Sanrio Co. Ltd. et al v. ooShirts Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sanrio, Inc. and Sanrio Co. Ltd.
Defendant: Little Raymond's Print Shop Inc., ooShirts Inc., Raymond Lei and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2018cv02235
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Charles R Breyer
1 Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 15 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint By Thirty Days From May 15, 2018 To June 14, 2018 (L.R. 6-1(a)) filed by Raymond Lei, Little Raymond's Print Shop Inc., ooShirts Inc.. (Lussier, Kevin) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
April 17, 2018 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 12 Summons Issued as to Raymond Lei. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to Little Raymond's Print Shop Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 10 Summons Issued as to ooShirts Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 13, 2018 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sanrio Co. Ltd., Sanrio, Inc... (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 5 NOTICE by Sanrio Co. Ltd., Sanrio, Inc. REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 4 NOTICE by Sanrio Co. Ltd., Sanrio, Inc. REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sanrio Co. Ltd., Sanrio, Inc. (Wang, Annie) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12271152.). Filed bySanrio Co. Ltd., Sanrio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wang, Annie) (Filed on 4/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanrio Co. Ltd. et al v. ooShirts Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanrio, Inc.
Represented By: Annie S. Wang
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanrio Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Annie S. Wang
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Raymond's Print Shop Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Richard Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ooShirts Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Richard Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Lei
Represented By: Kevin Richard Lussier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?