Hernandez v. Contra Costa

Plaintiff: Felipe Hernandez
Defendant: Contra Costa
Case Number: 3:2018cv00267
Filed: January 11, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA filed by Contra Costa. Contra Costa terminated. Motions terminated: 33 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIO N TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN D AUTHORITIES filed by Contra Costa, 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA filed by Contra Costa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/3/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 24, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 . STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Felipe Hernandez filed by B Hughes, Contra Costa, Felipe Hernandez, Michael Proctor, Michael McGary, Zaragosa, B Battles, N Andrews. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/24/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
July 31, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Contra Costa County's 19 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend the first cause of action as to the County. Second Amended Complaint is due by 8/14/2018. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
June 21, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 16 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
May 23, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING DATE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Contra Costa, Felipe Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/23/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
April 2, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND re 8 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DATE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DATES filed by Contra Costa, Felipe Hernandez. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/30/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Hernandez
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: James Cook
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?