Long v. Starbucks Corporation

Plaintiff: Sandra L. Long
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02171
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #15 Stipulation and Protective Order. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Confidentiality filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Durek, Katrina) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 14 Identification of Agreed Private Mediator filed by Sandra L. Long. (Watson, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 16, 2018 13 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/16/18. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/13/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Jury Selection set for 8/26/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 8/26/2019 08:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2019 03:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. The parties shall participate in private mediation by 12/14/18. Counsel shall inform the Court by 8/3/18, the name of the mediator selected.Total Time in Court: 18 minutes. Court Reporter: n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2018)
July 3, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., Motions terminated: #8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Sandra L. Long filed by Sandra L. Long.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and [PROPOSED] ORDER. (Watson, Stephen) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 9 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Sandra L. Long. (Watson, Stephen) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Sandra L. Long filed by Sandra L. Long. (Watson, Stephen) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 2, 2018 7 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
May 2, 2018 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sandra L. Long. (Watson, Stephen) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
April 20, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Caleo (Caleo, Paul) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 12, 2018 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Complaint is Exhibit 1 (pg 7-13) of the Notice of Removal. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 3 Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Starbucks Corporation.. (Romero, Katrina) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court County of Humboldt. Their case number is DR180068. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12265097). Filed byStarbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service, #6 Declaration, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Romero, Katrina) (Filed on 4/11/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra L. Long
Represented By: Stephen George Watson
Represented By: Stephen George Watson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Katrina Acosta Romero
Represented By: Katrina R. Durek
Represented By: Paul Caleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?