Codding v. Pearson Education, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judy Codding
Defendant: Pearson Education, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00817
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 156 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 149 Defendant's Motion in Limine; denying as moot 151 Plaintiff' ;s Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Affirmative Defenses.As set forth in the attached order, the court grants Pearson Education's motion for summary judgment and denies Dr. Codding's motion for summary judgment. The court denies Dr. Codding's motion for summary judgment with respect to Pearson Education's affirmative defenses, Pearson Education's motion to exclude certain of Dr. Codding's witnesses from offering expert testimony, and Dr. Codding's request to strike certain evidence that Pearson Education submitted with its reply brief, as moot. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler adjudicating 117 Discovery Letter Brief. As set forth in the attached order, the court holds that Dr. Codding waived any claim of work-product protection she might have had over the text messages and emails she sent to Mr. Singer. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADDRESSING 86 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER AND EXHIBITS. The court issues the attached order to memorialize its guidance from today's discovery hearing. First, the court directs Pearson Education to consider in good faith producing the cur rent versions of PSoC, enVision math, and myPerspective ELA courses to Dr. Codding. With respect to P&L statements, the court accepts Pearson Education's representation that no such statements exist. The court additionally provides guidance to the parties regarding discovery and their disputes more generally, as set forth in the attached. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on March 7, 2019. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion to Dismiss. As set forth in the attached order, the court denies Pearson Education's motion to dismiss Dr. Codding's breach-of-contract claim but grants Pearson Education's motion to dismiss Dr. Codding's anticipatory-breach claim. The court vacates the September 27, 2018 hearing. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. As set forth in the attached order, the court grants Pearson Education's motion to dismiss. The dismissal is without prejudice, and Dr. Codding may file an amended complaint within 21 days of this order. (If she files an amended complaint, she must also file a blackline of her new amended complaint against her current amended complaint as an attachment.)(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 17 Motion to Dismiss.As set forth in the attached order, the court grants Pearson Education's motion to dismiss. The dismissal is without prejudice, and Dr. Codding may file an amended complaint within 21 days of this order. (If she files an amended complaint, she must also file a blackline of her amended complaint against her original complaint as an attachment.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Codding v. Pearson Education, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearson Education, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Benedicto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Codding
Represented By: Loren Kieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?