Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation et al v. Adobe Systems Incorporated
Plaintiff: Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation and Dolby International AB
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv01553
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 372 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5 RE: SECOND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/27/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 348 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4 RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/7/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3 RE: TRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/2/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 RE COMPLIANCE WITH STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/10/19. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 CORRECTED OMNIBUS ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DOLBY'S MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/6/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO STRIKE OR EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 162 Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Joint filing shall be made no later than Friday, December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/15/19. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SEALING ORDER RE ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Any request for sealing must be filed by no later than 9:00 AM on November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/6/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 180 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Maintain Privilege Designations. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 27 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for 7/3/2018 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME re 14 Stipulation, filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation, Dolby International AB. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation et al v. Adobe Systems Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber
Represented By: Samuel R. Diamant
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Represented By: Timothy Tully Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolby International AB
Represented By: Bruce W. Baber
Represented By: Samuel R. Diamant
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Represented By: Timothy Tully Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Michael A. Berta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?