In Re Pacific Fertility Center Litigation Featured Case

A woman, identified only as S.M., whose frozen eggs were stored at the Pacific Fertility Center has filed a class-action lawsuit against the company in response to reports of a freezer malfunction in early March that caused damage to some or all of the tissue stored there. This is the second incidence of a freezer malfunction at a storage facility (the first being at University Hospitals in Cleveland, Ohio), but the two are unrelated.

Plaintiff: R. E., Megan Bauer, Jonathan Bauer, A.B., C.D. and E.F.
Defendant: Pacific Fertility Center and Prelude Fertility, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01586
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

<
Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Filing 941 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 723 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by A.I., F.B., J.A., U.B., X.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Unredacted), # 4 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Unredacted))(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 14, 2021 Filing 940 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by A.I., F.B., J.A., U.B., X.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 9/14/2021) Modified on 9/15/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2021 Filing 939 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret Redshaw ISO Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 4 (redacted) to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion, # 4 Exhibit 4 (under seal) to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 938 Declaration of Margaret C. Redshaw in Support of 937 MOTION for New Trial , 936 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion, # 4 Exhibit 4 (redacted) to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for New Trial and Rule 50(b) Motion)(Related document(s) 937 , 936 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 937 MOTION for New Trial filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/24/2021. Replies due by 10/1/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 936 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(b) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/24/2021. Replies due by 10/1/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 933 Stipulation for Approval of Bond. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 934 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by L.K... (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 10, 2021 Filing 933 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Approval of Bond filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/10/2021) Modified on 9/13/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 930 Administrative Motion to Relate. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 931 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Summons filed by L.K.. (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Filing 930 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by L.K.. Responses due by 9/13/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation re Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 929 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 926 Administrative Motion to Relate. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 928 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chart Industries, Inc... (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 927 STIPULATION regarding Service of Summonses filed by M.K., N.K.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 3, 2021 Filing 926 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by M.K., N.K.. Responses due by 9/7/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation re Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/3/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 925 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 924 Ex Parte Application to Set Briefing Schedule for Hearing on Approval of Appeal Bond and to Extend Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Under Rule 62. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 924 Emergency Ex Parte Application to Set Briefing Schedule for Hearing on Approval of Appeal Bond and to Extend Stay of Enforcement of Judgment Under Rule 62 filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Duffy in Support of Ex Parte Application, # 2 Proposed Order)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 915 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limit in Joint Letter. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 914 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit in Joint Letter Brief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 2, 2021 Filing 921 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING.Please take notice a discovery hearing re Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Chart set for September 23, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.g ov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on September 22, 2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts .gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 920 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by P.J., R.J., S.J., T.J., U.J... (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 919 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G.K., H.K., I.K... (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 918 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff I.K. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 917 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs G.K. and H.K. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
September 1, 2021 Filing 916 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chart Industries, Inc... (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 915 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 913 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Chart, 914 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Exceed Page Limit in Joint Letter Brief re 913 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Chart filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 914 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Exceed Page Limit in Joint Letter Brief re 913 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Chart filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 9/7/2021. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 31, 2021 Filing 913 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Rule 30(b)(6) Notice to Chart filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Polk with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Ringel with Exhibits)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
August 27, 2021 Filing 912 BILL OF COSTS by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Objections due by 9/10/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John E. Bicknell In Support of Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs, # 2 Schedule A, # 3 Schedule B, # 4 Schedule C, # 5 Schedule D, # 6 Schedule E)(Bicknell, John) (Filed on 8/27/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 911 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of 908 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ISSUES RESOLVED IN PRIOR TRIAL filed byA.J., L.E., L.F., M.C., M.D., N.J., O.E., Y.C., Y.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 2 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman)(Related document(s) 908 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 910 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM TRIAL OF RELATED ACTIONS filed by A.J., L.E., L.F., M.C., M.D., N.J., O.E., Y.C., Y.D.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/7/2021. Replies due by 9/14/2021. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED ORDER] GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM TRIAL OF RELATED ACTIONS)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 909 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 404 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, DECLARATION OF AMY M. ZEMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY by A.J., L.E., L.F., M.C., M.D., N.J., O.E., Y.C., Y.D.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Unredacted), # 2 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Unredacted))(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 908 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ISSUES RESOLVED IN PRIOR TRIAL filed by A.J., L.E., L.F., M.C., M.D., N.J., O.E., Y.C., Y.D.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/7/2021. Replies due by 9/14/2021. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF AMY M. ZEMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 14 [PROPOSED ORDER] GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, # 15 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM TRIAL OF RELATED ACTIONS, # 16 [PROPOSED ORDER] GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY FROM TRIAL OF RELATED ACTIONS)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 907 Declaration of Margaret C. Redshaw in Support of 906 MOTION for Summary Judgment (relates to A.J./N.J., L.E./L.F., M.C./M.D., O.E., Y.C./Y.D.), 905 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Redshaw Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion)(Related document(s) 906 , 905 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 906 MOTION for Summary Judgment (relates to A.J./N.J., L.E./L.F., M.C./M.D., O.E., Y.C./Y.D.) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/23/2021. Replies due by 10/14/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Filing 905 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/23/2021. Replies due by 10/14/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 903 Stipulation Third Trial Discovery Schedule Modification. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 4/11/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 16, 2021 Filing 903 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 695 Order on Stipulation Third Trial Discovery Schedule Modification filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
August 13, 2021 Filing 902 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J. against Chart Industries, Inc. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 883 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (898) Administrative Motion to Relate in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 899 STIPULATION regarding Service of Summonses filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Filing 898 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by G.K., H.K., I.K.. Responses due by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation regarding Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 9, 2021 Filing 897 REPLY (re 883 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 896 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 883 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Duffy Declaration) to Chart Opposition to Motion for Entry of Judgment)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 895 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/1/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 894 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Y.J, Z.J., W.J., X.J., A.K., B.K., E.K... (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 893 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J... (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 892 Defendant Chart Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff E.K. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 891 Defendant Chart Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff C.K. and C.L. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 890 Defendant Chart Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff B.K. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 889 Defendant Chart Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff A.K. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 888 Defendant Chart Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs W.J. and X.J. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 26, 2021 Filing 887 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chart Industries, Inc... (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 22, 2021 Filing 886 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) by Y.J, Z.J. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 884 Stipulation to Modify Schedule. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 21, 2021 Filing 884 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 883 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Stipulation to Modify Schedule) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 21, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 883 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Responses due by 8/3/2021. Replies due by 8/10/2021. The hearing on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) is reset to 8/26/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Zoom videoconference. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 15, 2021 Filing 883 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 7/29/2021. Replies due by 8/5/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 12, 2021 Filing 882 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/1/2021, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ilene Watson, telephone number 4233105802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2021. (imw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 880 Stipulation Regarding Trial Schedule.Pretrial Conference reset for 1/20/2022 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection reset for 1/31/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial reset for 1/31/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 8, 2021 Filing 880 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Trial Schedule filed by A.J., L.E., L.F., M.C., M.D., N.J., O.E., Y.C., Y.D.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 877 Administrative Motion to Relate. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 878 STIPULATION regarding Service of Summonses filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 7, 2021 Filing 877 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Responses due by 7/12/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation regarding Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 6, 2021 Filing 876 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/01/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Filing 875 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 1, 2021 Filing 874 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on July 1, 2021. The parties to meet and confer re: Rule 54 judgment and submit a proposed judgment. Trial no. 2 will take place in January 2022. By July 8, 2021, the parties to submit a proposed case schedule. (Recording Time 2:34-2:40)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp/Amy Zeman/Nina Gliozzo/John BicknellAttorneys for Defendants: John Duffy/Kevin Ringel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2021) Modified on 7/6/2021: Matter transcribed by Ilene Watson (Access Transcripts). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2021 Filing 873 NOTICE by Chart Industries, Inc. of Lodging Deposition Testimony Played at Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 872 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 22, 2021 Filing 871 NOTICE by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J. of Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 58(d) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Final Judgment)(Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 6/22/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 870 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference continued to for 7/1/2021 at 1:30 p.m. and the proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telep hone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 869 NOTICE by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J. of Lodging Deposition Testimony Played at Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gliozzo, Nina) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER RE: PUNITIVE DAMAGES INSTRUCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/17/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 17, 2021 Filing 867 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Please take notice a case management conference is set for June 24, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. and the proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or par ties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. by June 23, 2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
June 15, 2021 Filing 866 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Trial Schedule filed by A.J., N.J., L.E., L.F., M.C., M.D., O.E., Y.C., Y.D.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 863 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/02/2021; 06/03/2021; 06/07/2021; 06/08/2021; 06/09/2021; 06/10/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 862 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/24/2021; 05/25/2021; 05/26/2021; 05/27/2021; 05/31/2021; 06/01/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 861 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/8/21, Volume 11, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 807 Transcript Order, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2021. (Related documents(s) 807 , 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 860 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/10/21, Volume 13, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, SullKatherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 859 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/9/21, Volume 12, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 865 Jury Note No. 2. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 858 VERDICT FORM (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 857 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 12) completed on 6/10/2021. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan)(Time 00:15) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2021)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER RE: PARTIES MAINTAINING PHYSICAL TRIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/10/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 864 Jury Note No. 1. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 855 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 11) held on 6/9/2021. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan)(Time 4:31) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 854 Exhibit List by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 9, 2021 Filing 853 Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on June 9, 2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 852 **Filed in error. Please see entry 861 . ****Transcript of Proceedings held on June 8, 2021, Volume 11, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (Related documents(s) 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/8/2021) Modified on 6/14/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2021 Filing 851 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 7, 2021, Volume 10, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 787 Transcript Order, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (Related documents(s) 787 , 781 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 850 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 2, 2021, Volume 7, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 849 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 1, 2021, Volume 6, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 848 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 10) held on 6/8/2021. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan)(Time 2:14) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 847 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM NO. 3. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on June 8, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 846 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Punitive Damages Instruction by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 845 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 9) held on 6/7/2021. (Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan)(Time 6:56) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 844 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM NO. 2. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on June 7, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 843 PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS NO. 2. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on June 7, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 842 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 3, 2021, before Judge Jacqueline S. Corley. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2021. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 5, 2021 Filing 841 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 4, 2021, before Judge Jacqueline S. Corley. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2021. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2021)
June 5, 2021 Filing 840 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on June 3, 2021, before Judge Jacqueline S. Corley. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, Telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 839 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 8) held on 6/4/2021. (Court Reporter: Marla Knox)(Time 5:28) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 838 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on June 4, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 4, 2021 Filing 837 PROPOSED FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on June 4, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 836 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 7) held on 6/3/2021. (Court Reporter: Marla Knox)(Time 5:45) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2021) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2021: # 2 Amended Trial Log) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2021 Filing 835 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 6/17/2021. Replies due by 6/24/2021. (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 833 TRIAL BRIEF re Chart's Deposition Designations for Adams, Pickell, Mueller, Lamb, Ingram and Romney by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -- Adams depo. designations, # 2 Exhibit B -- Pickell depo. designations, # 3 Exhibit C -- Mueller depo. designations, # 4 Exhibit D -- Lamb depo. designations, # 5 Exhibit E -- Ingram depo. designations, # 6 Exhibit F -- Romney depo. designations)(Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Filing 834 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 6) held on 6/2/2021. (Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan). (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 832 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Low LN2 Incidents in 2013 and 2014 by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 831 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 5) held on 6/1/2021. (Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan)(Time 5:25) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2021)
