ortiz, April Starlight, Frederick Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule A, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Stamatopoulos, Gregory) (Filed on 11/1/2017) Modified on 11/2/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Anna M. Horning Nygren ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11842367.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Horning Nygren, Anna) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Steven L. Holley by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Suhana S. Han by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Kristen G. Marttila by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Robert K. Shelquist by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, W. Joseph Bruckner by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Joshua H. Eggnatz by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, David Stellings by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11841001.) filed by Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hynes, Samantha) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Richard M. Hagstrom by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11840751.) filed by Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Davidoff, Amanda) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11840665.) filed by Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holley, Steven) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11840584.) filed by Audi of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Parties Represented, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Han, Suhana) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kristen G. Marttila ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11840318.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Marttila, Kristen) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert K. Shelquist ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11840304.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Shelquist, Robert) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice W. Joseph Bruckner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11840276.) filed by Lonny Gold, Glen Reder. (Bruckner, W.) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua H. Eggnatz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11839033.) filed by Alan Cordover, Robert Pasternak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Eggnatz, Joshua) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 27, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David S. Stellings ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11831981.) filed by Renee Newton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stellings, David) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING ELLEN RELKINS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS - Re #47 Notice (Other), filed by Tracy Childress, Michael Hoar, Debra Lenke, April Starlight, Frederick Thomas, Robert E. Caldwell, David Hofman, Saad Ehtisham, Elsa Ortiz. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/27/2017. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Woody N. Peterson by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Joshua H. Grabar by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Glen DeValerio by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Daryl Andrews by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Diana Gjonaj by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11829829.) filed by Vikram Chatrath, Irving Cohen, Rudolf Grodzen, Kashivishnatha Kotha, Christopher Kurek, Dean Werner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hagstrom, Richard) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE by Robert E. Caldwell, Tracy Childress, Saad Ehtisham, Michael Hoar, David Hofman, Debra Lenke, Elsa Ortiz, April Starlight, Frederick Thomas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Withdraw of Counsel Ellen Relkin)(Novak, Paul) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11828619.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Peterson, Woody) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Michael S. Feldberg by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11827677.) filed by Simon Barker, Holly Buffinton, Mary Kathlene Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Grabar, Joshua) (Filed on 10/25/2017) Modified on 10/26/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11826101.) filed by Madison Food Corp., Harriet Ann Slawsby. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(DeValerio, Glen) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11826070.) filed by Madison Food Corp., Harriet Ann Slawsby. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Andrews, Daryl) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Masami Yoshino (Yoshino, Troy) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11824243.) filed by Robert E. Caldwell, Tracy Childress, Saad Ehtisham, Michael Hoar, David Hofman, Debra Lenke, Elsa Ortiz, April Starlight, Frederick Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Gjonaj, Diana) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #36 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Kimberly A. Justice. Order signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE: Paul J. Geller. Order granting #26 signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 36 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly Justice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11823520.) filed by Anthony Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Justice, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Wilson McClelland Dunlavey (Dunlavey, Wilson) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Michael Harvey (Harvey, Dean) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Patrick Glackin (Glackin, Brendan) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fastiff (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC; Porsche Cars North America, Inc.; BMW of North America, LLC; Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Volkswagen of America, Inc. and d/b/a Audi of America, Inc. on 10/3/17, 10/3/17, 10/5/17, 10/4/17, filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc., Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Martin, James) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 29 Letter from James R. Martin clarifying request regarding appointment of lead counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Martin, James) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11822150.) filed by Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Feldberg, Michael) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Pretrial Order No. 2. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 24, 2017. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11820594.) filed by Steven Summer, Michael Vigorito, Victor Vilaplana. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Geller, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11818742.) filed by Michael Hoar, Elsa Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Novak, Paul) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 24 Letter from James R. Martin regarding appointiment of lead counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Martin, James) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Josef Teboho Ansorge by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Richard I. Werder, Jr. by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Allison Vissichelli by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Miriam R. Vishio by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jennifer Duncan Hackett by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11818089.) filed by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11817995.) filed by Mercedes Benz USA, LLC, Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc., Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11813273.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Vissichelli, Allison) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11813257.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Vishio, Miriam) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11813221.) filed by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hackett, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Qianwei Fu (Fu, Qianwei) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Thomas Micheletti (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Zahid (Zahid, Judith) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Autohaus Acquisition, Inc. re #8 Notice of Appearance (Martin, James) (Filed on 10/20/2017) Modified on 10/20/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robertson Martin (Martin, James) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bryan Wolfson (Wolfson, Adam) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shon Morgan (Morgan, Shon) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pretrial Order No. 1: Applications for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel and Steering Committee Members. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 17, 2017. (crblc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #2 Administrative Motion To Relate Cases. (crblc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 12, 2017 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases filed by Amir Berenjian, Hamid Berenjian, Mark Undestad. Responses due by 10/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit A to Saveri Decl., #3 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 5, 2017 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, that the action is transferred to the Northern District California Creating MDL No. 3:17-md-2796 CRB. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re : German Automotive Manufacturers Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: : German Automotive Manufacturers Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Claire Naila Rajan
Represented By: Jana Steenholdt
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael S Feldberg
Represented By: Daniel Alan Holman
Represented By: Matthew R Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen AG
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz Vans, LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Knapp
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Jenny Grantz
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Matthew J. Kemner
Represented By: Josef Teboho Ansorge,
Represented By: Richard I. Werder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Represented By: Claire Naila Rajan
Represented By: Jana Steenholdt
Represented By: Daniel Alan Holman
Represented By: John Roberti
Represented By: Michael S Feldberg
Represented By: Matthew R Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW AG
Represented By: Alicia Rita Jovais
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Elizabeth Hays Yandell
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Knapp
Represented By: P Jan Kubicz
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Jenny Grantz
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Matthew J. Kemner
Represented By: Josef Teboho Ansorge,
Represented By: Richard I. Werder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars of North America, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Christian Correll, Jr.
