Rana v. The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicole Rana
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2018cv01968
Filed: March 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #17 Stipulation of Dismissal of Action. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal of Action filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #15 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Deadline and Extend the Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing previously set for 5/31/2018 is reset to 6/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/28/2018 is reset to 8/2/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 5/17/2018. Replies due by 5/24/2018. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nicole Rana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/10/2018. Replies due by 5/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael T. McClure and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Under FRCP 56, #2 Declaration of Caitlin M. Wang and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Under FRCP 56, #3 Proposed Order)(Wang, Caitlin) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #9 Motion for Summary Judgment entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court terminates the pending motions given the filing of an amended complaint as of right. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 19, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byNicole Rana. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nicole Rana.. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 4/19/2018. Replies due by 4/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Wohl and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment under FRCP 56, #2 Declaration of Michael T. McClure and Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss under FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment under FRCP 56, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc... (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/ 21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. re #3 Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration in Support, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2018) Modified on 4/5/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of Michael T. McClure in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byThe Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is HG18894432. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12234204). Filed byThe Permanente Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - All other documents received by defendant, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wohl, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rana v. The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Rana
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Wohl
Represented By: Caitlin Marian Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?