May 30, 2021 Filing 830 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Deposition Testimony and Exhibits for June 1, 2021 by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/30/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 829 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 27, 2021, Volume 5, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 807 Transcript Order, 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 787 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) 807 , 795 , 787 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 828 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 26, 2021, Volume 4, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 807 Transcript Order, 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 787 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) 807 , 795 , 787 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 827 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 25, 2021, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Marla Knox. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 807 Transcript Order, 787 Transcript Order, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) 807 , 787 , 781 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 826 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 24, 2021, Volume 2, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Filing 824 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/20/21, Trial Volume 1, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 27, 2021 Filing 825 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 4) held on 5/27/2021.(Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 823 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 3) held on 5/26/2021. (Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 822 TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING ITS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS CALLING JEAN POPWELL ON MAY 26, 2021 by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 821 TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING ITS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS USE OF TRIAL EXHIBITS 201, 223, 239, 147 AND 247 DURING DIRECT EXAMINATION OF DR. JOSEPH CONAGHAN by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 820 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 2) held on 5/25/2021. (Court Reporter: Marla Knox)(Time 5:41) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 819 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Trial (Day 1) began on 5/24/2021. (Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan)(Time 5:14) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Filing 818 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on May 24, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER NO. 1 RE: DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on May 24, 2021. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 23, 2021 Filing 816 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Its Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Lothson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
May 23, 2021 Filing 815 Statement re 812 Proposed Jury Instructions Joint Statement Regarding Preliminary Jury Instructions by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Gliozzo, Nina) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
May 23, 2021 Filing 814 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Deposition Testimony and Exhibits for May 25, 2021 by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/23/2021)
May 22, 2021 Filing 813 **Filed in error. Please see entry 824 . ** Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/20/21, Trial Volume 1, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporters Katherine Sullivan and Marla Knox; Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 795 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 781 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 804 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2021. (Related documents(s) 795 , 781 , 804 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/22/2021) Modified on 5/28/2021 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2021 Filing 812 Proposed Jury Instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on May 21, 2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2021)
May 20, 2021 Filing 811 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Jury Selection held on 5/20/2021. (Court Reporters: Marla Knox/Katherine Sullivan) (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 810 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/18/21, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 807 Transcript Order, 808 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2021. (Related documents(s) 807 , 808 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 809 TRIAL BRIEF regarding Arbitration Evidence by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 808 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/18/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Filing 807 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/18/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER RE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NO. 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/19/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 805 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Pretrial Conference held on May 18, 2021. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan)(Time 1:49)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: John Bicknell/Nina Gliozzo/Geoffrey Munroe/Adam Polk/Dena Sharp/Amy ZemanAttorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: Marc Cowden/John Duffy/Andrew Lothson/Kristine Reveille/Kevin Ringel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Filing 804 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 18, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing: Further Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2021 at 9:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 803 Statement re 802 Statement (Chart's Supplemental Submission in Response to the Court's Order of May 12, 2021) by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 802 Statement (Chart's Submission in Response to the Court's Order of May 12, 2021) by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 16, 2021 Filing 801 RESPONSE re 799 Objection, by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Chart's Demonstrative Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Ringel Declaration - Chart's Amended Demonstrative Exhibit No. 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Ringel Declaration - Chart's Amended Demonstrative Exhibit No. 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Ringel Declaration - Chart's Amended Demonstrative Exhibit No. 4, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Ringel Declaration - Chart's Amended Demonstrative Exhibit No. 5)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 5/16/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 800 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Demonstratives by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ringel Declaration in Support of Chart's Objections to Plaintiffs' Opening Statement Demonstratives, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Plf Opening Demonstratives.pdf), # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Thermos 1.jpg), # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Thermos 2.jpg), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4 (Thermos 3.jpg))(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 799 OBJECTIONS to Chart's Demonstrative Exhibits by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Objections to Chart's Demonstrative Exhibits, # 2 Exhibits 1-7 to Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Objections to Chart's Demonstrative Exhibits)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 798 RESPONSE re 783 Statement - Plaintiffs' Response to Chart's Statement Regarding Objections to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 797 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING PUBLIC ACCESS TO IN-PERSON JURY TRIAL. The in-person jury trial set for May 20, 2021 to June 10, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be available to the public by telephone and listen only. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone for the in-person jury trial:Dial In: 1-866-590-5055Access Code: 8423161PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER GRANTING SECURITY CLEARNACE FOR SELECT ITEMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/14/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 795 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER RE: PROPOSED IMPLICIT BIAS JURY INSTRUCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/13/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/12/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 792 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/12/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 791 RESPONSE re 784 Affidavit Declaration of John J. Duffy by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 790 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC ACCESS FOR JURY TRIAL. The in-person jury trial set for May 20, 2021 to June 10, 2021 will also be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-866-590-5055Access Code: 8423161The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 11, 2021 Filing 789 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING LOCATION OF JURY TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Please take notice that jury selection is set before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on May 20, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. The trial will take place at 8:30 a.m. on the following days: May 24 -May 27, June 1- June 4, June 7- June 10. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 788 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/6/21, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 786 Transcript Order, 787 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2021. (Related documents(s) 786 , 787 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 787 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 786 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 785 Statement Regarding Issues Plaintiffs Wish to Have Decided Prior to Start of Trial by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Gliozzo, Nina) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 784 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of John J. Duffy) by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 783 Statement re 760 Objection to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 782 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Status Conference held by Zoom videoconference on May 6, 2021. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball)(Time 00:10)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: John Bicknell/Nina Gliozzo/Dena Sharp/Amy Zeman Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy/Andrew Lothson/Kristine Reveille/Kevin Ringel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 781 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Filing 780 Letter from John J. Duffy re: dispute about desposition designations. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Email chain between counsel for Plaintiffs and Chart between April 28 and May 4, 2021,)(Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 5, 2021 Status Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, a nd rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourt s.gov/zoom/. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 4, 2021 Filing 779 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/29/21, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, e-mail joann.bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 775 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2021. (Related documents(s) 775 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
May 3, 2021 Filing 778 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/29/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/3/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER FOLLOWING APRIL 29, 2021 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/30/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 776 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Filing 775 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/29/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 29, 2021 Filing 774 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Pretrial Conference held by Zoom videoconference on 4/29/2021. The Court will issue a written order. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce)(Time 1:22)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: John Bicknell/Nina Gliozzo/Adam Polk/Dena Sharp/Amy ZemanAttorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: Marc Cowden/John Duffy/Andrew Lothson/Kristine Reveille/Kevin Ringel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2021) Modified on 5/6/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2021 Filing 773 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Lothson (Lothson, Andrew) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 772 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 771 Transcript of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4/22/2021, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Ana Dub, RDR, RMR, CRR, CSR No. 7445, telephone number 4152901651. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 769 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2021. (Related documents(s) 769 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 770 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 769 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/22/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/22/2021)
April 22, 2021 Filing 768 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Status Conference held by Zoom videoconference on 4/22/2021. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub)(Time 00:24)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Nina Gliozzo/Adam Polk/Dena Sharp/Amy ZemanAttorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy/Andrew Lothson/Kevin Ringel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2021)
April 20, 2021 Filing 767 REPLY (re 728 MOTION to Clarify and for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider re 718 Sealed Document ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Reply to its Motion to Reconsider, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Franklin Miller, # 4 Exhibit C)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 4/20/2021)
April 16, 2021 Filing 766 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Please take notice a Status Conference is set for 4/22/2021 at 1:30 p.m before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to cour t proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 765 TRIAL BRIEF - Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 764 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM - Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law Regarding Disputed Jury Instructions by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 763 Statement - Joint Statement of the Case for Voir Dire by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 762 Proposed Jury Instructions by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J. - Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 761 OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Trial Exhibits by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 760 OBJECTIONS to re 756 Proposed Pretrial Order, Chart's Objections to Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibits by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 759 Plaintiffs' and Defendant Chart Inc.'s Separate Proposed Verdict Forms filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 2 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (A.B. and C.D.), # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (A.B. and C.D.), # 5 Redacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (E.F.), # 6 Unredacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (E.F.), # 7 Redacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (G.H.), # 8 Unredacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (G.H.), # 9 Redacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (I.J.), # 10 Unredacted Version of Defendant's Proposed Special Verdict Form (I.J.))(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021) Modified on 4/16/2021 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: # 11 Plaintiffs' and Defendant Chart Inc.'s Separate Proposed Verdict Forms) (fabS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2021 Filing 758 Plaintiffs' and Defendant Chart Inc.'s Separate Proposed Juror Questionnaires filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Juror Questionnaire, # 2 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Juror Questionnaire, # 3 Redacted Version of Chart's Proposed Juror Questionnaire, # 4 Unredacted Version of Chart's Proposed Juror Questionnaire)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021) Modified on 4/16/2021 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2021 Filing 757 TRIAL BRIEF re verdict forms (noneconomic damages) by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 756 Proposed Pretrial Order - Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order by E.F., C.D., G. H., I. J., A.B.. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Exhibit List, # 2 Plaintiffs' Witness List, # 3 Defendants' Witness List)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 755 TRIAL BRIEF re Instructions 14, 15, 16 by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 754 MOTION in Limine No. 9: Maintaining Confidentiality of the Plaintiffs' Identities - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 753 MOTION in Limine No. 8: Remote Testimony of Chart Witnesses - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 752 MOTION in Limine No. 7: Insurance Coverage - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 751 MOTION in Limine No. 6: Non-Party Finances and Ownership - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 750 MOTION in Limine No. 5: Offers to Pay Medical Expenses - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 749 MOTION in Limine No. 4: Informed Consent Forms - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 748 MOTION in Limine No. 3: Bad Acts Evidence - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 747 MOTION in Limine No. 2: Subsequent Remedial Measures - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 746 MOTION in Limine No. 1: Extending Rulings on Expert Testimony to Non-Experts - Collated with Opposition filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 745 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Reptile Theory and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 744 Fourth MOTION in Limine re Lost Chance Damages and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 743 Third MOTION in Limine to Exclude "Insurance Policy" and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Filing 742 First MOTION in Limine to Bar Other Occurrence Evidence and Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 4/15/2021. Replies due by 4/15/2021. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 740 Stipulation TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS AND FILE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 740 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 739 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS AND FILE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 739 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS AND FILE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Responses due by 4/13/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Filing 738 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 728 MOTION to Clarify and for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider re 718 Sealed Document ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy Zeman, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Declaration of Anand D. Kasbekar)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 6, 2021 Filing 737 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 734 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine C. Reveille. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 735 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/2021, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 730 Transcript Order, 731 Transcript Order, 732 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2021. (Related documents(s) 730 , 731 , 732 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 29, 2021 Filing 734 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kristine C. Reveille, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15762775.) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 3/29/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 733 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Status Conference held by Zoom videoconference on March 24, 2021. The pretrial conference is continued to April 29, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. by videoconference. Pretrial filings shall be submitted by April 15, 2021. The jury trial is continued to May 20, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. The location of the trial to be determined at a later time. In the event that the jury does not commence on May 20, the back up date is still August 2, 2021. ( Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus)(Time 00:23)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Nina Gliozzo/Dena Sharp/Amy ZemanAttorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: Marc Cowden/John Duffy/Andrew Lothson/Kevin Ringel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 732 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 731 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 730 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/24/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 3/24/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 729 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 728 MOTION to Clarify and for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider re 718 Sealed Document filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2021. Replies due by 4/12/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Motion to Clarify and for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider, # 2 Exhibit A to Ringel Decl. in Support of Chart's Motion to Clarify and for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider, # 3 Exhibit B to Ringel Decl. in Support of Chart's Motion to Clarify and for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 727 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING ZOOM HEARING AND REGISTRATION. Status Conference set for at March 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 23, 2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no documen t associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 726 RESPONSE re 671 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,, (Pursuant to March 12, 2021 Order (Dkt. 716)) re Motion to Exclude Kasbekar, Wininger and Grill by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 725 RESPONSE re 670 Opposition/Response to Motion (Pursuant to March 12, 2021 Order (Dkt. 716)) re Motion for Summary Judgment by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/16/2021. (This document is the same document as 718 , which was filed under seal) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 720 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 722 REPLY (re 721 MOTION in Limine (Pursuant to March 12, 2021 Order (Dkt. 716)) ) re Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 721 MOTION in Limine (Pursuant to March 12, 2021 Order (Dkt. 716)) filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/29/2021. