Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Consol_plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Consol_defendant: Apple Inc.
Mediator: Edward A Infante
Case Number: 3:2018cv00362
Filed: January 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 104 Motion for Protective Order; granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 109 Motion for Sanctions; denying 116 Motion to Dismiss. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 140 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached order, the court denies Uniloc's motion to compel Apple to produce the entire source code for iOS and watchOS. If Uniloc believes that particular code files are relevant, the parties should meet and confer to discuss. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/7/18. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2018. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Jonathan R. DeBlois
Represented By: Michael James Ercolini
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: James John Foster
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Jonathan R. DeBlois
Represented By: Michael James Ercolini
Represented By: James J. Foster
Represented By: James John Foster
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Robert R. Gilman
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: Daniel McGonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Alali Dagogo-Jack
Represented By: Jennifer Greenblatt
Represented By: Clayton C James
Represented By: Clayton Cole James
Represented By: Katherine Armstrong Nelson
Represented By: Aaron Stafford Oakley
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Katy Lynn Rankin
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: Paul J. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Emma Christine Neff
Represented By: Andrew John Rima
Represented By: Douglas Jordan Winnard
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Andrew John Rima
Represented By: Douglas Jordan Winnard
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Andrew John Rima
Represented By: Douglas Jordan Winnard
Represented By: Clayton C James
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Represented By: Clayton C James
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Andrew John Rima
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Andrew John Rima
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Andrew John Rima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Edward A Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?