Dreamstime.com, LLC v. Google, LLC

Plaintiff: Dreamstime.com, LLC
Defendant: Google, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01910
Filed: March 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 40 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 8/21/2018 by Tamara Lange. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled for 11/1/2018 at 10:30 AM. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 16, 2018 Filing 39 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference is rescheduled to 8/21/2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 38 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled on August 14, 2018 at 3:00 PM Pacific time is OFF CALENDAR , and will be rescheduled at a later time. (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 2, 2018 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and Initial Case Management Conference RESCHEDULED for 9/6/2018 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 36 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle, LLC. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) filed byGoogle, LLC. (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 34 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ) Plaintiff Dreamstime.com LLCs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Googles Motion to Dismiss filed byDreamstime.com, LLC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 5, 2018 Filing 33 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on August 14, 2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time is RESCHEDULED to 3:00 PM Pacific time on August 14, 2018. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 13, 2018 Filing 32 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on August 14, 2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2018 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #26 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 7, 2018 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Dreamstime.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaime W. Marquart in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Continuing Case Management Conference)(Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Google, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 6/18/2018. Replies due by 6/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Willen, Brian) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES BAILEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation Extending Defendant Google LLC's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Google, LLC. (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 22 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12256056.) Filing fee previously paid on 04/09/18 filed by Dreamstime.com, LLC. (Bailey, James) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING #19 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2018. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded from the court's web page: www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12256056.) filed by Dreamstime.com, LLC. (Bailey, James) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSHUA SOVEN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #11 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRIAN WILLEN PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/6/18. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joshua Soven for Defendant Google, LLC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12252901.) filed by Google, LLC. (Soven, Joshua) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 6, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/6/18. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12246318.) filed by Google, LLC. (Willen, Brian) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google, LLC.. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google, LLC. Google LLC's FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Civil L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson and Lauren Gallo White for Defendant Google LLC (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dreamstime.com, LLC. Google, LLC served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018. (Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dreamstime.com, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Serban Enache, Other Affiliate Dragos Jianu, Other Affiliate Jeff Prescott for Dreamstime.com, LLC. (Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/12/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12228104.). Filed byDreamstime.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marquart, Jaime) (Filed on 3/28/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreamstime.com, LLC v. Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreamstime.com, LLC
Represented By: Jaime W Marquart
Represented By: Donald Ross Pepperman
Represented By: James D Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Brian M. Willen
Represented By: Joshua H Soven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?