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 18, 2021 Filing 720 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Renewed Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit 41 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 4 Exhibit 41 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 42 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 6 Exhibit 42 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 7 Exhibit 43 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 8 Exhibit 43 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 9 Exhibit 44 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 10 Exhibit 44 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 11 Exhibit 45 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 12 Exhibit 45 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 13 Exhibit 46 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 14 Exhibit 46 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 15 Exhibit 51 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 16 Exhibit 51 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 17 Exhibit 59 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 18 Exhibit 59 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 19 Exhibit 62 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 20 Exhibit 62 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 21 Exhibit 63 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 22 Exhibit 63 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 23 Exhibit 64 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 24 Exhibit 64 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 25 Exhibit 75 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 26 Exhibit 75 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 27 Exhibit 76 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 28 Exhibit 76 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER RE: REDACTIONS TO ORDER OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/16/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/16/2021. ***Filed under seal.*** (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 15, 2021 Filing 717 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 705 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 715 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/4/21, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 710 Transcript Order, 713 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2021. (Related documents(s) 710 , 713 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 714 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/24/21, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 700 Transcript Order, 699 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2021. (Related documents(s) 700 , 699 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 713 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/4/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 628 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 629 Motion in Limine; denying 631 Motion in Limine. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 710 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 5, 2021 Filing 709 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/5/2021)
March 4, 2021 Filing 708 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing on 628 , 629 , 631 , and 632 held by Zoom videoconference on 3/4/2021. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball)(Time 1:40) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp/Amy Zeman/Nina Gliozzo/Tracy Cowan/Adam PolkAttorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy/Kevin Ringel/Andrew Lothson/Margaret Redshaw/Catherine Basque Weiler (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2021)
March 4, 2021 Set/Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 707 EXHIBITS re 705 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 3 Exhibit 35 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 4 Exhibit 35 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 5 Exhibit 41 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 6 Exhibit 41 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 7 Exhibit 42 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 8 Exhibit 42 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 9 Exhibit 43 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 10 Exhibit 43 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 11 Exhibit 44 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 12 Exhibit 44 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 13 Exhibit 45 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 14 Exhibit 45 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 15 Exhibit 46 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 16 Exhibit 46 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 17 Exhibit 51 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 18 Exhibit 51 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 19 Exhibit 54 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 20 Exhibit 56 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 21 Exhibit 56 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 22 Exhibit 57 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 23 Exhibit 57 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 24 Exhibit 58 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 25 Exhibit 58 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 26 Exhibit 59 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 27 Exhibit 59 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 28 Exhibit 60 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 29 Exhibit 60 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 30 Exhibit 61 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 31 Exhibit 61 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 32 Exhibit 62 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 33 Exhibit 62 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 34 Exhibit 63 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 35 Exhibit 63 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 36 Exhibit 64 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 37 Exhibit 64 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 38 Exhibit 75 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 39 Exhibit 75 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 40 Exhibit 76 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 41 Exhibit 76 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ)(Related document(s) 705 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 2, 2021 Filing 706 EXHIBITS re 705 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 2 Exhibit D (Redacted) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 3 Exhibit D (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 4 Exhibit E (Redacted) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 5 Exhibit E (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 6 Exhibit J (Redacted) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 7 Exhibit J (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 8 Exhibit K (Redacted) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 9 Exhibit K (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger, # 10 Exhibit H (Redacted) to Ringel Decl. in Opp. to Pls. Motion to Exclude Chart Experts, # 11 Exhibit H (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. in Opp. to Pls. Motion to Exclude Chart Experts, # 12 Exhibit K (Redacted) to Ringel Decl. in Opp. to Pls. Motion to Exclude Chart Experts, # 13 Exhibit K (Under Seal) to Ringel Decl. in Opp. to Pls. Motion to Exclude Chart Experts, # 14 Exhibit 6 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 15 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 16 Exhibit 7 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 17 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 18 Exhibit 9 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ, # 19 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration in Opp. to Motion to Exclude and MSJ)(Related document(s) 705 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 1, 2021 Filing 705 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ringel Declaration in Support of Amended Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Amended Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Kasbekar Expert Report (Redacted) 11.06.20, # 4 Exhibit Kasbekar Expert Report (Under Seal) 11.06.20, # 5 Exhibit Kasbekar Rebuttal Report (Redacted) 12.04.20, # 6 Exhibit Kasbekar Rebuttal Report (Under Seal) 12.04.20, # 7 Exhibit Leaphart Expert Report (Redacted) 11.06.20, # 8 Exhibit Leaphart Expert Report (Under Seal) 11.06.20, # 9 Exhibit Miller Expert Report (Redacted) 11.20.20, # 10 Exhibit Miller Expert Report (Under Seal) 11.20.20, # 11 Exhibit Miller Second Rebuttal Report (Redacted) 12.11.20, # 12 Exhibit Miller Second Rebuttal Report (Under Seal) 12.11.20, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Experts 12.22.20, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Experts 12.22.20, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 8 (Redacted) to Zeman Declaration ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Experts 12.22.20, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 8 (Under Seal) to Zeman Declaration ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Experts 12.22.20)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 704 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Gliozzo (Gliozzo, Nina) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 26, 2021 Filing 703 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identifi ed by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on 3/3/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ah m, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 701 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Catherine Basque Weiler. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 701 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Catherine Basque Weiler, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15624524.) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 700 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 699 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 698 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom videoconference on 2/24/2021. The pretrial conference scheduled for April 15, 2021 to remain on the Court's calendar. The jury trial scheduled for May 3, 2021 is rescheduled to August 2, 2021, although the Court will keep the May 3 date on calendar in the event that it is able to hold a civil jury trial on that date.. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, and Amy Zeman. Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Andrew Lothson, and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2021) Modified on 2/24/2021 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2021 Filing 697 Defendant Chart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs T.J. and U.J. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 23, 2021 Filing 696 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 694 Stipulation regarding Additional Trials. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 694 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Additional Trials filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 22, 2021 Filing 693 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on 2/23/2021.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 692 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE: SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on February 19, 2021. (jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 633 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 646 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 647 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 688 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Any renewed motion due March 1, 2021. (jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 690 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 689 REPLY (re 632 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Zeman In Support of Reply re Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of A. Zeman, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of A. Zeman)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 688 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Zeman In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Reply re Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 4 Unredacted Reply re Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 5 Unredacted Exhibit 1 to A. Zeman Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply re Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 687 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Motions to Exclude Testimony and Summary Judgment, 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Pacific MSO's Response To Chart's And Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions To File Under Seal filed byPacific MSO, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Kat Stillman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 686 REPLY (re 631 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Elizabeth Grill, 629 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Anand David Kasbekar and Dr. David Wininger ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 685 REPLY (re 628 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 12, 2021 Filing 684 Declaration of Kevin M. Ringel in Support of 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Motions to Exclude Testimony and Summary Judgment filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) 673 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 682 Stipulation Extending Time to File Declarations and Responses to Motions to Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 682 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Declarations and Responses to Motions to Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of KMR ISO Stipulation to Extend Time to File Declaration)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 678 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 677 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 679 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Summons filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 678 Second MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Proposed Order)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 677 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Stipulation in Support of Admin. Motion to Remove Document, # 2 Proposed Order)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 30, 2021 Filing 676 EXHIBITS re 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Exhibit 65)(Related document(s) 669 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/30/2021)
January 30, 2021 Filing 675 EXHIBITS re 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Exhibit 42, # 2 Redacted Exhibit 43, # 3 Unredacted Exhibit 43, # 4 Unredacted Exhibit 44, # 5 Unredacted Exhibit 45, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit 46, # 7 Unredacted Exhibit 48, # 8 Unredacted Exhibit 50, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit 51, # 10 Unredacted Exhibit 53, # 11 Unredacted Exhibit 54, # 12 Unredacted Exhibit 55, # 13 Unredacted Exhibit 56, # 14 Unredacted Exhibit 57, # 15 Unredacted Exhibit 58, # 16 Unredacted Exhibit 59, # 17 Unredacted Exhibit 60, # 18 Redacted Exhibit 61, # 19 Unredacted Exhibit 61, # 20 Unredacted Exhibit 62, # 21 Unredacted Exhibit 63, # 22 Unredacted Exhibit 64, # 23 Redacted Exhibit 68, # 24 Unredacted Exhibit 68, # 25 Redacted Exhibit 69, # 26 Unredacted Exhibit 69, # 27 Redacted Exhibit 70, # 28 Unredacted Exhibit 70, # 29 Redacted Exhibit 74, # 30 Unredacted Exhibit 74, # 31 Unredacted Exhibit 75, # 32 Unredacted Exhibit 76, # 33 Unredacted Exhibit 78, # 34 Unredacted Exhibit 79)(Related document(s) 669 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/30/2021)
January 30, 2021 Filing 674 EXHIBITS re 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Motions to Exclude Testimony and Summary Judgment filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Exhibit 7, # 2 Redacted Exhibit 8, # 3 Unredacted Exhibit 8, # 4 Redacted Exhibit 9, # 5 Unredacted Exhibit 9, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit 10, # 7 Unredacted Exhibit 12, # 8 Redacted Exhibit 13, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit 13, # 10 Redacted Exhibit 15, # 11 Unredacted Exhibit 15, # 12 Unredacted Exhibit 16, # 13 Redacted Exhibit 17, # 14 Unredacted Exhibit 17, # 15 Redacted Exhibit 18, # 16 Unredacted Exhibit 18, # 17 Unredacted Exhibit 22, # 18 Unredacted Exhibit 23, # 19 Unredacted Exhibit 27, # 20 Redacted Exhibit 28, # 21 Unredacted Exhibit 28, # 22 Unredacted Exhibit 35)(Related document(s) 673 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/30/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Motions to Exclude Testimony and Summary Judgment filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration A.Zeman ISO Plaintiffs' Admin Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Opposition to Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Opposition to Summary Judgement, # 5 Redacted Opposition to Motion to Exclude, # 6 Unredacted Opposition to Motion to Exclude, # 7 Declaration of A.Zeman, # 8 Redacted Exhibit 1, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit 1, # 10 Redacted Exhibit 2, # 11 Unredacted Exhibit 2, # 12 Unredacted Exhibit 3, # 13 Redacted Exhibit 5, # 14 Unredacted Exhibit 5, # 15 Unredacted Exhibit 6)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 672 EXHIBITS re 671 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,,, Additional Exhibits to 671-1 filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 72, # 2 Exhibit 73, # 3 Exhibit 74, # 4 Exhibit 75, # 5 Exhibit 76, # 6 Exhibit 77, # 7 Exhibit 78, # 8 Exhibit 79, # 9 Exhibit 80, # 10 Exhibit 81, # 11 Exhibit 82, # 12 Exhibit 83, # 13 Exhibit 84, # 14 Exhibit 85)(Related document(s) 671 ) (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 671 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 631 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Elizabeth Grill, 629 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Anand David Kasbekar and Dr. David Wininger ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration A.Zeman ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions to Exclude and for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47, # 49 Exhibit 48, # 50 Exhibit 49, # 51 Exhibit 50, # 52 Exhibit 51, # 53 Exhibit 52, # 54 Exhibit 53, # 55 Exhibit 54, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit 69, # 71 Exhibit 70)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 670 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 628 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 669 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Chart's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 4 Exhibit A (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 5 Exhibit B (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 6 Exhibit B (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 7 Exhibit D (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 8 Exhibit D (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 9 Exhibit E (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 10 Exhibit E (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 11 Exhibit F (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 12 Exhibit F (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 13 Exhibit G (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 14 Exhibit G (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 15 Exhibit H (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 16 Exhibit H (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 17 Exhibit K (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 18 Exhibit K (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 19 Exhibit L (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts, # 20 Exhibit L (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Experts)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 668 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 632 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Chart's Experts, # 2 Exhibit A-B (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - H (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K-L (Under Seal))(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 667 Defendant Chart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiff S.J. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 666 Defendant Chart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs P.J. and R.J. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 29, 2021 Filing 665 Defendant Chart, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Plaintiff O.J. byChart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/29/2021)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 662 Stipulation Regarding Opposition Memorandum Page Limits. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (661) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. 21-540 is related to this action. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 27, 2021 Filing 662 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Opposition Memorandum Page Limits filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 26, 2021 Filing 661 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation regarding Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 660 Transcript of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 1/20/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 658 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2021. (Related documents(s) 658 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/20/2021. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 658 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/20/21 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 657 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/20/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 656 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/20/2021 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 655 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom videoconference on 1/20/2021. With respect to the Daubert briefing, Plaintiffs' request for a single brief of 40 pages is granted. The parties shall submit an ADR plan for the next conference. