Sanders v. Folk
Petitioner: Ricky Rene Sanders
Respondent: Fred Folk
Case Number: 3:2018cv01558
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AMEND HABEAS PETITION 31 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/3/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: # 1 *erroneous attachment Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/3/2019 (tfS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT AMENDED HABEAS PETITION denying 21 Motion to Amend/Correct ;. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING REQUEST FOR STAY AS MOOT finding as moot 14 Motion to Stay. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Folk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricky Rene Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fred Folk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?