Represented By: Norman A. Armstrong, Jr.
Represented By: J. Michael Taylor
Represented By: Alan R. Dial
Represented By: Norman A Armstrong, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Peter A. Strotz
Represented By: Brian Meiners
Represented By: Mary Ellen MacDonald
Represented By: Christopher Yook
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG
Represented By: Norman A Armstrong, Jr.
Represented By: Alan R. Dial
Represented By: Justin Edward Kerner
Represented By: William F. Kiniry, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Meiners
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldberg
Represented By: Christopher Yook
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz US International, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Knapp
Represented By: P Jan Kubicz
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Jenny Grantz
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Matthew J. Kemner
Represented By: Josef Teboho Ansorge,
Represented By: Richard I. Werder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler AG
Represented By: Eric J. Knapp
Represented By: Richard I. Werder, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Jenny Grantz
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Matthew J. Kemner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi AG
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, LLC
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Steven L. Holley
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rose
Represented By: Samantha Frances Hynes
Represented By: Amanda F. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW North America, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh
Represented By: Stephen Carey Villeneuve
Represented By: Alicia Rita Jovais
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher J. Dalton
Represented By: Elizabeth Hays Yandell
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler North America Corporation
Represented By: Eric J. Knapp
Represented By: Richard I. Werder, Jr.
Represented By: Josef Teboho Ansorge
Represented By: Adam Bryan Wolfson
Represented By: Jenny Grantz
Represented By: Shon Morgan
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Matthew J. Kemner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentley Motors Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW (US) Holding Corp.
Represented By: Alicia Rita Jovais
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Elizabeth Hays Yandell
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Briscoe
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Jeffrey Greg Lewis
Represented By: Juli E. Farris
Represented By: Ryan McDevitt
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Fong
Represented By: Lisa P. Mak
Represented By: Sean Tamura-Sato
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Burton
Represented By: Emily Catherine Aldridge
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lewis
Represented By: Emily Catherine Aldridge
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Blevins
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina F. Florens
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Michael James Pascucci
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Werner
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Food Corp.
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autohaus Acquisitions, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Cheolas
Represented By: Jonathan Randall MacBride
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Woody Norman Peterson
Represented By: James Robertson Martin
Represented By: Miriam R Vishio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lenke
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Barker
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Spark
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Morgan W. Streetman
Represented By: Marc Howard Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oren Arbit
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Ann Slawsby
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Glen DeValerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hoar
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Kebart
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Palumbo
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Eric L. Chase
Represented By: Andrew C Egan
Represented By: William A. Kershaw
Represented By: Ronald J. Campione
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Barrera
Represented By: Scott Alan George
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Scullion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela J. Frost
Represented By: Fatima G. Brizuela
Represented By: Thomas Mark Hnasko
Represented By: Michael E. Jacobs,
Represented By: Robert J. Gralewski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DP Plaintiffs
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacobo Florens
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Michael James Pascucci
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Haugan
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergey Bogomolov
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biltrite Furniture, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Ayes
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Peter G.A. Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Martin
Represented By: Benjamin H. Klein
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Collins
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Peter G.A. Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Schmidt
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Charles D Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaurav Sharma
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: David S. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kurek
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rosen
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Vilaplana
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Kremer
Represented By: Benjamin H. Klein
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Stuart G. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saad Ehtisham
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Thompson
Represented By: Derek Yeats Brandt
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Richard D. McCune, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Thomas
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amir Berenjian
Represented By: Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos
Represented By: Kyla Jenny Gibboney
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Ryan James McEwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Katz
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Talbot
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kathlene Harmon
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Spark
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Marc Howard Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wilkerson
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Represented By: Peter G.A. Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Antonini
Represented By: Tracy R. Kirkham
Represented By: John Dmitry Bogdanov
Represented By: Josef Deen Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPP Plaintiffs
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Kyle Pozan
Represented By: Neil Swartzberg
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Represented By: John Shannon Marrese
Represented By: Jill Michelle Manning
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vigorito
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kunal Patel
Represented By: Emily Catherine Aldridge
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Team Imports, LLC
Represented By: Eric Lewis Chase
Represented By: Andrew Carl Egan