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub) Further Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 a.m. by videoconference. Updated joint statement shall be filed by noon on 2/23/2021. TAttorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, Adam Wolf, and Amy Zeman. Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Andrew Lothson, and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 654 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 649 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 652 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief regarding the selection of Additional Cases for Trial filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 651 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Summons filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 650 Declaration of Erin M. Bosman in Support of 646 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal No. 3 (Related to Ringel Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed byPacific MSO, LLC. (Related document(s) 646 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 649 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (638) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 647 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal No. 2 (Related to Ringel Declaration ISO Chart's Motion to Exclude Kasbekar and Wininger) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration ISO Admin Motion to File Under Seal No. 2 (Kasbekar Wininger), # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion to File Under Seal No. 2 (Kasbekar Wininger), # 3 Exhibit Ex. A (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit Ex. A (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit Ex. B (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit Ex. B (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit Ex. C (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit Ex. C (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit Ex. D (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit Ex. D (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit Ex. E (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit Ex. E (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit Ex. F (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit Ex. F (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit Ex. G (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit Ex. G (Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit Ex. H (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit Ex. H (Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit Ex. I (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit Ex. I (Under Seal), # 21 Exhibit Ex. J (Redacted), # 22 Exhibit Ex. J (Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit Ex. K (Redacted), # 24 Exhibit Ex. K (Under Seal))(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 646 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal No. 3 (Related to Ringel Declaration ISO Chart's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit A (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit B (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit B (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit D (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit D (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit E (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit E (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Exhibit F (Redacted to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 12 Exhibit F (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 645 Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Defendant Chart Inc. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 644 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of 629 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Anand David Kasbekar and Dr. David Wininger filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - K (Under Seal))(Related document(s) 629 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 643 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of 628 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B (Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D - F (Under Seal))(Related document(s) 628 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 642 Declaration in Support of 633 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPacific MSO, LLC. (Related document(s) 633 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 641 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal No. 1 (Related to Ringel Declaration ISO Chart's Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Amended Motion to File Under Seal No. 1 (Decl. ISO Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill), # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 4 Exhibit A (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 5 Exhibit B (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 6 Exhibit B (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 7 Exhibit C (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 8 Exhibit C (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 9 Exhibit D (Redacted) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill, # 10 Exhibit D (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Kevin Ringel In Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Grill)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 640 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of 631 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Elizabeth Grill filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D (Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit J, # 8 Exhibit K, # 9 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 631 ) (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 639 Response re 630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Ringel in Support of Chart's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 638 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation regarding Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 628 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 3/4/2021 at 9:00 a.m., in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 637 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Summons filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 634 Stipulation Extending Time To File Declarations And Responses To Motions To Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 635 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/20, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Official Reporter, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 627 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/29/2021. (Related documents(s) 627 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 634 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation And [Proposed} Order Extending Time To File Declarations And Responses To Motions To Seal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Julie Y. Park)(Park, Julie) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 633 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration KMR Declaration Grill, # 2 Declaration KMR Declaration Kasbekar Wininger, # 3 Declaration KMR Declaration MSJ, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion, # 5 Exhibit Grill Exhibits Redacted, # 6 Exhibit Grill Exhibits Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit Kasbekar Wininger Exhibits (F and H) Redacted, # 8 Exhibit Kasbekar Wininger Exhibits (A-C) Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit Kasbekar Wininger Exhibits (D-K) (Unredacted), # 10 Exhibit MSJ Exhibits (A-B) (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit MSJ Exhibits (E-F) (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit MSJ Exhibits (A-B) (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit MSJ Exhibits (C-D) (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit MSJ Exhibits (E-F) (Unredacted))(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 632 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/29/2021. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 2 Exhibit 1-11 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13-14 (Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit 19, # 10 Exhibit 20, # 11 Exhibit 21, # 12 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 631 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Elizabeth Grill filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/29/2021. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 4 (Under Seal) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 5 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 6 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 7 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 8 Exhibit 4 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 9 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 10 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 11 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 12 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 13 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 14 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 15 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 16 Exhibit 13 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 17 Exhibit 14 (Under Seal) to the Declaration of Amy M. Zeman in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 18 Proposed Order (Redacted) regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, # 19 Proposed Order (Under Seal) regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 629 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Dr. Anand David Kasbekar and Dr. David Wininger filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/29/2021. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 628 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/29/2021. Replies due by 2/12/2021. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 627 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 626 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom videoconference on 12/18/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 9:00 a.m. by videoconference. Updated joint case management conference statement shall be filed by noon, on 1/19/2021. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, and Amy Zeman. Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Andrew Lothson, and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 625 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 624 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m. will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that p hotographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 11, 2020 Filing 623 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 11-19-2020, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-12477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 614 Transcript Order, 613 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2021. (Related documents(s) 614 , 613 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/11/2020)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (621) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 621 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation regarding Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 619 Stipulation Regarding Additional Trials. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 619 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Additional Trials filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 618 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chart Industries, Inc... (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 616 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 616 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 615 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by O.J... (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 614 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 613 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Filing 612 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom videoconference on 11/19/2020. The parties to submit a stipulation re: case schedule. Chart to file administrative motion to remove 603-1. Parties to submit consent/declination in 20-7983. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m. by videoconference. Joint statement shall be filed by noon on 12/17/2020. (Court Reporter: Debra Pas)(Time 00:12) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, Amy Zeman, and Adam Wolf Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Andrew Lothson, and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2020)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 610 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Lothson. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 610 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Lothson, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15210478.) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 609 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 607 Motion to Relate Case. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 607 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should be Related filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation re Admin Motion to Relate Case, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 606 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish t o be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12:00 p.m. on 11/18/2020.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 605 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Munroe, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 604 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Informal Discovery Hearing held and recorded by Zoom videoconference on 11/12/2020. Chart may depose Gina Cirimele for one additional hour. (Recording Time: 2:12-2:21)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Amy Zeman and Adam Polk.Attorneys for Chart: John Duffy and Kevein Ringel.Attorneys for MSO: William Tarantino and Julie Park. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 603 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reflections Metadata, # 2 Exhibit Cirimele Transcript 11.10.20)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 602 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. (Tarantino, William) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 601 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Marie Zeman Notice of Appearance of Karen Barth Menzies, Geoffrey A. Munroe, and John E. Bicknell on Behalf of Plaintiffs (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 600 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 30, 2020, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 590 Transcript Order, 589 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021. (Related documents(s) 590 , 589 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 599 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Informal Discovery Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on 11/5/2020. (Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus)(Time 00:07) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, and Amy Zeman.Attorneys for Defendant Chart: Kevin Ringel and Chris Griffin.Attorney for Non-party Pacific MSO: Julie Park. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 596 Second Amended Stipulated Protective Order for Highly Sensitive Confidential Information Including Protected Health Information and Trade Secrets (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 597 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Chart's Answers to Third Amended Complaint (A.B., C.D., E.F., G.H., I.J.) byChart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 596 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Second Amended Stipulated Protective Order for Highly Sensitive Confidential Information Including Protected Health Information and Trade Secrets filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 595 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Discovery Hearing set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconfer ence are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 594 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Chart's Answers to Complaints Filed on 7/23/20 by Peiffer Wolf byChart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 591 Stipulation regarding expert discovery. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 592 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Chart's Answers to Complaints Filed on 7/23/20 by Girard Sharp LLP and Gibbs Law Group LLP byChart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 591 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 588 Discovery Hearing,, Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 590 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 589 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 588 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held by Zoom videoconference on October 30, 2020. The parties shall file a stipulation or competing proposals by Monday, November 2, 2020. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball)(Time 00:07)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, and Amy Zeman.Attorneys for Defendant Chart: John Duffy and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 587 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. A discovery hearing is set for 10/30/2020 at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by te lephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 586 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Zeman Letter)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 585 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/22/20, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction until after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 583 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021. (Related documents(s) 583 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 584 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/22/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 583 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/22/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 582 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/22/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 581 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom video conference on 10/22/2020. Letter briefs (Dkt. Nos. 568 and 572 were resolved as stated on the record. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 1:30 p.m. by video conference in. Updated case management statement shall be filed by noon on 11/18/2020. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Adam Polk, Amy Zeman, and Adam WolfAttorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Chris Griffin, and Kevin Ringel. Attorney for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Erin Boseman.Attorney for Defendants Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants: Aaron Schultz. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2020 Filing 580 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 578 Stipulation Regarding Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Plaintiffs. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 578 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Plaintiffs filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 577 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 576 Stipulation extending time for Chart, Inc. to answer consolidated complaints . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) Modified on 10/19/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2020 Filing 576 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 567 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 574 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaints filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 574 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 10/16/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Chart's Motion for Extension of Time, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Chart's Motion for Extension of Time)(Redshaw, Margaret) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 573 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/21/2020.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 13, 2020 Filing 572 Discovery Letter Brief re: Pacific MSO 30(b)(6) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 10/13/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 571 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal As Relates to Case No. 3:20-CV-05086 (Plaintiffs Q.I. and R.F.) by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J. (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER RE: CHART'S MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/6/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/6/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2020 Filing 569 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 568 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 547 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
October 4, 2020 Filing 566 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/24/20, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 561 Transcript Order, 560 Transcript Order, 565 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2021. (Related documents(s) 561 , 560 , 565 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 10/4/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/24/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 564 REPLY (re 547 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Law360 Article)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 562 Administrative Motion for Entry of Order to Produce Records. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 562 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Entry of Order to Produce Records filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Subpoena and Rider to Comcast, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Proposed Order)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 561 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/24/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/24/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 559 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom video conference on 9/24/2020. The Court will rule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 547 ) without hearing. Further case management conference set for 10/22/2020 at 1:30 p.m. by video conference. Updated statement shall be filed by noon on 10/21/2020. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, Amy Zeman, and Adam Polk. Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy and Kevin Ringel.Attorney for Defendants Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz. Attorney for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Erin Boseman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/24/2020) Modified on 9/24/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/24/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2020 Filing 558 Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 9-3-2020, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 549 Transcript Order, 545 Transcript Order, 544 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2020. (Related documents(s) 549 , 545 , 544 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 557 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 547 MOTION to Dismiss ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO CHARTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 556 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 17, 2020 Filing 555 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 1:30 p.m. will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photograp hing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https: //www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER RE: PROPOSED CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/15/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 553 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chart Industries, Inc... (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 552 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Consolidation and Trial Schedule filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 9/14/2020)
