Gamevice, Inc. v. Nintendo Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Gamevice, Inc.
Defendant: Nintendo Co., Ltd. and Nintendo of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01942
Filed: March 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Ventura
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 230 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on March 14, 2023. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: 230 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/2022. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2022)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Discovery Order re: 120 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/14/2020. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Discovery Order re: 102 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/29/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Discovery Order re 102 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 10/22/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Discovery Order (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/23/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 08/02/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Discovery Order re: joint discovery letters 66 and 67 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/2/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Discovery Order re 67 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Defendants and Counterclaimant shall submit their initial disclosures, and any amended version thereof, to the Court by July 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/1/2019. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamevice, Inc. v. Nintendo Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Edward Kinsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gamevice, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hull Doss
Represented By: Scott Alan Florance
Represented By: Justin Cornelius Griffin
Represented By: Tigran Guledjian
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Mathews
Represented By: John B Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?