Represented By: Andrew C Egan
Represented By: Ronald J. Campione
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dutton
Represented By: Anthony G. Graham
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Newton
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: David S Stellings
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Dean Michael Harvey
Represented By: Wilson McClelland Dunlavey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audubon Imports, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Amanda Kate Klevorn
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Korey Arthur Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Herbert Stanley
Represented By: Emily Catherine Aldridge
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Archie I. Grubb, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashivishnatha Kotha
Represented By: Michael Richard Cashman
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Undestad
Represented By: Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos
Represented By: Kyla Jenny Gibboney
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Ryan James McEwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonny Gold
Represented By: Michael Harrison Pearson
Represented By: Bruce L. Simon
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Todd M. Schneider
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Anna Marie Horning Nygren
Represented By: Gabriel Ross Gervey
Represented By: Allan Steyer
Represented By: John Reid Malkinson
Represented By: Anna M Horning Nygren
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Donald Scott Macrae
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Neil Swartzberg
Represented By: Jill Michelle Manning
Represented By: Kristen Gast Marttila
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Kyle G Bates
Represented By: Nicole E. Glauser
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Lawrence
Represented By: Christopher Vincent Goodpastor
Represented By: Allan Howard Steyer
Represented By: Thomas Jerome Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Starlight
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Carver
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Rosen
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Summer
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dajana Spasojevic
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Hughes
Represented By: Kimberly A Justice
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria C. Paterno
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Ann Ritter
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Joseph F. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Ortiz
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Dzubak
Represented By: Anthony G. Graham
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lane
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Cordover
Represented By: Michael James Pascucci
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Kimberly A Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Wyatt
Represented By: Jack Atnip, III
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elie Sasson
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Cohen
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Reder
Represented By: Michael Harrison Pearson
Represented By: Bruce L. Simon
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Todd M. Schneider
Represented By: Steven Alan Hart
Represented By: Anna Marie Horning Nygren
Represented By: Gabriel Ross Gervey
Represented By: Allan Steyer
Represented By: Anna M Horning Nygren
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Donald Scott Macrae
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Neil Swartzberg
Represented By: Jill Michelle Manning
Represented By: Kristen Gast Marttila
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Represented By: W. Joseph Bruckner
Represented By: Kyle G Bates
Represented By: Nicole E. Glauser
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Lawrence
Represented By: Christopher Vincent Goodpastor
Represented By: Allan Howard Steyer
Represented By: Thomas Jerome Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Pasternak
Represented By: Michael James Pascucci
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joshua Harris Eggnatz
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Kimberly A Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolf Grodzen
Represented By: Michael Richard Cashman
Represented By: Jack Atnip, III
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Caldwell
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Childress
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autohaus Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By: Qianwei Fu
Represented By: Woody Norman Peterson
Represented By: Jennifer Duncan Hackett
Represented By: Nicholas Cheolas
Represented By: Miriam R Vishio
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Jonathan Randall MacBride
Represented By: Judith A. Zahid
Represented By: Dennis M George
Represented By: Jeffrey M Scafaria
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: James Robertson Martin
Represented By: Allison Marie Vissichelli
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinod Marur
Represented By: Emily Catherine Aldridge
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baily Brownell
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: David S. Casey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Beachum
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hofman
Represented By: Ellen Relkin
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Paul F. Novak
Represented By: Gregory Stamatopoulos
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo James Alba
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clay Hooper
Represented By: Jack Atnip, III
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett Leiser
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Keith Andrew Goldbaum
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Gumb
Represented By: Breanne V. Cope
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Ann Ritter
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Joseph F. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Berenjian
Represented By: Demetrius Xavier Lambrinos
Represented By: Kyla Jenny Gibboney
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Represented By: Ryan James McEwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bankhead Nelson
Represented By: Emily Catherine Aldridge
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Archie I. Grubb, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick C. Hawkins, III
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. DeVito
Represented By: Tracy R. Kirkham
Represented By: John Dmitry Bogdanov
Represented By: Josef Deen Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Buffinton
Represented By: Andrew Bennett Spark
Represented By: Morgan W. Streetman,
Represented By: Joshua H. Grabar
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Marc Howard Edelson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Natwick
Represented By: Anthony G. Graham
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Renard
Represented By: Anthony G. Graham
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powders Automobiles, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Adrien Parfitt
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Charles D Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Parker
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Donald A. Ecklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikram Chatrath
Represented By: Jack Atnip, III
Represented By: Richard Michael Hagstrom
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert B. Kinkade
Represented By: Joseph H. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?