September 11, 2020 Filing 551 Transcript of Zoom Videoconference Proceedings held on 8/13/2020, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 534 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020. (Related documents(s) 534 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 550 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/13/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/3/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 548 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Chart Industries, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge in the complaints that were filed on July 23, 2020 and July 24, 2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 547 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 9/23/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 536 Motion for voluntary dismissal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/03/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 544 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/03/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 543 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2020 re 536 Motion to Dismiss filed by K. L. and further case management conference held by Zoom video conference on 9/3/2020. The motion is granted. Court to issue written order. As to the discovery letter brief re: Pacific MSO lab assistant depositions (Dkt. No. 542 ), Plaintiff may have thirty minutes and Defendant Chart may have two hours. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 1:30 p.m. by video conference. Joint statement shall be filed by noon, on 9/23/2020.(Court Reporter: Debra Pas.)(Time 00:24)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Sarah London, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, Tiseme Zegeye, Amy Zeman, and Adam Polk.Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Nathan Widell, and Kevin Ringel. Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz. Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Erin Boseman and William Tarantino. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/3/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 542 Discovery Letter Briefre: Pacific MSO lab assistant depositions filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 541 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 540 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The further Case Management Conference and the motion hearing set for 9/3/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Corley will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 539 REPLY (re 536 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF K.L.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE ) filed byK. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah R. London)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 538 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 536 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF K.L.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Defendant's Proposed Order)(Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 535 Stipulation RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF K.L.'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 536 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF K.L.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by K. L.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 8/24/2020. Replies due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah L. London, # 2 Proposed Order)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 535 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF K.L.'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by K. L.. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 534 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/13/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 533 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom webinar on 8/6/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 1:30 p.m. by video conference. The joint case management conference statement shall be filed by noon, on 9/2/2020. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Sarah London, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, Tisme Zegeye, Amy Zeman, and Adam Polk. Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Kevin Ringel, and Margaret Redshaw.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz. Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Erin Bosman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 532 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 531 STIPULATION Regarding Service of Summons filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 530 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613661817?pwd=Z0tnSzBvKzJMN25SRFB3M1B6dFBadz09Meeting ID: 161 366 1817Password: 924619Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see ht tps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/4/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ***Please disregard. Filed in error. See 529 .*** ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/4/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing: Pretrial Conference reset for 4/15/2021 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection reset for 5/3/2021 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial reset for 5/3/2021 to 5/26/2021 (18-days)at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 527 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief regarding schedule pursuant to the Courts Order [Dkt. 493] filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting (495) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:18-cv-01586-JSC. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 525 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/23/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 524 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/23/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05094-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/30/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05046-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/30/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05034-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/30/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05024-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/30/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05022-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/30/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05014-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/30/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05107-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05098-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05088-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05073-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05063-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05053-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05045-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05039-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-05037-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-04993-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-04988-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-04975-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 20-cv-04965-SK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 7/29/2020. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL TO DETERMINE RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/28/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL TO DETERMINE RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/28/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER OF SUA SPONTE REFERRAL TO DETERMINE RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/28/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 501 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:18-cv-01586-JSC In re: Pacific Fertility Center Litigation and 4:20-cv-05106-DMR Z.F., et al v. Chart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 500 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:18-cv-01586-JSC In re: Pacific Fertility Center Litigation and 4:20-cv-05070-DMR J.I., et al v. Chart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 499 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:18-cv-01586-JSC In re: Pacific Fertility Center Litigation and 4:20-cv-05050-DMR C.D. v. Chart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 498 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:18-cv-01586-JSC In Re Pacific Fertility Center Litigation and 4:20-cv-05020-DMR I.E., et al v. Chart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 497 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:18-cv-01586-JSC In Re Pacific Fertility Center Litigation and 4:20-cv-05004-DMR X.A., et al v. Chart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 496 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: 3:18-cv-01586-JSC In Re Pacific Fertility Center Litigation and 4:20-cv-04978-DMR L.E., et al v. Chart Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) .
July 27, 2020 Filing 495 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy M. Zeman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zeman, Amy) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 494 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/23/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER FOLLOWING JULY 23, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/23/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 492 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held by Zoom webinar on 7/23/2020. The Court will issue a case management order. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 1:30 p.m. by video conference. (Court Reporter: Ana Dub)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Sarah London, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, Amy Zeman, and Adam Polk.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Julie Park, William Tarantino and Erin Bosman.Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy, Kevin Ringel, and Margaret Redshaw. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2020 Filing 491 MANDATE of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 485 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nathaniel S. Widell. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 484 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Taylor A. Van Hove. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 483 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret Redshaw. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 482 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher R. Griffin. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 486 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 485 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice-Nathaniel S. Widell,, Esq. by Chart Industries, Inc. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/22/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 484 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice-Taylor A. Van Hove, Esq. by Chart Industries, Inc. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/22/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 483 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice-Margaret Redshaw, Esq. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Filing 482 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice-Christopher R. Griffin, Esq. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2020 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 482 Notice (Other) filed by Chart Industries, Inc. , 485 Notice (Other) filed by Chart Industries, Inc., 483 Notice (Other) filed by Chart Industries, Inc., 484 Notice (Other) filed by Chart Industries, Inc. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 481 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The case management conference set for 7/23/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.*Case participants will be promoted from attendees to panelists when their case is called.* All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1613661817?pwd=Z0tnSzBvKzJMN25SRFB3M1B6dFBadz09Meeting ID: 161 366 1817Password: 924619Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, CO URT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 479 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 25, 2020, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 475 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2020. (Related documents(s) 475 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 478 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held and recorded by Zoom webinar on 6/25/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 1:30 p.m. by videoconference. The joint statement shall by filed by 7/21/2020. (Recording Time: 1:57-2:15.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Sarah London, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, Tiseme Zegeye, Amy Zeman, and Adam Polk.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Erin Boseman.Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2020) Modified on 6/25/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2020: Matter transcribed by Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2020 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/25/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/25/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 475 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/25/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 474 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph IIIAll counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1601455434?pwd=TkRwM1hMZU0yMzBBY3dYNzRTNE5xUT09Meeting ID: 160 145 5434Password: 315489Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see h ttps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CHART'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/23/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 472 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 471 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 4, 2020, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2912, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 464 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020. (Related documents(s) 464 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 470 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/4/20 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 469 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Cowan, Tracey) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 467 Stipulation Setting Case Schedule. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing: Pretrial Conference reset for 2/11/2021 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection reset for 3/1/2021 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial reset for 3/1/2021 to 3/24/2021 (18-days) at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 467 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Case Schedule filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/04/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amanda M., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 465 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 464 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 4, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 463 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held and record by Zoom webinar on 6/4/2020. Any joint discovery letters shall be submitted by 6/17/2020. The parties to submit a stipulation and proposed order with the new schedule. Further Case Management Video Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Corley. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed by noon, on June 6/23/2020. (Time 1:41-1:59)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Sarah London, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, Tiseme Zegeye, and Adam Polk.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendant Joseph Conaghan: Erin Boseman, Julie Park, and William Tarantino.Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2020) Modified on 6/4/2020: Matter transcribed by Diane Skillman. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2020 Filing 462 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Schedule filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 461 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Duffy (Duffy, John) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 460 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference set for June 4, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. will be held via Zoom video conferencing webinar. The Court will promote case participants from attendees to panelists when their case is called. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/85366309052?pwd=Z1VleXVVWlBhS2xYc3ZiNlFoNndCZz09Meeting ID: 853 6630 9052Password: 537695Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 458 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Zoom Proceedings held on May 21, 2020, before Judge Jacqueline S. Corley; transcribed by Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 457 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2020. (Related documents(s) 457 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amanda M., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 455 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 21, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 454 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held and recorded by Zoom on 5/21/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Corley. The joint case management conference statement shall be filed by noon on 6/3/2020. (Time 1:53-2:11)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp, Sarah London, Tracey Cowan, Adam Wolf, and Adam Polk. Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center and Third-party Defendants Philip E. Chenette,Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock: Aaron Schultz.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc., Pacific MSO, LLC, and Third-party defendantJoseph Conaghan: Erin Boseman, Julie Park, and William Tarantino.Attorneys for Defendant Chart Industries: John Duffy and Kevin Ringel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/26/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2020 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Marcus Ringel (Ringel, Kevin) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 452 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Duffy (Duffy, John) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 451 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.The case management conference set in this case on May 21, 2020 will be held by Zoom Webinar at 1:30 pm.Members of the press and public may attend the webinar as non-participating attendees at the following link: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/88347716821?pwd=SHliM1huaXE5QWtRdVlIWEJqTTcwdz09Password: 579321Or iPhone one-tap : US: +19292056099,,88347716821# or +12532158782,,88347716821# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 Webinar ID: 883 4771 6821 Password: 579321 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kocqiQ2zjOr an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 162.255.37.11 (US West) or 162.255.36.11 (US East) Meeting ID: 883 4771 6821 Password: 579321 SIP: 88347716821@zoomcrc.com Password: 579321***Please note that the Court will promote case participants from attendee to panelist when their case is called.*** (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 448 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John J. Duffy. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 447 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin M. Ringel. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 448 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice John J. Duffy, Esq. by Chart Industries, Inc. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2020 Filing 447 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice Kevin M. Ringel, Esq. by Chart Industries, Inc. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/18/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 446 USCA Memorandum (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 443 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Megan Akemi Suehiro; Molly Moriarty Lane and Benjamin Patrick Smith terminated. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 444 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 443 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Order and Proposed Order Permitting Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Stoddard, Adam) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 441 Stipulation extending the deadline for Chart to file its Amended Third-Party Complaint.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 441 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 430 Order on Stipulation filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Amended Third Party Complaint)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER NO. 2. RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF ON SITRICK & CO. AND K2 COMMUNICATIONS SUBPOENAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on April 22, 2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/22/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 439 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/09/2020, before Magistrate Judge Corley. Transcriber Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 433 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2020. (Related documents(s) 433 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 438 Supplemental Brief re 431 Order Re Joint Discovery Letter on Sitrick & Co. and K2 filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 431 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 437 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., K. L.. (Zegeye, Tiseme) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 436 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amanda M., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 434 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04-09-2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 9, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 432 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2020. