Cervantes v. San Jose Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Ernest Rodriguez Cervantes
Defendant: San Jose Sheriff's Department and Hatzenbuam
Case Number: 3:2018cv00644
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/28/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION re 21 Certificate of Service filed by Ernest Rodriguez Cervantes. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/19/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Letter filed by Ernest Rodriguez Cervantes Amended Complaint due by 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/8/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REOPENING CASE AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/26/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/26/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervantes v. San Jose Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Rodriguez Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Jose Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hatzenbuam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?