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Time: 2:01-2:36.) ***The conference was recorded by Zoom and a transcript is available upon request.***(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2020) Modified on 4/10/2020: Matter transcribed by Pamela Hebel. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF ON SITRICK & CO. AND K2 COMMUNICATIONS SUBPOENAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/9/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 429 Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Amended Third-Party Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 429 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 425 Order on Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Amended Third-Party Complaint)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER of USCA (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 427 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 426 NOTICE by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc. re 423 Order (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 424 Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Amended Third-Party Complaint. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 424 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to File Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane ISO Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Amended Third-Party Complaint)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF ON SITRICK & CO. AND K2 COMMUNICATIONS SUBPOENAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/16/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 422 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tiseme G. Zegeye in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Zegeye Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Zegeye Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Julie Y. Park in Support, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Park Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 2 to Park Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 3 to Park Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Park Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Park Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Park Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Park Declaration)(Zegeye, Tiseme) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 421 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 27, 2020, before Judge Jacqueline S. Corley. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 409 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2020. (Related documents(s) 409 ) (mfkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 420 REDACTION to 404 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 351 Opposition/Response to Motion, Pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order [Dkt. No. 404] by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eldon D. Schriock, M.D., # 2 Declaration of Erin M. Bosman, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 419 REPLY (re 350 MOTION to Strike or Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen ) pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order [Dkt. 404] filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E to Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Chart Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order [Dkt. 404])(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 418 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 302 MOTION to Certify Class ) [REDACTED] Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order [Dkt. 404] filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane and Exhibit 1, 3-9, 11-15, 16-18, 23-24, 25-29 REDACTED pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order [Dkt. 404], # 2 Expert Report of A. Hubel, # 3 Expert Report of C. Brand, # 4 Expert Report of K. Gustafson, # 5 Expert Report of S. Ma)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 417 REPLY (re 302 MOTION to Certify Class ) Pursuant to February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Exhibit R, # 17 Exhibit S, # 18 Exhibit CC (Redacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 416 OBJECTIONS to re 353 Opposition/Response to Motion, Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404) by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 415 Response re 354 Objection by Chart to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404) byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 414 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 411 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, PH.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen (pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404)) re 404 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Chart Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen (pursuant to February 26, 2020 seal order) 404 filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah London in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 413 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404) filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/10/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit X, # 23 Exhibit Y, # 24 Exhibit Z, # 25 Exhibit aa, # 26 Exhibit bb, # 27 Exhibit cc, # 28 Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D., # 29 Expert Report of Christine Allen, # 30 Expert Report of Anand David Kasbekar, Ph.D)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 412 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 411 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, PH.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen (pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404)) re 404 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen (pursuant to February 26, 2020 seal order) 404 filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah London in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 411 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, PH.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen (pursuant to the February 26, 2020 Order (Dkt. 404)) re 404 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/28/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith in Support of Defendant Chart, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, PH.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen)(Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/27/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/27/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amanda M., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 407 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/27/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 406 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2020 re 302 MOTION to Certify Class filed by K. L., C.D., G. H., E.F., A.B., I. J., 350 MOTION to Strike r Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen filed by Chart Industries, Inc., 362 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chart Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Conaghan, 339 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eldon D. Schriock, Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Isabelle P. Ryan, Liyun Li, Carl M. Herbert, San Francisco Fertility Center, and Further Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Court Reporter: Marla Knox.)(Time 1:36)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 405 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2020 re 302 MOTION to Certify Class filed by K. L., C.D., G. H., E.F., A.B., I. J., 350 MOTION to Strike r Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen filed by Chart Industries, Inc., 362 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chart Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Conaghan, 339 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eldon D. Schriock, Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Isabelle P. Ryan, Liyun Li, Carl M. Herbert, San Francisco Fertility Center, and Further Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Court Reporter: Marla Knox.)(Time 1:36)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 369 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 381 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 392 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 403 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Lee Preece (Preece, Alexandra) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Jared Wiese (Wiese, Phillip) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 401 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUPPLEMENTAL filed by Pacific Fertility Center. (Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 400 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 396 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to seal the courtroom for hearings on class certification and Daubert motion ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk, # 2 Proposed Order)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Penelope Athene Preovolos (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine McBride. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing: Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 397 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14203449.) filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McBride, Katherine) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 396 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to seal the courtroom for hearings on class certification and Daubert motion filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Responses due by 2/24/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie Y. Park, # 2 Proposed Order)(Park, Julie) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 395 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 394 Declaration of Frank Roger Bies, III in Support of 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) 385 ) (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 393 Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 381 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen, 392 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Referring to D.E. 383 filed byJoseph Conaghan, Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 385 , 383 , 381 , 392 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 392 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Referring to D.E. 383 filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Jewell Expert Report and Allen Opinion (Unredacted), # 4 Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Jewell Expert Report and Allen Opinion (Redacted))(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 391 REPLY (re 350 MOTION to Strike or Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen ) (Corrected refiling of D.E. 384, originally filed on 2/6/2020) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 388 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO FILE DECLARATIONS AND RESPONSES TO MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 389 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Conaghan.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 388 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 381 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen Extending Time to File Declarations and Responses to Motions to Seal filed by Joseph Conaghan, Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julie Park in support of Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Park, Julie) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 387 RESPONSE re 354 Objection by Chart to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 386 REPLY (re 302 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit D (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit F (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit G (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit H (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit I (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit J (Redacted), # 13 Exhibit K (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit L (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit M (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit N (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit O (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit P (Redacted), # 19 Exhibit Q (Redacted), # 20 Exhibit R (Redacted), # 21 Exhibit S (Redacted), # 22 Exhibit T (Redacted), # 23 Exhibit U (Redacted), # 24 Exhibit V (Redacted), # 25 Exhibit W (Redacted), # 26 Exhibit X (Redacted), # 27 Exhibit Y (Redacted), # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit aa, # 30 Exhibit bb, # 31 Exhibit cc (Redacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Order (Redacted) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Proposed Order (Under Seal) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 (Redacted) Reply in support of Motion for Class Certification, # 6 (Under Seal) Reply in support of Motion for Class Certification, # 7 (Redacted) Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 8 (Under Seal) Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 9 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit A (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit B (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit E (Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit F (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit G (Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit H (Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit I (Redcated), # 18 Exhibit I (Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit K (Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit M (Under Seal), # 21 Exhibit N (Under Seal), # 22 Exhibit O (Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit P (Under Seal), # 24 Exhibit Q (Under Seal), # 25 Exhibit R (Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit S (Under Seal), # 27 Exhibit T (Redacted), # 28 Exhibit T (Under Seal), # 29 Exhibit U (Redacted), # 30 Exhibit U (Under Seal), # 31 Exhibit V (Redacted), # 32 Exhibit V (Under Seal), # 33 Exhibit W (Redacted), # 34 Exhibit W (Under Seal), # 35 Exhibit X (Redacted), # 36 Exhibit X (Under Seal), # 37 Exhibit Y (Redacted), # 38 Exhibit Y (Under Seal), # 39 Exhibit cc (Under Seal), # 40 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Chart Inc.'s Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 41 (Under Seal) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Chart Inc.'s Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 384 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** REPLY (re 350 MOTION to Strike or Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Chart Inc.s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (fff, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2020 Filing 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Defendant Chart Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Chart Inc.s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Defendant Chart Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 4 Redacted Defendant Chart Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 5 Unredacted Exhibit E to the Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Chart Inc.s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 6 Redacted Exhibit E to the Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Chart Inc.s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 382 REPLY (re 362 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chart Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint ) filed byJoseph Conaghan. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 381 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission in Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah R. London in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (PUBLIC/REDACTED) Supplemental Submission in Opposition, # 4 (SEALED/UNREDACTED) Supplemental Submission in Opposition, # 5 Declaration of Sarah R. London in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Submission, # 6 Exhibit (SEALED) Exhibit A to Declaration of Sarah R. London)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 380 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 01/28/20, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590. Tape Number: FTR 10:01 - 10:18. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 372 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2020. (Related documents(s) 372 ) (tgj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 379 Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of 377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 377 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 378 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 362 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chart Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 377 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah R. London in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 REDACTED - Opposition to Defendant Chart Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Nicholas Jewell and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 4 UNREDACTED - Opposition to Defendant Chart Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Nicholas Jewell and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 5 Declaration REDACTED - of London in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Chart Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Nicholas Jewell and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 6 Declaration UNREDACTED - of London in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Chart Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Nicholas Jewell and Opinion of Christine Allen, # 7 Exhibit A - (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit B - (SEALED))(London, Sarah) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/28/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 375 REPLY (re 339 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byPhilip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock. (Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 374 Declaration in Support of 369 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Referring to Docket No. 352 Declaration of Erin M. Bosman In Support of Chart Inc.'s Supplemental Administrative Motion To File Under Seal filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 369 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 373 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/28/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/28/2020 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 371 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 1/28/2020. The parties to submit an amended protective order. (FTR Time: 10:01-10:18).Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Sarah London; Adam Polk.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Aaron Schutlz.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc. and Pacific MSO, LLC: William Taratino; Erin Boseman.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Megan Suehiro. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2020) Modified on 1/28/2020: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2020 Filing 370 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONE DISCOVERY HEARING. Please take notice a telephone discovery hearing is set for January 28, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 369 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Referring to Docket No. 352 filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Report, # 4 UNREDACTED Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Report)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 368 ERRATA re 350 MOTION to Strike or Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen Redacted-Defendant's Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 367 Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Defendants Chart Inc. and Pacific MSO, LLC Administrative Motions To File Under Seal filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 366 Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Charts Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 352 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 364 Stipulation regarding Class Certification Reply Page Limits and Adjusting Daubert Briefing Schedule. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 364 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Class Certification Reply Page Limits and Adjusting Daubert Briefing Schedule filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 363 ERRATA re 353 Opposition/Response to Motion, 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Chart, Inc.'s Notice of Errata by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane relating to Notice of Errata)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 362 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chart Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Conaghan. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/30/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 359 Stipulation Extending Time to File Declarations and Responses to Defendants' Motions to Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 360 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 339 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 359 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Declarations and Responses to Defendants' Motions to Seal filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 358 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Please take notice the hearing on Defendants' 339 Motion to Dismiss is continued to 2/27/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 11, 2020 Filing 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc. re 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/11/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Romney, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Opposition, # 4 Redacted Opposition, # 5 Unredacted Schriock Declaraion, # 6 Redacted Schriock Declaraion, # 7 Unredacted Ex. 1 of Bosman Declaration, # 8 Redacted Ex. 1 of Bosman Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Ex. 2 of Bosman Declaration, # 10 Redacted Ex. 2 of Bosman Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Ex. 3 of Bosman Declaration, # 12 Redacted Ex. 3 of Bosman Declaration, # 13 Unredacted Ex. 4 of Bosman Declaration, # 14 Redacted Ex. 4 of Bosman Declaration, # 15 Unredacted Ex. 5 of Bosman Declaration, # 16 Redacted Ex. 5 of Bosman Declaration, # 17 Unredacted Ex. 6 of Bosman Declaration, # 18 Redacted Ex. 6 of Bosman Declaration, # 19 Unredacted Ex. 7 of Bosman Declaration, # 20 Redacted Ex. 7 of Bosman Declaration, # 21 Unredacted Ex. 8 of Bosman Declaration, # 22 Redacted Ex. 8 of Bosman Declaration, # 23 Unredacted Ex. 9 of Bosman Declaration, # 24 Redacted Ex. 9 of Bosman Declaration, # 25 Unredacted Ex.10 of Bosman Declaration, # 26 Redacted Ex. 10 of Bosman Declaration, # 27 Unredacted Ex. 11 of Bosman Declaration, # 28 Redacted Ex. 11 of Bosman Declaration, # 29 Unredacted Ex. 12 of Bosman Declaration, # 30 Redacted Ex. 12 of Bosman Declaration)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 355 Request for Judicial Notice re 353 Opposition/Response to Motion, In Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Related document(s) 353 ) (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 354 OBJECTIONS to re 353 Opposition/Response to Motion, Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 353 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 302 MOTION to Certify Class ) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Molly M. Lane and Exhibits 1 thru 29, # 2 Expert Report of A. Hubel, # 3 Expert Report of C. Brand, # 4 Expert Report of K. Gustafson, # 5 Expert Report of S. Ma)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Redacted Version of Lane Declaration ISO Opposition, # 6 Unredated Version of Lane Declaration ISO Opposition, # 7 Exhibit Sealed-1, 3-9,11-15 to Lane Decl ISO Opposition, # 8 Exhibit Sealed-16-18, 23-24 to Lane Declaration ISO of Opposition, # 9 Exhibit Sealed-25-29 to Lane Declaration ISO Opposition, # 10 Redacted Version-Report of A. Hubel, # 11 Unredacted Version-Report of A. Hubel, # 12 Redacted Version-Report of C. Brand, # 13 Unredacted Version-Report of C. Brand, # 14 Redacted Version-Report of K. Gustafson, # 15 Unredacted Version-Report of K. Gustafson, # 16 Redacted Version-Report of S. Ma, # 17 Unredacted Version-Report of S. Ma, # 18 Redacted Version of Objection to Evidence, # 19 Unredacted Version of Objection to Evidence, # 20 Redacted Version of Proposed Order Granting Obj to Evidence, # 21 Unredacted Version of Order Granting Obj to Evidence, # 22 Redacted Version of Daubert Motion, # 23 Unredacted Version of Daubert Motion, # 24 Redacted Version of Smith Decl w/Exhs, # 25 Unredacted Version of Smith Decl w/Exhs)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 351 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 302 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Schriock, # 2 Declaration of Bosman, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 350 MOTION to Strike or Exclude the Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell, Ph.D. and Opinion of Christine Allen filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 1/24/2020. Replies due by 1/31/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith in Support of Chart's Motion to Exclude, # 2 Exhibit A of Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith, # 6 Proposed Order)(Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 348 Stipulation Continuing 1/16/20 Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2020. Further Case Management Conference reset for 2/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 348 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing 1/16/20 Case Management Conference filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 20, 2019 Filing 347 STIPULATION Extending Time for Third-Party Defendant Joseph Conaghan, PhD to Respond to Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Conaghan. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER DENYING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND VACATE DISCOVERY AND TRIAL DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/19/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 345 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 340 MOTION Extend Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Vacate and Reset Discovery Deadlines and Trial Date ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah R. London)(Zegeye, Tiseme) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 343 Stipulation Extending Deadlines Related to the Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 343 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines Related to the Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Moriarty Lane Decl ISO Stipulation Extending Deadlines Related to the Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 339))(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 342 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock.. (Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 341 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, and Eldon D. Schriock shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/24/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 340 MOTION Extend Class Certification Briefing Schedule and Vacate and Reset Discovery Deadlines and Trial Date filed by Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock. Responses due by 12/24/2019. Replies due by 12/31/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 339 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Philip E. Chenette, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 12/24/2019. Replies due by 12/31/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 338 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Conaghan. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER RE: ABSENT CLASS MEMBER DISCOVERY 335 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/3/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 336 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 11/21/19, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590. Tape Number: FTR 2:23 - 2:40. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 331 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2020. (Related documents(s) 331 ) (tgj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 335 Discovery Letter BriefJoint Statement Regarding Discovery From Former Putative Class Representatives filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-21-19 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 21, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Amanda M., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Murphy, Anne Marie) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 331 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 21, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 302 Motion to Certify Class . Responses due by 1/10/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 330 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2019. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class is due by 1/10/2020. Reply shall be due by 2/6/2020. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (FTR Time: 2:23-2:40.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Sarah London; Tracey Cowan; Adam Wolf; Adam Polk; Amy Zeman.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Sukhwinder Bajwa by Court Call.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc. and Pacific MSO, LLC: William Taratino; Erin Boseman by CourtCall; Julie Park by Court Call.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Ben Smith. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corleygranting 327 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 328 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 328 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Park, Julie) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 327 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting 325 Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Managment Conference filed by Pacific Fertility Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/19/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 325 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Managment Conference by Pacific Fertility Center (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bajwa, Sukhwinder) (Filed on 11/18/2019) Modified on 11/19/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2019 Filing 324 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER of USCA as to 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc., re 200 Notice of Appeal filed by Chart Industries, Inc., re 201 Notice of Appeal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 322 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-05-2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 321 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/5/19 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 5, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 319 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 11/5/2019. (FTR Time: 3:02-3:10.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Tracey Cowan; Adam Polk.Attorneys for Defendant Prelude Fertility, Inc.: Erin Boseman; Julie Park.Attorney for Defendant Chart: Molly Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2019) Modified on 11/6/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2019 Filing 318 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONE DISCOVERY CALL. Please take notice that a telephone discovery conference is set for November 5, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) Modified on 11/5/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 317 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 17, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 307 Transcript Order, 311 Transcript Order, 310 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (Related documents(s) 307 , 311 , 310 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 316 Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Portions of the Jewell Report and Exhibit H to the Sharp Declaration in Support of Class Certification filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 301 , 312 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 315 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byPrelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 301 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 314 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Conaghan. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 313 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of 302 MOTION to Certify Class pursuant to Court's Order on October 22, 2019 filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell (Redacted))(Related document(s) 302 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 312 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Portions of the Jewell Report and Exhibit H to the Sharp Declaration in Support of Class Certification filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit H (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit H (Under Seal), # 5 Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell (Redacted, # 6 Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell (Under Seal))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 311 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/17/19 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 310 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10-17-19 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 305 Stipulation Extending Time to File Declaration Establishing That Designated Material Is Sealable. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 308 Declaration of Frank Roger Bies, III in Support of 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Related document(s) 301 ) (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 307 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 17, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 305 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Declaration Establishing That Designated Material Is Sealable filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Benjamin P. Smith In Support of Stipulation Extending Time to File Declaration Establishing that Designated Material is Sealable)(Smith, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 306 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/17/2019. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (FTR Time: 1:53-2:11.)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Tracy Cowan; Tiseme Zegeye; Sarah London; Amy Zeman.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Sukhwinder Bajwa by Court Call.Attorney for Defendant Prelude Fertility, Inc.: William Taratino; Erin Boseman & Julie Park by Court Call. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/17/2019) Modified on 10/21/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2019 Filing 304 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Joseph Conaghan served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 303 EXHIBITS re 302 MOTION to Certify Class Exhibit W filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Related document(s) 302 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 302 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing reset for 1/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 302 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing reset for 2/27/2020 at 09:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (See 265 ). (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 302 ATTACHMENTS 1 AND 10 LOCKED AT REQUEST OF FILER. MOTION to Certify Class filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 12/19/2019. Replies due by 1/30/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp with Exhibits A-CC (Redacted), # 2 Declaration of A.B. (Redacted), # 3 Declaration of C.D. (Redacted), # 4 Declaration of E.F. (Redacted), # 5 Declaration of G.H. (Redacted), # 6 Declaration of I.J. (Redacted), # 7 Declaration of K.L (Redacted), # 8 Expert Report of Anand Kasbekar (Redacted), # 9 Expert Report of Christine Allen (Redacted), # 10 Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell (Redacted), # 11 Expert Report of Dr. Stephen G. Somkuti)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/15/2019) Modified on 10/21/2019 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2019 Filing 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 4 (Under Seal) Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 5 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), # 6 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit B (Under Seal), # 8 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit C (Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit E (Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit F (Under Seal), # 13 Exhibit G (Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit I (Under Seal), # 15 Exhibit J (Under Seal), # 16 Exhibit K (Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit L (Under Seal), # 18 Exhibit M (Under Seal), # 19 Exhibit N (Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit O (Under Seal), # 21 Exhibit P (Under Seal), # 22 Exhibit Q (Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit R (Under Seal), # 24 Exhibit S (Under Seal), # 25 Exhibit T (Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit U (Under Seal), # 27 Exhibit V (Under Seal), # 28 Exhibit X (Under Seal), # 29 Exhibit Y (Under Seal), # 30 Exhibit Z (Under Seal), # 31 Exhibit AA (Under Seal), # 32 Exhibit BB (Under Seal), # 33 Exhibit CC (Under Seal), # 34 Declaration of A.B. (Under Seal), # 35 Declaration of C.D. (Under Seal), # 36 Declaration of E.F. (Under Seal), # 37 Declaration of G.H. (Under Seal), # 38 Declaration of I.J. (Under Seal), # 39 Declaration of K.L. (Under Seal), # 40 (Under Seal) Expert Report of Anand Kasbekar, # 41 (Under Seal) Expert Report of Christine Allen, # 42 (Under Seal) Expert Report of Nicholas P. Jewell)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 292 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 299 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Isabelle P. Ryan served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 298 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Liyun Li served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 297 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Carl M. Herbert served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 296 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Philip E. Chenette served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 295 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Carolyn R. Givens served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 294 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Eldon D. Schriock served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 293 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chart Industries, Inc.. San Francisco Fertility Center served on 10/14/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Suehiro, Megan) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 292 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Park, Julie) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 287 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 290 Third-party Complaint Summons Issued as to Philip E. Chenette, Joseph Conaghan, Carolyn R. Givens, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan, San Francisco Fertility Center, Eldon D. Schriock. (Attachments: # 1 Joseph Conaghan, PhD, # 2 Eldon D. Schriock, M.D., # 3 Carolyn R. Givens, M.D., # 4 Philip E. Chenette, M.D., # 5 Carl M. Herbert, M.D., # 6 Liyun Li, M.D., # 7 Isabelle P. Ryan, M.D.)(mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 289 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 288 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against San Francisco Fertility Center d/b/a Pacific Fertility Center, Joseph Conaghan, Eldon D. Schriock, Carolyn R. Givens, Philip E. Chenette, Carl M. Herbert, Liyun Li, Isabelle P. Ryan. Filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - San Francisco Fertility Centers, dba Pacific Fertility Center, # 3 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Joseph Conaghan, PhD, # 4 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Eldon D. Schriock, M.D., # 5 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Carolyn R. Givens, M.D., # 6 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Philip E. Chenette, M.D., # 7 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Carl M. Herbert, M.D., # 8 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Liyun Li, M.D., # 9 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint - Isabelle P. Ryan, M.D.)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 287 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Pacific Fertility Center. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Picchi, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 285 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 285 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 284 ANSWER to 280 Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed on August 29, 2019 by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2019 Filing 283 ANSWER to 280 Second Amended Complaint by Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2019 Filing 282 ANSWER to 280 Second Amended Complaint by Pacific MSO, LLC. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 9/27/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2019 Filing 281 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 12, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 278 Transcript Order, 279 Transcript Order, 277 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2019. (Related documents(s) 278 , 279 , 277 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 280 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Pursuant to September 11, 2019 Order (Dkt. 274 ) against Chart Industries, Inc., Pacific Fertility Center, Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Filed byG. H., C.D., E.F., I. J., A.B., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/18/2019) Modified on 9/19/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/12/19 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09-12-2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 277 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 12, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 276 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2019.The parties shall meet and confer regarding deposition scheduling to prioritize the four depositions identified by Plaintiffs to take place before their motion for class certification is due. Chart will notify Plaintiffs Monday, September 16, 2019 whether it can produce the vacuum seal documents identified at the hearing. If the parties have any issues regarding either of these matters, they can contact the Courtroom Deputy to set up a call on September 18, 2019. The deadline to move to amend pleadings is extended until October 4, 2019. The Court sets a further status conference for October 7, 2019 with a updated statement due the week before. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.FTR Time: 2:26 - 2:49. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Tracy Cowan; Tiseme Zegeye; Sarah London; Adam Wolf; Amy Zeman.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Suk Bajwa - by phone.Attorney for Defendant Prelude Fertility, Inc.: Julie Park.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Molly Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER of USCA that the existing briefing schedule shall continue in effect as to 200 Notice of Appeal filed by Chart Industries, Inc., 201 Notice of Appeal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, and 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc.(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 274 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 273 STIPULATION Extending Time To Respond To Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 272 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 271 Declaration of Frank Roger Bies, III in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. 266] filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 270 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 266 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 269 Declaration of William D. Pickell in Support of 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint special appearing non-party filed byExtron Co.. (Related document(s) 266 ) (Holder, James) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER of USCA as to 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc., 200 Notice of Appeal filed by Chart Industries, Inc., and 201 Notice of Appeal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 267 SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against Chart Industries, Inc., Pacific Fertility Center, Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Filed by G. H., C.D., E.F., I. J., A.B., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 266 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (Redacted) Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, # 4 (Under Seal) Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 265 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 264 Stipulation. Class Certification Motion due by 10/15/2019. Oppositions due by 12/19/2019. Reply due by 1/30/2020. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 264 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Adjusting Class Certification Schedule filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk)(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 263 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/01/19, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223 ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 260 Transcript Order, 259 Transcript Order, 258 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2019. (Related documents(s) 260 , 259 , 258 ) (rre, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 228 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 229 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 261 *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET # 260 ) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 1, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/5/2019 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2019 Filing 260 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/01/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 259 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/01/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 258 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 1, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 257 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2019 re 229 Motion to Dismiss Second, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc., 227 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc., 228 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. and Further Case Management Conference held on 8/1/2019. (Court Reporter: Ruth Ekhaus.)(Time 1:06) The motions are taken under submission. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2019. Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Sarah London; Adam Wolf; Amy Zeman.Attorney for Defendant Prelude Fertility, Inc.: Erin Boseman; William Tarantino; Elizabeth Balassone.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Molly Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 256 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 254 REPLY in Support (re 228 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 253 REPLY in Support (re 227 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 252 REPLY in Support (re 229 MOTION to Dismiss Second, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint )filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 7/16/2019) Modified on 7/17/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2019 Filing 251 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Consolidated Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Prelude and Pacific MSO filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 249 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 204 Motion to Stay. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Consolidated Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Prelude and Pacific MSO filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Consolidated Opposition, # 4 Unredacted Version of Consolidated Opposition)(London, Sarah) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 248 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 229 MOTION to Dismiss Second, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 245 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 25, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 242 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (Related documents(s) 242 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 24, 2019 Filing 244 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 20, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 242 Transcript Order, 243 Transcript Order, 241 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2019. (Related documents(s) 242 , 243 , 241 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/24/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/20/19 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 25, 2019 and June 20, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 241 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing re 204 Motion to Stay filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. and Prelude Fertility, Inc. and Further Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2019. The motion to stay is denied. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 09:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2019. (FTR Time: 9:36-10:25.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Sarah London; Adam Polk; Amy Zeman; and Tracey Cowan.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc. & Pacific MSO, LLC: Erin Boseman & Julie Park.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Molly Lane.Attorney for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Aaron Schultz. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/21/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2019 Filing 239 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Status Report by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 238 Proposed Order re 204 MOTION to Stay re 202 Notice of Appeal, 201 Notice of Appeal, by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Kagel, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 236 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/23/2019, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 2:02 p.m. - 2:39 p.m. = 37 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 226 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2019. (Related documents(s) 226 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 235 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 23, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 234 Proposed Order re 228 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Pacific MSO, LLC. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 233 Proposed Order re 227 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 232 Declaration of Molly Moriarty Lane in Support of Defendant Chart Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 231 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Chart Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Second, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Informed Consent Agreements for Plaintifs A.B. and C.D., # 2 Exhibit Informed Consent Agreements for Plaintiffs E.F., G.H., I.J., K.L., M.N. and O.P. - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Informed Consent Agreements for Plaintiffs E.F., G.H., I.J., K.L., M.N. and O.P. - Part 2)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 230 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Chart Inc.'s Dismiss Second, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 229 MOTION to Dismiss Second, Eighth, and Tenth Causes of Action of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/16/2019. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 228 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/16/2019. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 227 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 6/25/2019. Replies due by 7/16/2019. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 226 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., Jonathan Bauer, Megan Bauer, C.D., R. E., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 225 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/09/2018 and 3/12/2019 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, re 200 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chart Inc. Transcript due by 6/24/2019. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER RE: THE PARTIES' PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/24/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 223 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2019. The Court will issue an order with all the deadlines that were set. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (FTR Time: 2:02-2:39.) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Sarah London; Adam Polk; Amy Zeman.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc. & Pacific MSO, LLC: Erin Boseman & Julie Park.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Molly Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2019) Modified on 6/4/2019: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2019 Filing 222 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/09/2018 and 3/12/2019 before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, re 200 Notice of Appeal, filed by Chart Inc. Transcript due by 6/24/2019. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 221 REPLY in Support (re 204 MOTION to Stay re 202 Notice of Appeal, 201 Notice of Appeal) filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 220 REPLY in Support (re 204 MOTION to Stay re 202 Notice of Appeal, 201 Notice of Appeal) filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 219 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 [Redacted] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay, # 4 [Unredacted] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 218 Transcript Designation Form (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 213 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 216 USCA Case Number 19-15888 for 202 Notice of Appeal filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 215 USCA Case Number 19-15886 for 201 Notice of Appeal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 214 USCA Case Number 19-15885 for 200 Notice of Appeal filed by Chart Industries, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 213 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 212 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 211 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 204 MOTION to Stay re 202 Notice of Appeal, 201 Notice of Appeal, ) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 13, 2019 See 209 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 204 MOTION to Stay re 202 Notice of Appeal, 201 Notice of Appeal, . Motion Hearing reset for 6/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 210 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prelude Fertility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prelude Fertility Intermediate Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Prelude Holding Company, LLC, Corporate Parent Prelude Fertility Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Inception Fertility Holdings, LLC for Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Supplemental) and Civ. L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 209 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 207 Stipulation REGARDING MOTIONS TO STAY AND TO DISMISS. Motion to Stay Pending Appeal Hearing set for 6/20/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/1/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/6/2019 (ahmS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2019 Filing 208 Joinder in 204 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 206 Pretrial Order,,, Set Hearings,, filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/26/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 9/8/2020 at 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 to 10/1/2020 (18-days) at 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2019. The Court will issue an order with all the deadlines and hearing dates. Case Management Statement /Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/20/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Not Reported)(Time 00:32)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Sarah London; Tracey Cowan; Adam Polk.Attorneys for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Aaron Schultz.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc. & Pacific MSO, LLC: Erin Boseman & Julie Park.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Molly Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 204 MOTION to Stay re 202 Notice of Appeal, 201 Notice of Appeal, filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 5/8/2019. Replies due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, # 2 Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 [Redacted] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, # 4 [Unredacted] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to Stay Pending Appeal)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel, 192 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13288606 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Prelude Fertility, Inc.'s Representation Statement)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Pacific MSO, LLC. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel, 192 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13288560 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Defendant Pacific MSO, LLC's Representation Statement)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 200 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion to Compel, 192 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13284084 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order re: Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 2 Exhibit Representation Statement)(Lane, Molly) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 199 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Schedule filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 198 STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 197 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 196 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Pursuant to March 11, 2019 Order (Dkt. 177) against Chart Industries, Inc., Pacific Fertility Center, Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. Filed byG. H., C.D., E.F., I. J., A.B., K. L.. (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 4/3/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2019 Filing 195 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 12, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 179 Transcript Order, 182 Transcript Order, 180 Transcript Order, 181 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2019. (Related documents(s) 179 , 182 , 180 , 181 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 194 EXHIBITS re 110 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 5 and 7 Redacted Pursuant to March 25, 2019 Order (Dkt.193) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7 Redacted)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/27/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2019 Filing 191 REPLY to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration) [REDACTED VERSION) filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/22/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2019 Filing 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 [Redacted] Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 4 [Unredacted] Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 5 [Redacted] Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 6 [Unredacted] Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 7 [Redacted] Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 8 [Unredacted] Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 188 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Renewed) to the Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs Consolidated Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders filed byPacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Related document(s) 184 ) (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 187 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Supplemental Briefing -Pursuant to March 4, 2019 Order (Dkt. 171) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 186 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Pursuant to March 11, 2019 Order (Dkt. 177) filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 185 EXHIBITS re 110 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 3 Redacted filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Related document(s) 110 ) (Polk, Adam) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Renewed) to the Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs Consolidated Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted))(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Portion of Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility Inc's Administrative Motion to Seal Additional Portion of Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility Inc's Administrative Motion to Seal Additional Portion of Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 3 [Redacted] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility Inc's Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 4 [Unredacted] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility Inc's Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Chart Industries, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 12, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Pacific Fertility Center, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Picchi, Joseph) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 12, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2019 re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacific Fertility Center, 56 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Prelude Fertility, Inc., and 67 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Chart Industries, Inc. The motions were argued, submitted, and taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball.)(Time 1:10) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Dena Sharp; Sarah London; Tracey Cowan; Adam Wolf (be telephone).Attorneys for Defendant Pacific Fertility Center: Aaron Schultz; Joseph Picci.Attorneys for Defendants Prelude Fertility, Inc. and Pacific MSO, LLC: Erin Boseman; Julie Park; William Taratino.Attorney for Defendant Chart Industries: Molly Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying without prejudice 108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying without prejudice 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 174 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 175 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6575 to make the arrangements. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Jonathan Bauer, Megan Bauer. (Wolf, Adam) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 174 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Additional Portion of First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to Seal Additional Portion of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order [Granting] Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc's Administrative Motion to Seal Additional Portion of the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, # 3 [Unredacted] First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, # 4 [Redacted] First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit to the Declaration of Aaron T. Schultz in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacific Fertility Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron T. Schultz in Support of Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Documents Sough to be Sealed, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to be Sealed)(Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Supplemental Declaration of Aaron T. Schultz in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacific Fertility Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Aaron T. Schultz in Support of Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Renewed Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Documents Sought to be Sealed, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Documents Sought to be Sealed)(Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 51 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc. (Park, Julie) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 169 REPLY to Joinder (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alden Romney)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Hertzberg, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc.'s Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 4 Unredacted Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc.'s Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 5 Redacted Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc.'s Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, # 6 Unredacted Declaration of Alden Romney in Support of Defendants Pacific MSO, LLC and Prelude Fertility, Inc.'s Reply to Joinder and Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 167 REPLY to Supplemental Opposition (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed by Pacific Fertility Center. (Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 2/26/2019) Modified on 2/27/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 166 REPLY (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) In Support of Supplemental Joinder in San Francisco Fertility Centers dba Pacific Fertility Centers filed byChart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 165 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Supplemental Briefing filed byA.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk in Support of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 5)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 164 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders filed by A.B., C.D., E.F., G. H., I. J., K. L.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam E. Polk, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 4 (Under Seal) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Joinders, # 5 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal), # 11 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 4 (Under Seal))(Polk, Adam) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs M.N. and O.P. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(a)(i) by M. N., O. P. (Zegeye, Tiseme) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 161 Stipulation Amending Supplemental Arbitration Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiffs to file any response to arbitration briefing by February 8, 2019Defendants to file any reply in support of arbitration briefing by February 26, 2019 Motion Hearing reset for March 12, 2019 at 9:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 161 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Supplemental Arbitration Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date filed by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erin M. Bosman)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 160 Joinder re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Pacific MSO, LLC, Prelude Fertility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Erin M. Bosman, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 159 Joinder re 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Chart Industries, Inc.. (Lane, Molly) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 158 Supplemental Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit to Aaron T. Schultz Supplemental Declaration in Support of 52 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacific Fertility Center. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of admin motion to file under seal, # 2 Proposed Order motion to file under seal, # 3 Declaration Redacted version of corrected supplemental, # 4 Declaration SEALED version of corrected supplemental declaration)(Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2019 Filing 157 CORRECTED Supplemental Declaration of Aaron T. Schultz in Support of 52 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byPacific Fertility Center. (Related document(s) 52 ) (Schultz, Aaron) (Filed on 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).